Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
Barbara Jean Vincent, George Vincent, filed a(n) Mass Torts - Torts case represented by Early, Brian Francis, against Blackmer Pump, Cbs Corporation Ind. And As Suc. To Viacom, Inc., Crane Company Ind. And As Suc. To Deming Pump, Weinman Pump Manufacturing Company, Pacific Steel Boiler Corporation And Thatcher Boiler, Foster Wheeler Corporation, General Electric Company, (total of 7) See All in the jurisdiction of New York County. This case was filed in New York County Superior Courts New York County Supreme Court with Manuel J. Mendez presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeManuel J. Mendez Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateMarch 10, 2020 |
CategoryTorts - Asbestos |
Last RefreshedAugust 01, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationNew York County, NY |
Matter TypeMass Torts |
Filing Court HouseNew York County Supreme Court |
RJI -RE: NOTICE OF MOTION
Date: July 22, 2020LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE (Motion #001)
Date: July 23, 2020AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION (Motion #001)
Date: July 22, 2020NOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #001)
Date: July 22, 2020COMPLAINT (AMENDED)
Date: March 17, 2020SUMMONS + COMPLAINT *Corrected*
Date: March 11, 2020Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 13, 2020 | Hearing |
MOTION WITHDRAWN (Motion #001) PAPERLESS PART NO APPEARANCE NOTICE Judge: SILVERA, ADAM |
|
August 04, 2020 | Hearing |
ADJOURNED (Motion #001) PAPERLESS PART NO APPEARANCE Judge: MENDEZ, MANUEL J. |
|
July 23, 2020 | Docket Event |
LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE (Motion #001) Notice to withdraw - Motion 001 |
|
July 22, 2020 | Docket Event |
RJI -RE: NOTICE OF MOTION Notice of Motion |
|
July 22, 2020 | Motion |
ENFORCE/EXEC JUDGMENT OR ORDER (Motion #001) Decided: 10/13/2020MOTION WITHDRAWN Before Justice: SILVERA, ADAM Answer demanded: No Judge: SILVERA, ADAM |
|
July 22, 2020 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - B (Motion #001) JUDGEMENT |
|
July 22, 2020 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - A (Motion #001) Stipulation of Discontinuance and Release |
|
July 22, 2020 | Docket Event |
AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION (Motion #001) Plaintiff's Affirmation In Support of Motion to Enter Judgement and Compel Payment of Settlement-Cr |
|
July 22, 2020 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #001) Crane - Notice of Motion (Compel Payment) |
|
March 17, 2020 | Docket Event | COMPLAINT (AMENDED) |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.