Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Commissioners Of The State Insurance Fund, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Totaro, Michael D., against P.P.L. Construction Services Corp, in the jurisdiction of New York County. This case was filed in New York County Superior Courts .
Case Number |
||
Filing DateAugust 06, 2015 |
CategoryContract (Non-Commercial) |
|
Last RefreshedFebruary 24, 2021 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions152 days |
Filing LocationNew York County, NY |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
|
Case Cycle Time152 days |
STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: August 06, 2015SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: August 06, 2015JUDGMENT
Date: January 05, 2016Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 29, 2016 | AFFIRMATION | ||
January 29, 2016 | NOTICE OF ENTRY | ||
January 05, 2016 | JUDGMENT | ||
November 16, 2015 |
NO FEE AUTHORIZATION (LETTER/ORDER/AFFIRMATION) NY State Insurance Fund |
||
November 16, 2015 |
AFFIRMATION Waive Collection Costs |
||
November 16, 2015 |
AFFIRMATION Waive Cause of Action |
||
November 16, 2015 |
AFFIDAVIT 3215 Mailing |
||
November 16, 2015 |
EXHIBIT(S) - A Final Invoice |
||
November 16, 2015 |
AFFIRMATION Account Stated |
||
September 14, 2015 | AFFIDAVIT |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.