Case Last Refreshed: 9 months ago
Piotr Holowiak, filed a(n) Premises Liability - Torts case represented by Crasto, Anthony C., against J-Track, Llc, represented by Paliseno, Robert J., in the jurisdiction of New York County. This case was filed in New York County Superior Courts with Lisa S. Headley presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJune 05, 2020 |
CategoryTorts - Other Negligence (Premises) |
Last RefreshedJuly 14, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationNew York County, NY |
Matter TypePremises Liability |
ANSWER
Date: August 25, 2020ORDER - PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE
Date: October 16, 2020DEMAND FOR:
Date: August 25, 2020AFFIDAVIT
Date: March 04, 2021AFFIDAVIT
Date: June 17, 2020SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: June 05, 2020NOTE OF ISSUE:WITH JURY
Date: September 15, 2021PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE REQUEST
Date: September 16, 2020AFFIRMATION
Date: October 13, 2021RJI FROM PRIOR COUNTY (COPY)
Date: September 16, 2020EXHIBIT(S) Â - C Â (Motion #1001) S&C dated 6/18/2021
Date: October 13, 2021NOTICE OF MOTION Â (Motion #1001)
Date: October 13, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - B Â (Motion #1001)
Date: October 13, 2021RJI -RE: OTHER
Date: September 16, 2020EXHIBIT(S) Â - D Â (Motion #1001)
Date: October 13, 2021COURT NOTICE
Date: January 07, 2022ORDER - MOTION- SHORT FORM
Date: December 16, 2021COUNTY CLERK CERTIFICATION OF MINUTES
Date: December 16, 2021NOTICE OF ENTRY
Date: December 16, 2021AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION
Date: October 18, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #1001)
Date: October 13, 2021AFFIDAVIT
Date: October 13, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 07, 2022 | COURT NOTICE | ||
December 16, 2021 | ORDER - MOTION- SHORT FORM | ||
December 16, 2021 | COUNTY CLERK CERTIFICATION OF MINUTES | ||
December 16, 2021 | NOTICE OF ENTRY | ||
October 18, 2021 | AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION | ||
October 13, 2021 | AFFIRMATION | ||
October 13, 2021 |
EXHIBIT(S) - C (Motion #1001) S&C dated 6/18/2021 S&C dated 6/18/2021 Possible SSN Administratively Redacted |
||
October 13, 2021 |
NOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #1001) Motion to Consolidate |
||
October 13, 2021 |
EXHIBIT(S) - B (Motion #1001) Answer dated 8/25/2020 |
||
October 13, 2021 |
EXHIBIT(S) - D (Motion #1001) Answer 7/14/2021 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.