Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Mohammad Yasin, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Bhatta, Dilli Raj, Subin, Herbert S, against Manhattan And Bronx Surface Transportation Operating Authority, Metropolitan Transportation Authority, Mta Bus Company, New York City Transit Authority, Pawel Matyskiel, (total of 5) See All represented by Berkson, James Howard, Fenstermacher, Erica Whitney, Nash, Jeffrey, in the jurisdiction of New York County. This case was filed in New York County Superior Courts New York County Supreme Court with Denise Dominguez presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 20, 2019 |
CategoryTorts - Motor Vehicle |
Last RefreshedOctober 23, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationNew York County, NY |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
Filing Court HouseNew York County Supreme Court |
SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: December 20, 2019STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: December 20, 2019STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: January 03, 2020ANSWER
Date: January 27, 2020STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: May 06, 2020NOTICE OF MOTION
Date: May 06, 2020AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION
Date: May 06, 2020STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: January 09, 2020STIPULATION - ADJOURNMENT OF MOTION -IN SUBMISSIONS PART -RM 130 Â (Motion #001)
Date: July 21, 2020RJI -RE: NOTICE OF MOTION
Date: May 06, 2020PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE REQUEST
Date: May 20, 2020EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #001)
Date: May 06, 2020AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: January 17, 2020AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: January 03, 2020AFFIRMATION OF GOOD FAITH Â (Motion #002)
Date: May 27, 2022AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Â (Motion #001)
Date: February 04, 2021NOTICE OF MOTION Â (Motion #002)
Date: May 27, 2022LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE Â (Motion #001)
Date: February 04, 2021AFFIRMATION Â (Motion #002)
Date: May 27, 2022AFFIRMATION Â (Motion #002)
Date: May 27, 2022LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE
Date: November 17, 2021AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION
Date: June 10, 2022NO FEE AUTHORIZATION (LETTER/ORDER/AFFIRMATION) Â (Motion #002)
Date: May 27, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - F Â (Motion #002)
Date: May 27, 2022STIPULATION - ADJOURNMENT OF MOTION -IN SUBMISSIONS PART -RM 130 Â (Motion #001)
Date: September 22, 2020EXHIBIT(S) Â - C Â (Motion #001)
Date: May 06, 2020AFFIDAVIT
Date: January 09, 2020STIPULATION - ADJOURNMENT OF MOTION -IN SUBMISSIONS PART -RM 130 Â (Motion #001)
Date: September 25, 2020ORDER - PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE
Date: October 26, 2020EXHIBIT(S) Â - N Â (Motion #002)
Date: May 27, 2022STIPULATION - ADJOURNMENT OF MOTION -IN SUBMISSIONS PART -RM 130 Â (Motion #001)
Date: December 07, 2020AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION Â (Motion #001)
Date: February 04, 2021NOTICE OF APPEARANCE (PRE RJI)
Date: September 16, 2020STIPULATION - ADJOURNMENT OF MOTION -IN SUBMISSIONS PART -RM 130
Date: December 16, 2020RESPONSE TO DEMAND
Date: November 02, 2020EXHIBIT(S) Â - K Â (Motion #002)
Date: May 27, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - L Â (Motion #002)
Date: May 27, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - P Â (Motion #002)
Date: May 27, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - M Â (Motion #002)
Date: May 27, 2022STIPULATION - SO ORDERED
Date: October 06, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - H Â (Motion #003)
Date: September 01, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - B Â (Motion #001)
Date: February 04, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - U Â (Motion #002)
Date: May 27, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - R Â (Motion #002)
Date: May 27, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - Q Â (Motion #002)
Date: May 27, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - S Â (Motion #002)
Date: May 27, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - D Â (Motion #001)
Date: February 04, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - C Â (Motion #001)
Date: February 04, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #002)
Date: June 10, 2022LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE
Date: November 19, 2021NOTE OF ISSUE:WITH JURY
Date: May 09, 2022AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Â (Motion #003)
Date: September 01, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - C Â (Motion #004)
Date: September 02, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - M Â (Motion #004)
Date: September 02, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - D Â (Motion #004)
Date: September 02, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - N Â (Motion #004)
Date: September 02, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - L Â (Motion #004) Ex. L Plaintiff's 11.19.19 Statutory Hearing Transcript
Date: September 02, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - E Â (Motion #004)
Date: September 02, 2022STIPULATION - ADJOURNMENT OF MOTION -IN SUBMISSIONS PART -RM 130
Date: September 02, 2022NOTICE OF MOTION Â (Motion #004)
Date: September 02, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - F Â (Motion #004)
Date: September 02, 2022DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION
Date: November 10, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - I Â (Motion #003) Ex. I - Plaintiff's statutory hearing transcript
Date: September 01, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - J Â (Motion #003)
Date: September 01, 2022NO FEE AUTHORIZATION (LETTER/ORDER/AFFIRMATION)
Date: September 01, 2022AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Â (Motion #003)
Date: September 01, 2022ORDER - OTHER (MOTION RELATED)
Date: November 10, 2022AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT Â (Motion #003)
Date: September 01, 2022ORDER ( PROPOSED )
Date: August 18, 2022MEMORANDUM OF LAW Â (Motion #003)
Date: September 01, 2022AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN REPLY Â (Motion #002)
Date: June 27, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - B Â (Motion #003)
Date: September 01, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #003)
Date: September 01, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - C Â (Motion #003)
Date: September 01, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - O Â (Motion #002)
Date: May 27, 2022NOTICE OF APPEARANCE (POST RJI)
Date: May 23, 2022NOTICE OF MOTION Â (Motion #003)
Date: September 01, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - E Â (Motion #003)
Date: September 01, 2022STATEMENT OF MATERIAL FACTS Â (Motion #003)
Date: September 01, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - D Â (Motion #003)
Date: September 01, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - F Â (Motion #003)
Date: September 01, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - G Â (Motion #003)
Date: September 01, 2022AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: May 06, 2020EXHIBIT(S) Â - B Â (Motion #001)
Date: May 06, 2020EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #002)
Date: May 27, 2022STIPULATION - ADJOURNMENT OF MOTION - BEFORE JUDGE Â (Motion #001)
Date: February 05, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - B Â (Motion #002)
Date: May 27, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - C Â (Motion #002)
Date: May 27, 2022ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE - DECLINED/WITHDRAWN Â (Motion #001)
Date: February 23, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - D Â (Motion #002)
Date: May 27, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - E Â (Motion #002)
Date: May 27, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - G Â (Motion #002)
Date: May 27, 2022NOTICE OF ENTRY Â (Motion #001)
Date: March 04, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - H Â (Motion #002)
Date: May 27, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - I Â (Motion #002)
Date: May 27, 2022STIPULATION - OTHER - ( REQUEST TO SO ORDER )
Date: September 23, 2021STATEMENT OF MATERIAL FACTS Â (Motion #004)
Date: September 02, 2022STIPULATION - ADJOURNMENT OF MOTION -IN SUBMISSIONS PART -RM 130
Date: September 15, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - P Â (Motion #004)
Date: September 02, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - J Â (Motion #002)
Date: May 27, 2022AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION
Date: November 10, 2022STIPULATION - ADJOURNMENT OF MOTION -IN SUBMISSIONS PART -RM 130
Date: October 04, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - O Â (Motion #004)
Date: September 02, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - T Â (Motion #002)
Date: May 27, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - B Â (Motion #004)
Date: September 02, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - K Â (Motion #004)
Date: September 02, 2022STATEMENT OF MATERIAL FACTS Â (Motion #003)
Date: September 01, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - G Â (Motion #004)
Date: September 02, 2022AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT Â (Motion #004)
Date: September 02, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - H Â (Motion #004)
Date: September 02, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - R Â (Motion #004)
Date: September 02, 2022MEMORANDUM OF LAW Â (Motion #004)
Date: September 02, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - Q Â (Motion #004)
Date: September 02, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - V Â (Motion #004)
Date: September 02, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - S Â (Motion #004)
Date: September 02, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - I Â (Motion #004)
Date: September 02, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #004)
Date: September 02, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - J Â (Motion #004)
Date: September 02, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - T Â (Motion #004)
Date: September 02, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - U Â (Motion #004)
Date: September 02, 2022AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Â (Motion #004)
Date: September 02, 2022NO FEE AUTHORIZATION (LETTER/ORDER/AFFIRMATION) Â (Motion #004)
Date: September 02, 2022STATEMENT OF MATERIAL FACTS Â (Motion #003)
Date: November 10, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - K Â (Motion #003)
Date: November 16, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - B Â (Motion #003)
Date: November 16, 2022AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN REPLY Â (Motion #003)
Date: November 16, 2022AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Â (Motion #003)
Date: November 16, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #003)
Date: November 16, 2022ORDER - OTHER (MOTION RELATED)
Date: December 06, 2022STIPULATION - ADJOURNMENT OF MOTION -IN SUBMISSIONS PART -RM 130
Date: December 06, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - B Â (Motion #004)
Date: December 09, 2022AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION Â (Motion #004)
Date: December 09, 2022ADJOURNMENT OF MOTION -REQUEST - BEFORE JUDGE Â (Motion #002)
Date: December 02, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #004)
Date: December 09, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - C Â (Motion #004)
Date: December 09, 2022AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN REPLY Â (Motion #004)
Date: December 15, 2022DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION
Date: October 18, 2023NOTICE OF ENTRY
Date: October 17, 2023AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN REPLY Â (Motion #004)
Date: June 28, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - C Â (Motion #004)
Date: June 28, 2023AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Â (Motion #004)
Date: June 28, 2023ORDER - INTERIM (MOTION RELATED)
Date: June 02, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #004)
Date: June 28, 2023Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 18, 2023 | DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION | ||
October 18, 2023 |
NOTICE OF APPEAL (Motion #003) Plaintiff's Notice of Appeal + Informational Statement pursuant to NYCRR 1250.3 [a] + Affidavit of Plaintiff's Notice of Appeal + Informational Statement pursuant to NYCRR 1250.3 [a] + Affidavit of ... show more |
||
October 17, 2023 |
NOTICE OF ENTRY Decision and Order with Notice of Entry |
||
June 28, 2023 |
AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN REPLY (Motion #004) Supplemental Affirmation in Reply - 6.28.23 |
||
June 28, 2023 |
EXHIBIT(S) - C (Motion #004) Ex. C - Envelope from PCsel video exchange |
||
June 28, 2023 |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE (Motion #004) Affirmation of Service - Supp Reply - 6.28.23 |
||
June 28, 2023 |
EXHIBIT(S) - A (Motion #004) Ex. A - Letter to Court with courtesy copy of video |
||
June 28, 2023 |
EXHIBIT(S) - B (Motion #004) Ex. B - Screenshots from PCsel video |
||
June 02, 2023 | ORDER - INTERIM (MOTION RELATED) | ||
December 15, 2022 |
AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN REPLY (Motion #004) Affirmation in Reply - Threshold Motion |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.