Case Last Refreshed: 2 months ago
Chrislie Foster, William Foster, filed a(n) Mass Torts - Torts case represented by Wasserberg, Daniel Joshua, against 3M Company, Foster Wheeler, L.L.C., International Paper Company, Paramount Global F K A Viacomcbs, Inc. F K A Cbs Corporation, A Delaware Corporation, F K A Viacom Inc., Successor By Merger To Cbs Corporation, A Pennsylvania Corporation, F K A Westinghouse Electric Corporation, Pfizer, Inc., (total of 7) See All represented by Gasior, Joan M., Mchugh, Timothy J, O'Leary, Richard Patrick, Rice, Matthew James, Tanenbaum, Michael A, (total of 6) See All in the jurisdiction of New York County. This case was filed in New York County Superior Courts with Adam Silvera presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeAdam Silvera Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJanuary 17, 2023 |
CategoryTorts - Asbestos |
Last RefreshedJanuary 28, 2024 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationNew York County, NY |
Matter TypeMass Torts |
NOTICE OF ENTRY Â (Motion #001)
Date: November 14, 2023DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION
Date: November 13, 2023ACKNOWLEDGEMENT OF SERVICE
Date: February 21, 2023RJI -RE: NOTICE OF MOTION
Date: August 28, 2023ANSWER
Date: February 17, 2023ADDENDUM - GENERAL (840A)
Date: August 28, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #001)
Date: August 28, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - B Â (Motion #001)
Date: August 28, 2023AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION Â (Motion #001)
Date: August 28, 2023AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION Â (Motion #001)
Date: August 28, 2023ANSWER
Date: February 13, 2023ACKNOWLEDGEMENT OF SERVICE
Date: February 03, 2023NOTICE OF MOTION Â (Motion #001)
Date: August 28, 2023ANSWER
Date: February 13, 2023ANSWER
Date: January 27, 2023SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: January 17, 2023Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
November 14, 2023 |
NOTICE OF ENTRY (Motion #001) Notice of Entry of Decision and Order on Motion |
||
November 13, 2023 | DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION | ||
August 28, 2023 | RJI -RE: NOTICE OF MOTION | ||
August 28, 2023 | ADDENDUM - GENERAL (840A) | ||
August 28, 2023 |
EXHIBIT(S) - A (Motion #001) Certificate of Good Standing.- Maryland |
||
August 28, 2023 |
EXHIBIT(S) - B (Motion #001) Certificate of Good Standing - District of Columbia |
||
August 28, 2023 |
AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION (Motion #001) Affidavit of Lauren E. Lacey, Esq. |
||
August 28, 2023 |
AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION (Motion #001) Affirmation of Richard P. O'Leary, Esq. |
||
August 28, 2023 |
NOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #001) for Admission of Lauren E. Lacey, Esq., Pro Hac Vice. |
||
February 21, 2023 |
ACKNOWLEDGEMENT OF SERVICE of Plaintiffs' Complaint on behalf of Standard Motor Products, Inc. |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.