Case Last Refreshed: 9 months ago
Mardequeo Morales, Miss Koil, Inc., Rud Morales, filed a(n) General Property - Property case represented by Simpson, Philip T., against 3801 Equity Company, Llc, Elvis Silverio, Emma Bar & Grill Corp. D B A Emmas Place, William Segura, represented by Handel-Harbour, Jacqueline, Kahan, Eric Howard, in the jurisdiction of New York County, NY, . New York County, NY Superior Courts with Shlomo S. Hagler presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJune 04, 2020 |
CategoryReal Property - Other (Lease Agreement) |
Last RefreshedJuly 22, 2023 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationNew York County, NY |
Matter TypeGeneral Property |
EXHIBIT(S) - E (Motion #001)
Date: October 19, 2020SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: August 19, 2020EXHIBIT(S) - F (Motion #001)
Date: October 19, 2020STIPULATION - BRIEFING SCHEDULE
Date: December 01, 2020AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT (Motion #001)
Date: October 19, 2020NOTIFICATION FROM COURT
Date: December 09, 2020AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT (Motion #001)
Date: October 19, 2020AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: September 01, 2020RJI -RE: NOTICE OF MOTION
Date: October 19, 2020ADDENDUM - COMMERCIAL DIVISION (840C)
Date: October 19, 2020MEMORANDUM OF LAW (Motion #001)
Date: October 19, 2020EXHIBIT(S) - G (Motion #001)
Date: October 19, 2020NOTICE OF APPEAL
Date: October 13, 2021EXHIBIT(S) - B (Motion #001)
Date: October 19, 2020MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN OPPOSITION
Date: December 31, 2020AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION (Motion #001)
Date: December 31, 2020AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION (Motion #001)
Date: December 31, 2020RESPONSE TO DEMAND
Date: December 31, 2021EXHIBIT(S) - 3 (Motion #001)
Date: December 31, 2020DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION
Date: September 15, 2021EXHIBIT(S) - 2 (Motion #001)
Date: December 31, 2020AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN REPLY (Motion #001)
Date: February 01, 2021ORDER - CASE SCHEDULING
Date: January 05, 2022EXHIBIT(S) - 4 (Motion #001)
Date: December 31, 2020AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION (Motion #001)
Date: December 31, 2020EXHIBIT(S) - D (Motion #001)
Date: October 19, 2020NOTICE OF ENTRY
Date: September 15, 2021ANSWER
Date: October 04, 2021MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN REPLY (Motion #001)
Date: February 01, 2021INTERROGATORIES
Date: October 04, 2021DEMAND FOR:
Date: October 04, 2021CONSENT TO CHANGE ATTORNEY (POST RJI)
Date: June 28, 2022INTERROGATORIES
Date: March 31, 2022DEMAND FOR:
Date: March 31, 2022ORDER - CASE SCHEDULING
Date: February 01, 2022RESPONSE TO DEMAND
Date: January 18, 2022NOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #001)
Date: October 19, 2020EXHIBIT(S) - A (Motion #001)
Date: October 19, 2020EXHIBIT(S) - 1 (Motion #001)
Date: December 31, 2020EXHIBIT(S) - 1 (Motion #001)
Date: December 31, 2020ORDER - PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE
Date: October 12, 2021STIPULATION - ADJOURNMENT OF MOTION -IN SUBMISSIONS PART -RM 130
Date: October 26, 2020AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN REPLY (Motion #001)
Date: February 01, 2021EXHIBIT(S) - C (Motion #001)
Date: October 19, 2020STIPULATION - OTHER
Date: October 23, 2020STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: September 15, 2021NOTICE OF APPEAL
Date: October 08, 2021ORDER - CASE SCHEDULING
Date: April 21, 2022ORDER - CASE SCHEDULING
Date: August 02, 2022STIPULATION - PARTIAL DISCONTINUANCE (POST RJI)
Date: August 04, 2022Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 04, 2022 | STIPULATION - PARTIAL DISCONTINUANCE (POST RJI) | ||
August 02, 2022 | ORDER - CASE SCHEDULING | ||
June 28, 2022 | CONSENT TO CHANGE ATTORNEY (POST RJI) | ||
April 21, 2022 | ORDER - CASE SCHEDULING | ||
March 31, 2022 |
INTERROGATORIES Second Set of Interrogatories To Plaintiff |
||
March 31, 2022 |
DEMAND FOR: Post-Deposition Demands To Plaintiff |
||
February 01, 2022 | ORDER - CASE SCHEDULING | ||
January 18, 2022 |
RESPONSE TO DEMAND Response to Interrogatories |
||
January 05, 2022 | ORDER - CASE SCHEDULING | ||
December 31, 2021 |
RESPONSE TO DEMAND Emma Bar & Grill Corp. d/b/a Emmas Place, and 3801 Equity Company, LLC |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.