Case Last Refreshed: 9 months ago
Richard Mackay And Mary Mackay, filed a(n) Mass Torts - Torts case represented by Fuller, Brett Frederick, against Air & Liquid Systems Corporation,, Amchem Products, Inc.,, A.O. Smith Water Products Co.,, Atwood & Morrill Company, Aurora Pump Company,, (total of 20) See All represented by Bandlamudi, Raghu N, Carni, Uriel Shmaya, Cook, Kerryann Marie, Dean, Andrew Wayne, Gasior, Joan M., (total of 13) See All in the jurisdiction of New York County. This case was filed in New York County Superior Courts New York County Supreme Court with Peter Moulton presiding.
Case Number |
||
Filing DateFebruary 25, 2016 |
CategoryTorts - Asbestos |
|
Last RefreshedJuly 31, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
|
Filing LocationNew York County, NY |
Matter TypeMass Torts |
|
Filing Court HouseNew York County Supreme Court |
Case Outcome TypeDisposed |
Case Cycle Time1238 days |
ORDER - NO OPP SUMMARY JUDGMENT (PROPOSED)
Date: March 02, 2018STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: April 22, 2016ANSWER
Date: March 15, 2016ORDER - OTHER
Date: July 17, 2019ORDER - OTHER
Date: April 03, 2018STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: March 24, 2016ANSWER
Date: April 01, 2016STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: June 01, 2016ORDER - NO OPP SUMMARY JUDGMENT (PROPOSED)
Date: November 30, 2017ANSWER
Date: July 14, 2016ANSWER WITH CROSS-CLAIM(S)
Date: May 19, 2016ANSWER
Date: April 08, 2016ANSWER
Date: March 22, 2016ANSWER
Date: March 15, 2016ANSWER
Date: March 10, 2016SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: February 25, 2016Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 17, 2019 | Docket Event | ORDER - OTHER | |
June 04, 2018 | Docket Event | Notice of Entry on behalf of A.O. Smith Water Products Company | |
April 03, 2018 | Docket Event | ORDER - OTHER | |
April 03, 2018 | Hearing |
DISCONTINUED IAS PART 13 Judge: MOULTON, PETER H. |
|
March 02, 2018 | Docket Event |
ORDER - NO OPP SUMMARY JUDGMENT (PROPOSED) USJM Request |
|
March 01, 2018 | Docket Event |
PRE-TRIAL DOCUMENT(S) Carrier Corporation's Exhibit LIst |
|
March 01, 2018 | Docket Event |
PRE-TRIAL DOCUMENT(S) Carrier Corporation's Expert Witness List |
|
February 02, 2018 | Docket Event |
NOTE OF ISSUE:WITH JURY NOI |
|
January 25, 2018 | Docket Event |
PRE-TRIAL DOCUMENT(S) Carrier Corporation's Fact Witness List |
|
November 30, 2017 | Docket Event | ORDER - NO OPP SUMMARY JUDGMENT (PROPOSED) |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.