Case Last Refreshed: 3 months ago
People Of The State Of New York Ex Rel. Margaret Darocha, Esq., On Behalf Of Alfred Washington, filed a(n) Habeas Corpus - Criminal case represented by Boyle, Christopher William, against Louis Molina, Commissioner, New York City Department Of Correction, in the jurisdiction of New York County. This case was filed in New York County Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateMay 17, 2023 |
CategoryOther Matters - Habeas Corpus |
Last RefreshedJanuary 25, 2024 |
Practice AreaCriminal |
Filing LocationNew York County, NY |
Matter TypeHabeas Corpus |
WRIT OF HABEAS CORPUS
Date: May 18, 2023WRIT OF HABEAS CORPUS
Date: January 16, 2024NO FEE AUTHORIZATION (LETTER/ORDER/AFFIRMATION)
Date: May 17, 2023RJI -RE: WRIT OF HABEAS CORPUS
Date: May 17, 2023PETITION
Date: May 17, 2023WRIT OF HABEAS CORPUS
Date: May 17, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - A
Date: May 17, 2023ADDENDUM - GENERAL (840A)
Date: May 17, 2023Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 16, 2024 |
WRIT OF HABEAS CORPUS DENIED |
||
May 18, 2023 |
WRIT OF HABEAS CORPUS Writ signed 05/18/2023 |
||
May 17, 2023 | NO FEE AUTHORIZATION (LETTER/ORDER/AFFIRMATION) | ||
May 17, 2023 | RJI -RE: WRIT OF HABEAS CORPUS | ||
May 17, 2023 | PETITION | ||
May 17, 2023 | WRIT OF HABEAS CORPUS | ||
May 17, 2023 |
EXHIBIT(S) - A Certified Transcript (5.04.2023) |
||
May 17, 2023 | ADDENDUM - GENERAL (840A) |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.