Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Michael A Runyon, filed a(n) Mass Torts - Torts case represented by Gayoso, Andrew Jon, against Abb, Inc. Individually And As Successor In Interest To Ite Circuit Breakers, Inc, Air & Liquid Systems Corporation, As Successor-By-Merger To Buffalo Pumps, Inc, Amchem Products, Inc., N K A Rhone Poulenc Ag Company, N K A Bayer Cropscience Inc, American Honda Motor Co., Inc., Atwood & Morrill Company, (total of 47) See All represented by Abbot, Edward Pierce, Bandlamudi, Raghu N, Calcagno, Terance Rowe, Cook, Kerryann Marie, Coughlan, Timothy, (total of 36) See All in the jurisdiction of New York County. This case was filed in New York County Superior Courts New York County Supreme Court with Manuel J. Mendez presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeManuel J. Mendez Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateNovember 18, 2019 |
CategoryTorts - Asbestos |
Last RefreshedOctober 10, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationNew York County, NY |
Matter TypeMass Torts |
Filing Court HouseNew York County Supreme Court |
Cbs Corporation, F K A Viacom Inc., Successor By Merger To Cbs Corporation, F K A Westinghouse Electric Corporation
Flowserve Us, Inc. Individually And Successor To Rockwell Manufacturing Company, Edward Valve, Inc., Nordstrom Valves, Inc., Edward Vogt Valve Company, And Vogt Valve Company
ANSWER
Date: February 26, 2020NOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #001)
Date: July 13, 2020ANSWER
Date: June 03, 2020ANSWER
Date: June 05, 2020ANSWER
Date: January 02, 2020ANSWER WITH CROSS-CLAIM(S)
Date: December 30, 2019LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE
Date: August 06, 2020ANSWER
Date: December 27, 2019ORDER - NO OPP SUMMARY JUDGMENT (PROPOSED)
Date: August 06, 2020ORDER - NO OPP SUMMARY JUDGMENT (PROPOSED)
Date: July 29, 2020ANSWER
Date: December 26, 2019STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: December 24, 2019ANSWER
Date: December 24, 2019ANSWER WITH CROSS-CLAIM(S)
Date: December 23, 2019RJI -RE: NOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #001)
Date: July 13, 2020AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT (Motion #001)
Date: July 13, 2020STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: December 18, 2019ANSWER
Date: February 21, 2020ANSWER
Date: February 05, 2020ANSWER
Date: January 30, 2020ANSWER
Date: January 21, 2020ANSWER
Date: January 17, 2020ANSWER
Date: January 17, 2020ANSWER
Date: January 17, 2020ANSWER WITH CROSS-CLAIM(S)
Date: January 16, 2020ANSWER WITH CROSS-CLAIM(S)
Date: January 15, 2020ANSWER WITH CROSS-CLAIM(S)
Date: January 08, 2020ANSWER
Date: January 08, 2020STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: January 08, 2020ANSWER
Date: December 13, 2019ANSWER
Date: January 08, 2020ANSWER WITH CROSS-CLAIM(S)
Date: January 08, 2020DEMAND FOR:
Date: January 08, 2020DEMAND FOR:
Date: January 08, 2020ANSWER
Date: January 08, 2020ANSWER
Date: January 07, 2020ANSWER
Date: January 03, 2020ANSWER
Date: January 03, 2020ANSWER
Date: December 09, 2019STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: December 06, 2019SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: November 18, 2019STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: January 02, 2020Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 08, 2020 | Hearing |
FULLY SUBMITTED - NO OPP (Motion #001) PAPERLESS PART NO APPEARANCE Judge: SILVERA, ADAM |
|
October 02, 2020 | Hearing |
MOTION WITHDRAWN (Motion #002) PAPERLESS PART NO APPEARANCE NOTICE Judge: SILVERA, ADAM |
|
September 22, 2020 | Hearing |
ADJOURNED (Motion #002) PAPERLESS PART NO APPEARANCE STIP Judge: SILVERA, ADAM |
|
September 08, 2020 | Hearing |
ADJOURNED (Motion #002) PAPERLESS PART NO APPEARANCE STIP Judge: MENDEZ, MANUEL J. |
|
August 23, 2020 | Motion |
DISMISS (Motion #002) Decided: 10/02/2020MOTION WITHDRAWN Before Justice: SILVERA, ADAM Answer demanded: Yes Judge: SILVERA, ADAM |
|
August 06, 2020 | Docket Event |
LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE Letter re: Cleaver-Brooks, Inc. proposed USJM |
|
August 06, 2020 | Docket Event |
ORDER - NO OPP SUMMARY JUDGMENT (PROPOSED) Unopposed Summary Judgment Motion & Order as to Defendant Gould Electronics Inc. |
|
July 29, 2020 | Docket Event |
ORDER - NO OPP SUMMARY JUDGMENT (PROPOSED) Jenkins Bros.' NOSJM dismissal request |
|
July 23, 2020 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - A Exhibit A - Petition |
|
July 23, 2020 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF BANKRUPTCY (PRE RJI) Notice of Suggestion of Bankruptcy on behalf of Briggs & Stratton Corp. |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.