Case Last Refreshed: 9 months ago
Tammy Delever, filed a(n) Economic Torts - Torts case represented by Thompson, Walter John, against One Taste Inc., represented by Berman, Marjorie E, in the jurisdiction of New York County. This case was filed in New York County Superior Courts New York County Supreme Court with Barbara Jaffe presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeBarbara Jaffe Track Judge’s New Cases |
|
Filing DateNovember 29, 2018 |
CategoryTorts - Other (Sexual Assault, Fraud) |
|
Last RefreshedJuly 27, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions288 days |
Filing LocationNew York County, NY |
Matter TypeEconomic Torts |
|
Filing Court HouseNew York County Supreme Court |
Case Outcome TypeDisposed |
Case Cycle Time240 days |
MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN SUPPORT (Motion #002)
Date: March 13, 2019AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION (Motion #002)
Date: April 01, 2019JUDGMENT -TO COURT (PROPOSED)
Date: September 17, 2019DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION (Motion #002)
Date: July 31, 2019NOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #002)
Date: March 13, 2019MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN OPPOSITION (Motion #002)
Date: April 01, 2019AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT (Motion #002)
Date: March 13, 2019MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN REPLY (Motion #002)
Date: April 16, 2019STIPULATION - BRIEFING SCHEDULE (Motion #002)
Date: March 26, 2019COMPLAINT (AMENDED) *Corrected*
Date: March 04, 2019STIPULATION - AMENDING CAPTION
Date: February 14, 2019AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE (Motion #001)
Date: February 07, 2019STIPULATION - TIME TO ANSWER
Date: January 29, 2019DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION (Motion #001)
Date: January 22, 2019ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE - ACCOMPANYING COMMENCEMENT DOC(S) (PROPOSED) (Motion #001)
Date: January 17, 2019STIPULATION - TIME TO ANSWER
Date: December 18, 2018STIPULATION - OTHER
Date: December 14, 2018SUMMONS + COMPLAINT *Corrected*
Date: December 07, 2018Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 17, 2019 | Docket Event |
JUDGMENT -TO COURT (PROPOSED) Proposed Judgment |
|
September 17, 2019 | Docket Event | BILL OF COSTS (PROPOSED) | |
August 01, 2019 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF ENTRY (Motion #002) | |
July 31, 2019 | Docket Event | DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION (Motion #002) | |
June 05, 2019 | Docket Event | TRANSCRIPT OF PROCEEDINGS (Motion #002) | |
May 22, 2019 | Hearing |
FULLY SUBMITTED (Motion #002) IAS MOTION 12 10:30AM 10:30AM Judge: JAFFE, BARBARA |
|
April 17, 2019 | Hearing |
ORAL ARGUMENT (60 CENTRE) (Motion #002) E-FILING SUBMISSIONS CALENDAR STIP 10:30AM Judge: JAFFE, BARBARA |
|
April 16, 2019 | Docket Event |
MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN REPLY (Motion #002) One Taste, Inc's Reply Memorandum in Further Support of Motion to Dismiss the Complaint |
|
April 01, 2019 | Docket Event | AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION (Motion #002) | |
April 01, 2019 | Docket Event | MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN OPPOSITION (Motion #002) |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.