Case Last Refreshed: 3 months ago
Tatiana Rosado, filed a(n) Agency Action - Administrative case represented by Kramer, Betsy, against Good Shepherd Services, Jess Dannhauser In His Official Capacity As Commissioner Of New York City Administration For Children'S Services, Michelle Yanche Chief Executive Officer Of Good Shepherd Services, Nyc Administration For Children'S Services, represented by Aquino, Katherine Marie, Wenegrat, Lauren Elizabeth, in the jurisdiction of New York County. This case was filed in New York County Superior Courts with J. Machelle Sweeting presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeJ. Machelle Sweeting Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 20, 2023 |
CategorySpecial Proceedings - Cplr Article 78 |
Last RefreshedJanuary 27, 2024 |
Practice AreaAdministrative |
Filing LocationNew York County, NY |
Matter TypeAgency Action |
This legal document is a complaint filed by Tatiana Rosado against the New York City Administration for Children's Services (ACS), Jess Dannhauser (Commissioner of ACS), Good Shepherd Services, and Michelle Yanche (CEO of Good Shepherd Services). Tat...
AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN REPLY
Date: January 05, 2024ORDER - INTERIM (MOTION RELATED)
Date: January 17, 2024AFFIRMATION
Date: December 29, 2023ORDER - INTERIM (MOTION RELATED)
Date: December 22, 2023AFFIRMATION
Date: December 20, 2023NO FEE AUTHORIZATION (LETTER/ORDER/AFFIRMATION)
Date: December 20, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #001)
Date: December 20, 2023AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: December 21, 2023ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE
Date: December 21, 2023RJI -RE: ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE
Date: December 20, 2023AFFIRMATION Â (Motion #001)
Date: December 20, 2023PETITION
Date: December 20, 2023ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE - ACCOMPANYING COMMENCEMENT DOC(S) (PROPOSED) Â (Motion #001)
Date: December 20, 2023Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 17, 2024 | ORDER - INTERIM (MOTION RELATED) | ||
January 05, 2024 | AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN REPLY | ||
December 29, 2023 | AFFIRMATION | ||
December 22, 2023 | ORDER - INTERIM (MOTION RELATED) | ||
December 21, 2023 | AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE | ||
December 21, 2023 | ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE | ||
December 20, 2023 | AFFIRMATION | ||
December 20, 2023 | NO FEE AUTHORIZATION (LETTER/ORDER/AFFIRMATION) | ||
December 20, 2023 |
EXHIBIT(S) - A (Motion #001) ACS Guidelines for Continuation of Care Past 21 |
||
December 20, 2023 | RJI -RE: ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.