Case Last Refreshed: 3 months ago
West 60Th Street Associates, Llc, filed a(n) Special Proceedings - Other (Article 52 &Amp; Dcl) case represented by Gold, Elie Brandon, Vink, Paul T., against Beauty By B Ny 2023 Llc, Bianca Maier, Cigar Lounge 2023 26Th Street Llc, Hapoel Fe Llc A K A Happen Fe Llc, Jonathan Drory, (total of 9) See All represented by Kobre, Ethan Allen, in the jurisdiction of New York County. This case was filed in New York County Superior Courts with Arlene P. Bluth presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateOctober 24, 2023 |
CategorySpecial Proceedings - Other (Article 52 &Amp; Dcl) |
Last RefreshedJanuary 25, 2024 |
|
Filing LocationNew York County, NY |
|
This is a complaint for equitable relief seeking 1) voidable transfers to avoid paying a judgment to petitioner, who they defrauded into leasing property, and 2) attachment, restraint, and recovery of attorney fees (Pursuant to Debtor and Creditor La...
EXHIBIT(S) Â - D Â (Motion #002)
Date: November 24, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #002)
Date: November 24, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - B Â (Motion #002)
Date: November 24, 2023LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE Â (Motion #001)
Date: November 24, 2023LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE
Date: January 22, 2024LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE Â (Motion #004)
Date: January 22, 2024EXHIBIT(S) Â - MM Â (Motion #001)
Date: January 18, 2024ADJOURNMENT OF MOTION -REQUEST - BEFORE JUDGE
Date: January 19, 2024EXHIBIT(S) Â - TT Â (Motion #001)
Date: January 18, 2024EXHIBIT(S) Â - 2 Â (Motion #004)
Date: December 15, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - LL Â (Motion #001)
Date: January 18, 2024LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE
Date: January 19, 2024EXHIBIT(S) Â - RR Â (Motion #001)
Date: January 18, 2024EXHIBIT(S) Â - 1 Â (Motion #004)
Date: December 15, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - RR Â (Motion #004)
Date: January 18, 2024EXHIBIT(S) Â - PP Â (Motion #001)
Date: January 18, 2024EXHIBIT(S) Â - JJ Â (Motion #001)
Date: January 18, 2024BOND/UNDERTAKING
Date: November 09, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - II Â (Motion #001)
Date: January 18, 2024EXHIBIT(S) Â - SS Â (Motion #001)
Date: January 18, 2024EXHIBIT(S) Â - 3 Â (Motion #004)
Date: December 15, 2023AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN REPLY Â (Motion #001)
Date: January 18, 2024EXHIBIT(S) Â - QQ Â (Motion #004)
Date: January 18, 2024EXPARTE ORDER (PROPOSED)
Date: November 24, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - OO Â (Motion #001)
Date: January 18, 2024ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE
Date: October 31, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 1 Â (Motion #004)
Date: December 15, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - TT Â (Motion #004)
Date: January 18, 2024EXHIBIT(S) Â - NN Â (Motion #001)
Date: January 18, 2024EXHIBIT(S) Â - II Â (Motion #004)
Date: January 18, 2024ORDER - OTHER (MOTION RELATED)
Date: November 27, 2023AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN REPLY Â (Motion #001)
Date: January 18, 2024OTHER COURT FILED DOCUMENT
Date: November 27, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - PP Â (Motion #004)
Date: January 18, 2024EXHIBIT(S) Â - SS Â (Motion #004)
Date: January 18, 2024EXHIBIT(S) Â - NN Â (Motion #004)
Date: January 18, 2024LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE
Date: November 24, 2023ORDER - EXPARTE Â (Motion #003)
Date: November 27, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - OO Â (Motion #004)
Date: January 18, 2024LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE Â (Motion #001)
Date: January 08, 2024ORDER - EXPARTE Â (Motion #002)
Date: November 27, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 1 Â (Motion #001)
Date: December 15, 2023AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION
Date: December 15, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 3 Â (Motion #001)
Date: December 15, 2023AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF PROPOSED OSC/EXPARTE APP
Date: November 24, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - C Â (Motion #002)
Date: November 24, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 1 Â (Motion #001)
Date: December 15, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 2 Â (Motion #001)
Date: December 15, 2023ORDER - OTHER (NON-MOTION)
Date: January 18, 2024AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF PROPOSED OSC/EXPARTE APP *Corrected*
Date: October 24, 2023STIPULATION - OTHER - ( REQUEST TO SO ORDER )
Date: January 17, 2024ORDER - OTHER (MOTION RELATED)
Date: January 10, 2024EXHIBIT(S) Â - MM Â (Motion #004)
Date: January 18, 2024ADJOURNMENT OF MOTION -REQUEST -IN SUBMISSIONS PART -RM 130
Date: January 10, 2024LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE
Date: January 09, 2024EXHIBIT(S) Â - 2 Â (Motion #001)
Date: December 15, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - LL Â (Motion #004)
Date: January 18, 2024ADJOURNMENT OF MOTION -OPPOSITION TO REQUEST - BEFORE JUDGE Â (Motion #001)
Date: November 24, 2023ADJOURNMENT OF MOTION -REQUEST - BEFORE JUDGE
Date: November 24, 2023AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION
Date: December 15, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 3 Â (Motion #004)
Date: December 15, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 1 Â (Motion #004)
Date: December 15, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 2 Â (Motion #004)
Date: December 15, 2023NOTICE OF MOTION
Date: December 15, 2023RJI -RE: ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE
Date: October 24, 2023MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN SUPPORT
Date: October 24, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #003)
Date: November 24, 2023AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF PROPOSED OSC/EXPARTE APP
Date: October 24, 2023ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE - ACCOMPANYING COMMENCEMENT DOC(S) (PROPOSED) Â (Motion #001)
Date: October 24, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - DD
Date: October 24, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - GG
Date: October 24, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - Z
Date: October 24, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - CC
Date: October 24, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - BB
Date: October 24, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - EE
Date: October 24, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - AA
Date: October 24, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - W
Date: October 24, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - V
Date: October 24, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - U
Date: October 24, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - T
Date: October 24, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - S
Date: October 24, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - R
Date: October 24, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - Q
Date: October 24, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - P
Date: October 24, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - O
Date: October 24, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - N
Date: October 24, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - M
Date: October 24, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - L
Date: October 24, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - K
Date: October 24, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - J
Date: October 24, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - I
Date: October 24, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - C
Date: October 24, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - H
Date: October 24, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - G
Date: October 24, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - F
Date: October 24, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - B
Date: October 24, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - E
Date: October 24, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - D
Date: October 24, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - A
Date: October 24, 2023PETITION
Date: October 24, 2023ADJOURNMENT OF MOTION -REQUEST - BEFORE JUDGE
Date: January 22, 2024EXHIBIT(S) Â - QQ Â (Motion #001)
Date: January 18, 2024AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN REPLY Â (Motion #001)
Date: January 18, 2024EXHIBIT(S) Â - JJ Â (Motion #004)
Date: January 18, 2024EXHIBIT(S) Â - 3 Â (Motion #001)
Date: December 15, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 1 Â (Motion #001)
Date: December 15, 2023Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 22, 2024 | LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE | ||
January 22, 2024 |
LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE (Motion #004) Response to adjournment request |
||
January 22, 2024 | ADJOURNMENT OF MOTION -REQUEST - BEFORE JUDGE | ||
January 19, 2024 | ADJOURNMENT OF MOTION -REQUEST - BEFORE JUDGE | ||
January 19, 2024 | LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE | ||
January 18, 2024 |
EXHIBIT(S) - MM (Motion #001) Amex statements show Ohana has been commingling with Drory Jr long before Templehof |
||
January 18, 2024 |
EXHIBIT(S) - TT (Motion #001) Motions to quash where Drory Sr used Drory Jr to obstruct subpoenas |
||
January 18, 2024 |
EXHIBIT(S) - LL (Motion #001) Supplemental Bank Records for $96,377.08 in withdrawals |
||
January 18, 2024 |
EXHIBIT(S) - KK (Motion #001) April 2023 - October 2023 Statements showing $24,732 in Zelles to Ohana and $52,098.79 on Drory Jr.' April 2023 - October 2023 Statements showing $24,732 in Zelles to Ohana and $52,098.79 on Drory Jr.' ... show more |
||
January 18, 2024 |
EXHIBIT(S) - RR (Motion #001) Judgment against Drory Sr identifying him as a "debtor" |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.