Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Mary R Tinley, Roger Tinley, filed a(n) Mass Torts - Torts case represented by Block, Jerome Howard, Ellis, Robert Ian, against Brenntag North America, As A Successor-In-Interest To Mineral Pigment Solutions, Inc., As A Successor-In Interest To Whittaker, Clark & Daniels, Inc.;, Brenntag Specialties, Inc., Flkla Mineral Pigment Solutions, Inc., As A Successor-In Interest To Whittaker, Clark & Daniels, Inc, Colgate-Palmolive Company, Conopco, Inc., Coty Inc., (total of 14) See All represented by Abbot, Edward Pierce, Dimarco, Erik Christopher, Echeverria, Jorkeell, Gasior, Joan M., Halbardier, Suzanne M, (total of 13) See All in the jurisdiction of New York County. This case was filed in New York County Superior Courts New York County Supreme Court with Peter Moulton presiding.
Case Number |
||
Filing DateMay 17, 2016 |
CategoryTorts - Asbestos |
|
Last RefreshedOctober 10, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
|
Filing LocationNew York County, NY |
Matter TypeMass Torts |
|
Filing Court HouseNew York County Supreme Court |
Case Outcome TypeDisposed |
Case Cycle Time570 days |
ORDER ( PROPOSED ) (Motion #009)
Date: November 02, 2017NOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #004)
Date: January 26, 2017AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION (Motion #003)
Date: March 03, 2017AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION (Motion #001)
Date: March 15, 2017ANSWER WITH CROSS-CLAIM(S)
Date: June 22, 2016ANSWER WITH CROSS-CLAIM(S)
Date: June 22, 2016AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT (Motion #005)
Date: February 14, 2017LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE
Date: February 17, 2017MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN SUPPORT (Motion #002)
Date: March 15, 2017NOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #002)
Date: March 15, 2017COMPLAINT (AMENDED)
Date: May 23, 2016NOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #003)
Date: March 03, 2017AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION (Motion #002)
Date: March 15, 2017AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION (Motion #004)
Date: January 30, 2017ANSWER
Date: September 14, 2016SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: May 17, 2016ANSWER
Date: June 09, 2016COMPLAINT (AMENDED) *Corrected*
Date: May 23, 2016STIPULATION - TIME TO ANSWER
Date: August 12, 2016ANSWER
Date: June 09, 2016LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE
Date: February 17, 2017MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN SUPPORT (Motion #004)
Date: January 26, 2017STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: May 17, 2016RJI -RE: NOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #004)
Date: January 26, 2017NOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #001)
Date: March 15, 2017AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION (Motion #002)
Date: March 15, 2017NOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #006)
Date: March 20, 2017AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF PROPOSED OSC/EXPARTE APP (Motion #002)
Date: December 01, 2017DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION (Motion #006)
Date: December 11, 2017DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION (Motion #002)
Date: December 12, 2017AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN REPLY (Motion #002)
Date: May 04, 2017AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION (Motion #007)
Date: March 24, 2017MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN SUPPORT (Motion #007)
Date: March 24, 2017NOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #008)
Date: March 30, 2017DEMAND FOR:
Date: July 26, 2017ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE ( PROPOSED ) (Motion #009)
Date: November 02, 2017AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN REPLY (Motion #004)
Date: April 27, 2017AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION (Motion #004)
Date: April 21, 2017MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN REPLY (Motion #001)
Date: May 04, 2017MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN OPPOSITION (Motion #009)
Date: November 22, 2017MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN REPLY (Motion #002)
Date: May 04, 2017MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN REPLY (Motion #007)
Date: May 04, 2017DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION (Motion #003)
Date: December 12, 2017DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION (Motion #005)
Date: December 11, 2017LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE
Date: September 11, 2017AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION (Motion #006)
Date: March 20, 2017ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE ( PROPOSED ) (Motion #010)
Date: November 30, 2017ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE (PROPOSED) (AMENDED) (Motion #002)
Date: December 01, 2017LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE
Date: June 26, 2017DEMAND FOR:
Date: July 27, 2017AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF PROPOSED OSC/EXPARTE APP (Motion #009)
Date: November 02, 2017AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE (Motion #009)
Date: November 22, 2017AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN REPLY (Motion #006)
Date: May 04, 2017LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE
Date: June 20, 2017DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION (Motion #004)
Date: December 11, 2017AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN REPLY (Motion #001)
Date: May 04, 2017DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION (Motion #008)
Date: December 11, 2017AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT (Motion #008)
Date: March 30, 2017LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE (Motion #004)
Date: September 08, 2017LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE
Date: June 28, 2017AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE (Motion #009)
Date: November 22, 2017LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE (Motion #007)
Date: October 13, 2017DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION (Motion #007)
Date: December 11, 2017DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION (Motion #001)
Date: December 12, 2017MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN OPPOSITION (Motion #004)
Date: April 21, 2017AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN REPLY (Motion #004)
Date: May 04, 2017AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN REPLY (Motion #005)
Date: May 04, 2017NOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #007)
Date: March 24, 2017AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN REPLY (Motion #003)
Date: May 04, 2017MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN REPLY (Motion #004)
Date: May 04, 2017AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN REPLY (Motion #007)
Date: May 04, 2017LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE
Date: June 21, 2017AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT (Motion #010)
Date: November 30, 2017STIPULATION - OTHER
Date: August 22, 2018DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION (Motion #009)
Date: December 05, 2017NOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #005)
Date: February 14, 2017STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING (Motion #004)
Date: March 30, 2017STIPULATION - ADJOURNMENT OF MOTION -IN SUBMISSIONS PART -RM 130 (Motion #004)
Date: April 07, 2017STIPULATION - ADJOURNMENT OF MOTION -IN SUBMISSIONS PART -RM 130 (Motion #006)
Date: April 07, 2017STIPULATION - ADJOURNMENT OF MOTION -IN SUBMISSIONS PART -RM 130 (Motion #003)
Date: April 07, 2017ORDER - FINAL
Date: December 11, 2017AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION (Motion #007)
Date: March 24, 2017STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING (Motion #004)
Date: April 21, 2017STIPULATION - ADJOURNMENT OF MOTION -IN SUBMISSIONS PART -RM 130 (Motion #005)
Date: March 30, 2017STIPULATION - SO ORDERED
Date: April 06, 2017COMPLAINT (AMENDED)
Date: September 22, 2016DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION (Motion #010)
Date: December 11, 2017STIPULATION - ADJOURNMENT OF MOTION -IN SUBMISSIONS PART -RM 130 (Motion #002)
Date: April 07, 2017STIPULATION - ADJOURNMENT OF MOTION -IN SUBMISSIONS PART -RM 130 (Motion #008)
Date: April 07, 2017ORDER - OTHER
Date: August 16, 2018COMPLAINT (AMENDED)
Date: September 09, 2016STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING (Motion #006)
Date: March 20, 2017STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: December 02, 2016COMPLAINT (AMENDED)
Date: February 22, 2017STIPULATION - SO ORDERED
Date: December 08, 2017STIPULATION - ADJOURNMENT OF MOTION -IN SUBMISSIONS PART -RM 130 (Motion #002)
Date: March 30, 2017STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING (Motion #010)
Date: November 30, 2017STIPULATION - ADJOURNMENT OF MOTION -IN SUBMISSIONS PART -RM 130 (Motion #001)
Date: April 07, 2017STIPULATION - ADJOURNMENT OF MOTION -IN SUBMISSIONS PART -RM 130 (Motion #005)
Date: April 07, 2017STIPULATION - ADJOURNMENT OF MOTION -IN SUBMISSIONS PART -RM 130 (Motion #007)
Date: April 07, 2017STIPULATION - DISCONTINUANCE (POST RJI)
Date: December 04, 2017STIPULATION - ADJOURNMENT OF MOTION -IN SUBMISSIONS PART -RM 130 (Motion #003)
Date: March 30, 2017STIPULATION - ADJOURNMENT OF MOTION -IN SUBMISSIONS PART -RM 130 (Motion #001)
Date: March 30, 2017ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE (Motion #009)
Date: November 14, 2017STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: December 04, 2017STIPULATION - ADJOURNMENT OF MOTION -IN SUBMISSIONS PART -RM 130 (Motion #004)
Date: March 30, 2017COMPLAINT (AMENDED)
Date: January 11, 2017Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 28, 2019 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF APPEARANCE (POST RJI) | |
August 22, 2018 | Docket Event |
STIPULATION - OTHER Stipulation to Bifurcate Plaintiff's Successor Liability Claim against Defendant Brenntag Specialtie |
|
August 22, 2018 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF ENTRY for Stipulation to Bifurcate on behalf of Defendant Brenntag Specialties, Inc. |
|
August 16, 2018 | Docket Event | ORDER - OTHER | |
March 13, 2018 | Docket Event | Notice of Entry w Order as to Defendant Elizabeth Arden, Inc. | |
December 22, 2017 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF ENTRY (Motion #007) Notice Of Entry re motion 007 |
|
December 22, 2017 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF ENTRY (Motion #004) Notice Of Entry re motion 004 |
|
December 12, 2017 | Docket Event | DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION (Motion #002) | |
December 12, 2017 | Docket Event | DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION (Motion #003) | |
December 12, 2017 | Docket Event | DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION (Motion #001) |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.