Case Last Refreshed: 4 months ago
Judson G Parker, filed a(n) Mass Torts - Torts case represented by Burshtyn, Patti Lynn, against Aerco International, Inc, Amchem Products, Inc., N K A Rhone Poulenc Ag Company, N K A Bayer Cropscience Inc, American Biltrite Inc.,, Bird Incorporated, Bmce Inc., F K A United Centrifugal Pump, (total of 43) See All represented by Angiolillo, Joseph M, Burbridge, John Joseph, Cook, Kerryann Marie, Coughlan, Timothy, Dilonardo, Anna M., (total of 33) See All in the jurisdiction of New York County. This case was filed in New York County Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateAugust 02, 2023 |
CategoryTorts - Asbestos |
Last RefreshedJanuary 25, 2024 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationNew York County, NY |
Matter TypeMass Torts |
This is a complaint about environmental contamination at the Savanna Manufacturing Site located in Troy, New York. Plaintiff Weitz & Luxenberg, P.C. ("Weitz") brings this action against Defendants AERCO International, Inc., Amchem Products, Inc., n/k...
Harsco Corporation, As Successor To Patterson-Kelley Company, Inc., Individually And D B A Patterson-Kelley
Itt Llc., Individually And As Successor To Bell & Gossett And As Successor To Kennedy Valve Manufacturing Co., Inc
ORDER - NO OPP SUMMARY JUDGMENT (PROPOSED)
Date: November 01, 2023ORDER - NO OPP SUMMARY JUDGMENT (PROPOSED)
Date: November 02, 2023ORDER - NO OPP SUMMARY JUDGMENT (PROPOSED)
Date: November 01, 2023ORDER - NO OPP SUMMARY JUDGMENT (PROPOSED)
Date: December 06, 2023ORDER - OTHER (NON-MOTION)
Date: January 04, 2024ORDER - OTHER (NON-MOTION)
Date: January 18, 2024DEMAND FOR:
Date: November 20, 2023ORDER - NO OPP SUMMARY JUDGMENT (PROPOSED)
Date: November 01, 2023ACKNOWLEDGEMENT OF SERVICE
Date: October 18, 2023ORDER - NO OPP SUMMARY JUDGMENT (PROPOSED)
Date: November 01, 2023SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: August 02, 2023AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: August 21, 2023PROOF OF SERVICE
Date: September 11, 2023ANSWER
Date: September 18, 2023ANSWER
Date: September 13, 2023ANSWER
Date: September 19, 2023ANSWER WITH CROSS-CLAIM(S)
Date: September 08, 2023ANSWER
Date: September 18, 2023ANSWER
Date: September 29, 2023ANSWER
Date: September 21, 2023ANSWER
Date: September 28, 2023ACKNOWLEDGEMENT OF SERVICE
Date: September 11, 2023ANSWER WITH CROSS-CLAIM(S)
Date: September 28, 2023ACKNOWLEDGEMENT OF SERVICE
Date: October 10, 2023ANSWER
Date: August 14, 2023AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: August 14, 2023ANSWER
Date: August 30, 2023ACKNOWLEDGEMENT OF SERVICE
Date: August 15, 2023AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: August 15, 2023ANSWER
Date: August 17, 2023AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: August 17, 2023ANSWER WITH CROSS-CLAIM(S)
Date: August 16, 2023ANSWER
Date: August 21, 2023SUMMONS - SUPPLEMENTAL (PRE RJI)
Date: August 21, 2023ANSWER WITH CROSS-CLAIM(S)
Date: August 22, 2023AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: August 24, 2023AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: August 22, 2023ANSWER WITH CROSS-CLAIM(S)
Date: August 22, 2023ANSWER WITH CROSS-CLAIM(S)
Date: August 22, 2023ACKNOWLEDGEMENT OF SERVICE
Date: August 23, 2023ANSWER WITH CROSS-CLAIM(S)
Date: August 22, 2023ANSWER WITH CROSS-CLAIM(S)
Date: August 24, 2023ANSWER
Date: September 08, 2023ANSWER
Date: September 12, 2023STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: August 10, 2023PLAINTIFFS INITIAL FACT SHEET
Date: August 08, 2023AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: August 10, 2023PRE-TRIAL DOCUMENT(S)
Date: August 30, 2023AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: August 16, 2023PRE-TRIAL DOCUMENT(S)
Date: August 30, 2023AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: August 31, 2023AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: September 05, 2023ANSWER
Date: September 05, 2023ANSWER
Date: August 31, 2023ACKNOWLEDGEMENT OF SERVICE
Date: September 05, 2023AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: August 11, 2023ANSWER
Date: August 11, 2023ACKNOWLEDGEMENT OF SERVICE
Date: September 07, 2023ACKNOWLEDGEMENT OF SERVICE
Date: September 07, 2023ANSWER
Date: September 06, 2023AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: August 25, 2023ANSWER
Date: August 25, 2023ANSWER
Date: August 29, 2023ACKNOWLEDGEMENT OF SERVICE
Date: August 28, 2023ANSWER
Date: August 29, 2023ANSWER
Date: August 30, 2023Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 18, 2024 | ORDER - OTHER (NON-MOTION) | ||
January 04, 2024 | ORDER - OTHER (NON-MOTION) | ||
December 06, 2023 | ORDER - NO OPP SUMMARY JUDGMENT (PROPOSED) | ||
November 20, 2023 |
DEMAND FOR: LTR to PLT Counsel with Proposed USJM as to Defendant ECR International Inc. |
||
November 02, 2023 |
ORDER - NO OPP SUMMARY JUDGMENT (PROPOSED) o/b/o Deere & Company |
||
November 01, 2023 |
ORDER - NO OPP SUMMARY JUDGMENT (PROPOSED) Aerco International |
||
November 01, 2023 |
ORDER - NO OPP SUMMARY JUDGMENT (PROPOSED) Harsco Corp. |
||
November 01, 2023 |
ORDER - NO OPP SUMMARY JUDGMENT (PROPOSED) BMCE, Inc. |
||
November 01, 2023 |
ORDER - NO OPP SUMMARY JUDGMENT (PROPOSED) Morse TEC |
||
October 18, 2023 |
ACKNOWLEDGEMENT OF SERVICE Union Carbide Corporation |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.