Case Last Refreshed: 11 months ago
Patrick Sammartino Christina Sammartino, As Executrix For The Estate Of Patrick Sammartino, filed a(n) Mass Torts - Torts case represented by Comerford, Thomas M, Ortiz, Frank M., against Amchem Products, Inc.,, American Biltrite Inc.,, Azrock Industries,, Burnham, Llc,, Cbs Corporation, F K A Viacom Inc.,, (total of 21) See All represented by Bain, Andrew Foster, Chaudhri-Dewit, Shazia, Chen, Amy Yinghong, Cook, Kerryann Marie, Corbin, Steven Thomas, (total of 20) See All in the jurisdiction of New York County. This case was filed in New York County Superior Courts New York County Supreme Court with Manuel J. Mendez presiding.
Case Number |
||
Filing DateJanuary 10, 2014 |
CategoryAsbestos |
|
Last RefreshedAugust 01, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
|
Filing LocationNew York County, NY |
Matter TypeMass Torts |
|
Filing Court HouseNew York County Supreme Court |
Case Outcome TypeDisposed |
Case Cycle Time2372 days |
ORDER - NO OPP SUMMARY JUDGMENT (PROPOSED)
Date: June 06, 2017ORDER ( PROPOSED )
Date: September 05, 2017ORDER - NO OPP SUMMARY JUDGMENT (PROPOSED)
Date: June 28, 2016ORDER - NO OPP SUMMARY JUDGMENT (PROPOSED)
Date: January 13, 2017LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE
Date: October 13, 2017LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE
Date: June 06, 2017ORDER - NO OPP SUMMARY JUDGMENT (PROPOSED)
Date: February 04, 2015SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: January 10, 2014LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE
Date: October 13, 2017LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE
Date: September 05, 2017ORDER - NO OPP SUMMARY JUDGMENT (PROPOSED)
Date: October 21, 2016ORDER - OTHER
Date: May 31, 2017ORDER - NO OPP SUMMARY JUDGMENT (PROPOSED)
Date: November 29, 2016LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE
Date: June 28, 2016ORDER - NO OPP SUMMARY JUDGMENT (PROPOSED)
Date: February 04, 2015ANSWER
Date: February 26, 2014LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE
Date: October 13, 2017ORDER - NO OPP SUMMARY JUDGMENT (PROPOSED)
Date: October 14, 2014ORDER - NO OPP SUMMARY JUDGMENT (PROPOSED)
Date: October 21, 2016ORDER - NO OPP SUMMARY JUDGMENT (PROPOSED)
Date: October 30, 2019ORDER - NO OPP SUMMARY JUDGMENT (PROPOSED)
Date: September 12, 2016ANSWER WITH CROSS-CLAIM(S)
Date: February 21, 2014ANSWER
Date: March 10, 2014STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: May 31, 2016ANSWER
Date: February 06, 2014ANSWER
Date: February 27, 2014ANSWER
Date: February 21, 2014STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: February 06, 2014ORDER - OTHER
Date: October 18, 2016STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: February 07, 2014STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: June 28, 2016ORDER - OTHER
Date: June 19, 2017ANSWER
Date: March 12, 2014STIPULATION - SO ORDERED
Date: April 21, 2016LETTER/CORRESPONDENCE - SO ORDERED
Date: January 18, 2017ORDER ( PROPOSED )
Date: May 31, 2016ORDER - OTHER
Date: January 23, 2017ORDER - OTHER
Date: April 19, 2017STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: March 13, 2014ORDER - OTHER
Date: September 23, 2016ANSWER
Date: February 28, 2014ORDER - OTHER
Date: April 10, 2017ORDER - OTHER
Date: November 20, 2019ORDER - OTHER
Date: April 28, 2017STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: March 10, 2014Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 09, 2020 | Hearing |
ADJOURNED IAS PART 13 10:00 A BLOCKBUSTER Judge: MENDEZ, MANUEL J. |
|
July 09, 2020 | Hearing |
SETTLED BEFORE TRIAL REMOTE CONFERENCE PART 10:00 AM SKYPE CONFERENCE Judge: MENDEZ, MANUEL J. |
|
March 19, 2020 | Docket Event | URGENT - COURT APPEARANCE UPDATE | |
November 20, 2019 | Docket Event | ORDER - OTHER | |
October 30, 2019 | Docket Event |
ORDER - NO OPP SUMMARY JUDGMENT (PROPOSED) Filed on behalf of Burnham LLC |
|
October 30, 2019 | Docket Event |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Filed on behalf of Burnham LLC |
|
June 06, 2018 | Hearing |
PRETRIAL CONFERENCE HELD IAS TRIAL READY 13 2:15PM Judge: MENDEZ, MANUEL J. |
|
May 09, 2018 | Hearing |
TRIAL READY CASE ADJOURNED IAS TRIAL READY 13 2:15PM Judge: MENDEZ, MANUEL J. |
|
April 04, 2018 | Hearing |
TRIAL READY CASE ADJOURNED IAS TRIAL READY 13 2:15PM Judge: MENDEZ, MANUEL J. |
|
January 10, 2018 | Hearing |
TRIAL READY CASE ADJOURNED IAS TRIAL READY 13 2:15PM Judge: MENDEZ, MANUEL J. |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.