Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
The City Of New York, filed a(n) Special Proceedings - Other (Nuisance Abatement) case represented by Hirsch, Adam Zachary, against Gvs Properties, Llc, Jane Doe, John Doe, The Land And Building Known As 601 West 139 Street A K A 3421 Broadway, Tax Block 2087, Tax Lot 93, County Of New York, City And State Of New York, in the jurisdiction of New York County. This case was filed in New York County Superior Courts New York County Supreme Court with James D'Auguste presiding.
Case Number |
||
Filing DateJuly 22, 2016 |
CategorySpecial Proceedings - Other (Nuisance Abatement) |
|
Last RefreshedJanuary 09, 2021 |
||
Filing LocationNew York County, NY |
||
Filing Court HouseNew York County Supreme Court |
Case Outcome TypeDisposed |
Case Cycle Time223 days |
DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION (Motion #001)
Date: March 03, 2017SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: July 22, 2016RJI -RE: ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE
Date: July 22, 2016ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE - ACCOMPANYING COMMENCEMENT DOC(S) (PROPOSED) (Motion #001)
Date: July 22, 2016ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE (Motion #001)
Date: July 27, 2016Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 03, 2017 | Docket Event | DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION (Motion #001) | |
March 02, 2017 | Hearing |
MOTION DECIDED-OPEN APPEARANCE (Motion #001) IAS MOTION 62EFM 9:30 AM Judge: D'AUGUSTE, JAMES EDWARD |
|
February 09, 2017 | Hearing |
ADJOURNED (Motion #001) IAS MOTION 62EFM 9:30 AM Judge: D'AUGUSTE, JAMES EDWARD |
|
January 12, 2017 | Hearing |
ADJOURNED (Motion #001) IAS MOTION 62EFM 9:30 AM Judge: D'AUGUSTE, JAMES EDWARD |
|
December 22, 2016 | Hearing |
ADJOURNED (Motion #001) IAS MOTION 62EFM 9:30 AM Judge: D'AUGUSTE, JAMES EDWARD |
|
December 01, 2016 | Hearing |
ADJOURNED (Motion #001) IAS MOTION 62EFM 9:30 AM Judge: D'AUGUSTE, JAMES EDWARD |
|
November 17, 2016 | Hearing |
ADJOURNED (Motion #001) IAS MOTION 62EFM 9:30 AM Judge: D'AUGUSTE, JAMES EDWARD |
|
October 27, 2016 | Hearing |
ADJOURNED (Motion #001) IAS MOTION 62EFM 9:30 AM Judge: D'AUGUSTE, JAMES EDWARD |
|
September 22, 2016 | Hearing |
ADJOURNED (Motion #001) IAS MOTION 62EFM 9:30 AM Judge: D'AUGUSTE, JAMES EDWARD |
|
August 22, 2016 | Hearing |
ADJOURNED (Motion #001) IAS MOTION 62EFM 9:30 AM Judge: D'AUGUSTE, JAMES EDWARD |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.