Case Last Refreshed: 11 months ago
Kent Huseboe As Administrator For The Estate Of Sharon Huseboe, Kent Huseboe As Administrator For The Estate Of Sharon Huseboe, filed a(n) Mass Torts - Torts case represented by Romanelli, Chris, against Amchem Products, Inc.,, Certainteed Corporation, General Electric Company, Owens-Illinois, Inc, Pfizer, Inc., (total of 7) See All represented by Spence, Nicole Ann-Marie, Tanenbaum, Michael A, Yavitz, Judith A, in the jurisdiction of New York County. This case was filed in New York County Superior Courts New York County Supreme Court.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJanuary 23, 2014 |
CategoryAsbestos |
Last RefreshedAugust 02, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationNew York County, NY |
Matter TypeMass Torts |
Filing Court HouseNew York County Supreme Court |
SUMMONS - SUPPLEMENTAL (PRE RJI)
Date: October 07, 2014SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: January 23, 2014ACKNOWLEDGEMENT OF SERVICE
Date: February 13, 2014AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: February 14, 2014AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: October 13, 2014ACKNOWLEDGEMENT OF SERVICE
Date: March 28, 2014ACKNOWLEDGEMENT OF SERVICE
Date: March 26, 2014ACKNOWLEDGEMENT OF SERVICE
Date: March 04, 2014AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: February 28, 2014ANSWER
Date: March 12, 2014STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: February 14, 2014AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: March 06, 2014PLAINTIFFS INITIAL FACT SHEET
Date: January 28, 2014Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 13, 2014 | AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE | ||
October 07, 2014 | SUMMONS - SUPPLEMENTAL (PRE RJI) | ||
March 28, 2014 |
ACKNOWLEDGEMENT OF SERVICE CertainTeed |
||
March 26, 2014 |
ACKNOWLEDGEMENT OF SERVICE Amchem |
||
March 12, 2014 |
ANSWER General Electric's Answer |
||
March 06, 2014 | AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE | ||
March 04, 2014 | ACKNOWLEDGEMENT OF SERVICE | ||
February 28, 2014 | AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE | ||
February 14, 2014 | AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE | ||
February 14, 2014 | STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.