Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
John P. Ryan, Mary C. Ryan, filed a(n) Mass Torts - Torts case represented by Williams, Joseph Patrick, against Air & Liquid Systems Corporation As Successor By Merger To Buffalo Pumps, Inc., Aluminum Company Of America, American Biltrite, Individually And As Successor To Amtico Floors, Bell & Gossett Company,, Bird, Incorporated,, (total of 40) See All represented by Baker, Heidi C., Bandlamudi, Raghu N, Beltz, Jordan David, Berry, Jill L, Cantamessa, Alexandra Elizabeth, (total of 32) See All in the jurisdiction of New York County. This case was filed in New York County Superior Courts New York County Supreme Court with Martin Shulman presiding.
Case Number |
||
Filing DateJanuary 23, 2014 |
CategoryAsbestos |
|
Last RefreshedOctober 10, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
|
Filing LocationNew York County, NY |
Matter TypeMass Torts |
|
Filing Court HouseNew York County Supreme Court |
Case Outcome TypeDisposed |
Case Cycle Time1944 days |
Cbs Corporation, F K A Viacom Inc., Successor By Merger To Cbs Corporation, F K A Westinghouse Electric Corporation
Itt Industries, Inc., Individually, And As Successor To Bell & Gossett Co., And As Successor To Kennedy Valve Manufacturing Co., Inc.
ANSWER
Date: February 12, 2014ANSWER
Date: February 10, 2014ANSWER
Date: February 19, 2014SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: January 23, 2014ORDER - NO OPP SUMMARY JUDGMENT (PROPOSED)
Date: August 11, 2014ORDER - NO OPP SUMMARY JUDGMENT (PROPOSED)
Date: August 12, 2014LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE
Date: October 06, 2014ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE ( PROPOSED ) (Motion #006)
Date: October 28, 2015ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE ( PROPOSED ) (Motion #009)
Date: January 15, 2016LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE
Date: November 03, 2015ORDER - NO OPP SUMMARY JUDGMENT (PROPOSED)
Date: March 17, 2015LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE
Date: May 11, 2015ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE ( PROPOSED ) (Motion #005)
Date: June 18, 2015STIPULATION - DISCONTINUANCE ( REQUEST TO SO ORDER )
Date: March 16, 2018STIPULATION - DISCONTINUANCE (POST RJI)
Date: May 21, 2019ANSWER
Date: June 23, 2014ORDER - NO OPP SUMMARY JUDGMENT (PROPOSED)
Date: July 07, 2015NOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #010)
Date: January 15, 2016AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT (Motion #010)
Date: January 15, 2016ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE ( PROPOSED ) (Motion #008)
Date: December 29, 2015ORDER - NO OPP SUMMARY JUDGMENT (PROPOSED)
Date: May 23, 2017COMPLAINT (AMENDED)
Date: January 11, 2017NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF MOTION / ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE (Motion #010)
Date: January 22, 2016MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN SUPPORT (Motion #010)
Date: January 15, 2016NOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #007)
Date: November 05, 2015AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN REPLY (Motion #006)
Date: December 09, 2015STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: January 21, 2017ANSWER
Date: April 11, 2014STIPULATION - SO ORDERED
Date: July 10, 2015STIPULATION - DISCONTINUANCE (POST RJI)
Date: March 02, 2016ANSWER WITH CROSS-CLAIM(S)
Date: March 12, 2014AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE (Motion #008)
Date: January 08, 2016DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION (Motion #006)
Date: January 08, 2016ANSWER
Date: April 15, 2014STIPULATION - SO ORDERED
Date: December 01, 2015ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE (Motion #006)
Date: November 20, 2015STIPULATION - SO ORDERED
Date: April 13, 2015AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION (Motion #006)
Date: December 04, 2015ANSWER
Date: March 04, 2014STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING (Motion #007)
Date: November 24, 2015AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION (Motion #006)
Date: December 04, 2015NOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #001)
Date: November 18, 2014STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: February 24, 2014ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE (Motion #008)
Date: January 07, 2016ANSWER
Date: February 06, 2014NOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #004)
Date: February 20, 2015ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE - CONFORMED COPY (Motion #008)
Date: December 30, 2015DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION (Motion #001)
Date: May 08, 2015STIPULATION - DISCONTINUANCE (POST RJI)
Date: May 17, 2016AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION (Motion #001)
Date: November 18, 2014ANSWER
Date: February 21, 2014ORDER - ADMINISTRATIVE *Corrected*
Date: September 16, 2015AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT (Motion #008)
Date: December 30, 2015DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION (Motion #003)
Date: May 08, 2015NOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #003)
Date: November 18, 2014STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: March 19, 2014DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION (Motion #004)
Date: July 07, 2015STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: January 23, 2017ANSWER
Date: March 07, 2014ANSWER
Date: April 09, 2014STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: August 05, 2015AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION (Motion #004)
Date: February 20, 2015STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: February 28, 2014ORDER - OTHER
Date: January 13, 2016ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE - CONFORMED COPY (Motion #006)
Date: November 20, 2015AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION (Motion #010)
Date: January 19, 2016STIPULATION - DISCONTINUANCE (POST RJI)
Date: June 29, 2016ANSWER WITH CROSS-CLAIM(S)
Date: March 11, 2014STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING (Motion #005)
Date: June 18, 2015ANSWER
Date: May 23, 2014ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE (Motion #005)
Date: June 23, 2015AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION (Motion #007)
Date: November 05, 2015STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: February 05, 2014STIPULATION - SO ORDERED
Date: March 27, 2015AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION (Motion #003)
Date: November 18, 2014STIPULATION - SO ORDERED
Date: September 28, 2015AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION (Motion #006)
Date: October 28, 2015DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION (Motion #002)
Date: May 08, 2015AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF PROPOSED OSC/EXPARTE APP (Motion #009)
Date: January 15, 2016STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING (Motion #007)
Date: November 05, 2015AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION (Motion #009)
Date: January 19, 2016DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION (Motion #010)
Date: January 26, 2016AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION (Motion #002)
Date: November 18, 2014DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION (Motion #005)
Date: July 21, 2015ANSWER
Date: May 23, 2014DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION (Motion #009)
Date: January 22, 2016ANSWER
Date: March 17, 2014STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: February 14, 2014STIPULATION - DISCONTINUANCE (POST RJI)
Date: February 14, 2017STIPULATION - SO ORDERED
Date: July 21, 2015AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF PROPOSED OSC/EXPARTE APP (Motion #005)
Date: June 18, 2015STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: February 06, 2014DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION (Motion #007)
Date: November 25, 2015AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE (Motion #008)
Date: January 11, 2016STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: March 14, 2014NOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #002)
Date: November 18, 2014DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION (Motion #008)
Date: January 13, 2016NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF MOTION / ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE (Motion #007)
Date: November 24, 2015STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: May 12, 2014STIPULATION - DISCONTINUANCE (POST RJI)
Date: December 09, 2016STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: February 21, 2014STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: February 10, 2014AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT (Motion #008)
Date: December 29, 2015Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 21, 2019 | Docket Event |
STIPULATION - DISCONTINUANCE (POST RJI) Weil-McLain's Stipulation of Discontinuance |
|
March 16, 2018 | Docket Event |
STIPULATION - DISCONTINUANCE ( REQUEST TO SO ORDER ) Executed Stipulation Discontinuing Action with Prejudice as to American Biltrite Inc. (to be So Orde |
|
May 23, 2017 | Docket Event |
ORDER - NO OPP SUMMARY JUDGMENT (PROPOSED) as to Defenant Zy-Tech Global Industries, Inc. |
|
February 14, 2017 | Docket Event |
STIPULATION - DISCONTINUANCE (POST RJI) Burnham's Stipulation of Discontinuance |
|
January 24, 2017 | Docket Event |
ACKNOWLEDGEMENT OF SERVICE Union Carbide Corporation |
|
January 23, 2017 | Docket Event | STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING | |
January 23, 2017 | Docket Event | AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE | |
January 21, 2017 | Docket Event | STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING | |
January 21, 2017 | Docket Event | AFFIDAVIT | |
January 11, 2017 | Docket Event |
COMPLAINT (AMENDED) Amended Summons and Complaint |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.