Case Last Refreshed: 2 months ago
Carmel H. Mcloughlin, filed a(n) Mass Torts - Torts case represented by Bussanich, Jessica Anne, against Brenntag North America Inc., Individually And As A Successor-In-Interest To Mineral Pigment Solutions, Inc., And Whittaker, Clark, & Daniels, Inc., Brenntag Specialties, Inc., F K A Mineral Pigment Solutions, Inc., Individually And As A Successor-In-Interest To Whittaker, Clark & Daniels, Inc., Bristol-Myers Squibb Company, Charles B. Chrystal Company, Inc;, Cosmetic Specialties, Inc., (total of 13) See All represented by Gasior, Joan M., O'Connor, Keith Michael, Rutkowski, David Edward, Wilson, Josie S, in the jurisdiction of New York County. This case was filed in New York County Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateNovember 22, 2023 |
CategoryTorts - Asbestos |
Last RefreshedFebruary 01, 2024 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationNew York County, NY |
Matter TypeMass Torts |
This complaint was filed in the Supreme Court of the State of New York, County of New York. The plaintiff, Carmel H. McLoughlin, is suing Pfizer Inc. The basis for venue is that a substantial part of the events or omissions giving rise to the claim o...
STIPULATION - OTHER
Date: January 29, 2024ANSWER
Date: January 29, 2024ANSWER
Date: January 29, 2024NOTICE OF DEPOSITION
Date: January 09, 2024ACKNOWLEDGEMENT OF SERVICE
Date: December 21, 2023ANSWER
Date: January 29, 2024AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: December 18, 2023ANSWER
Date: January 29, 2024AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: December 15, 2023AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: December 08, 2023AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: December 07, 2023AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: December 18, 2023SUMMONS (PRE RJI) (AMENDED)
Date: December 01, 2023ANSWER
Date: January 09, 2024ANSWER
Date: January 08, 2024AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: December 21, 2023INTERROGATORIES
Date: January 08, 2024PRE-TRIAL DOCUMENT(S)
Date: December 21, 2023AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: December 19, 2023AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: December 19, 2023STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: December 18, 2023AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: December 14, 2023AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: December 14, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - A
Date: December 01, 2023PRE-TRIAL DOCUMENT(S)
Date: December 21, 2023COMPLAINT (AMENDED)
Date: December 01, 2023AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: December 07, 2023AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: November 30, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - A
Date: November 22, 2023STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: November 30, 2023SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: November 22, 2023Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 29, 2024 |
STIPULATION - OTHER Stipulation for PHV Admission |
||
January 29, 2024 |
ANSWER P&G Answer |
||
January 29, 2024 |
ANSWER Coty US LLC Answer |
||
January 29, 2024 |
ANSWER Coty Inc. Answer |
||
January 29, 2024 |
ANSWER BMS Answer |
||
January 09, 2024 | NOTICE OF DEPOSITION | ||
January 09, 2024 |
ANSWER CBC's Answer |
||
January 08, 2024 | ANSWER | ||
January 08, 2024 | INTERROGATORIES | ||
December 21, 2023 |
ACKNOWLEDGEMENT OF SERVICE Cosmetic Specialties, Inc. |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.