Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Commissioners Of The State Insurance Fund, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Totaro, Michael D., against Concrete Solutions Contracting Llc, in the jurisdiction of New York County. This case was filed in New York County Superior Courts New York County Supreme Court.
Case Number |
||
Filing DateAugust 06, 2015 |
CategoryContract (Non-Commercial) |
|
Last RefreshedFebruary 21, 2021 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions132 days |
Filing LocationNew York County, NY |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
|
Filing Court HouseNew York County Supreme Court |
Case Cycle Time132 days |
JUDGMENT
Date: December 16, 2015STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: August 06, 2015SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: August 06, 2015Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 04, 2016 | Docket Event |
AFFIRMATION Mailing Entry |
|
January 04, 2016 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF ENTRY | |
December 16, 2015 | Docket Event | JUDGMENT | |
October 15, 2015 | Docket Event |
NO FEE AUTHORIZATION (LETTER/ORDER/AFFIRMATION) NY State Insurance Fund |
|
October 15, 2015 | Docket Event |
AFFIRMATION Waive Collection Costs |
|
October 15, 2015 | Docket Event |
AFFIRMATION Waive Cause of Action |
|
October 15, 2015 | Docket Event |
AFFIDAVIT 3215 Mailing |
|
October 15, 2015 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - A Final Invoice |
|
October 15, 2015 | Docket Event |
AFFIRMATION Account Stated |
|
September 14, 2015 | Docket Event | AFFIDAVIT |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.