Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Jacqueline Ostrofsky, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case represented by Emanuel, Stephanie Elizabeth, against Tomer Shabtay Efrat, in the jurisdiction of New York County. This case was filed in New York County Superior Courts with Ariel D Chesler presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJune 04, 2020 |
CategoryMatrimonial - Contested |
Last RefreshedSeptember 30, 2022 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationNew York County, NY |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 10, 2022 | JUDGMENT OF DIVORCE | ||
May 10, 2022 | JUDGMENT - SIGNED BY COURT TO COUNTY CLERK | ||
May 09, 2022 | DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION | ||
May 02, 2022 | Hearing |
Fully Submitted - No Opposition (Motion #001) PAPERLESS JUDGE Room 130 Judge: Chesler, Hon. Ariel D. |
|
April 28, 2022 | AFFIDAVIT | ||
April 21, 2022 | Motion |
(Motion #001) Decided: 05/02/2022Decided Before Justice: Chesler, Hon. Ariel D. Answer demanded: No Judge: Chesler, Hon. Ariel D. |
|
April 20, 2022 | RJI -RE: NOTICE OF MOTION | ||
April 14, 2022 | EXHIBIT(S) - C | ||
April 14, 2022 | EXHIBIT(S) - B | ||
April 14, 2022 | EXHIBIT(S) - A |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.