Case Last Refreshed: 9 months ago
In The Matter Of The Application Of Hitchcock Plaza Inc., filed a(n) Agency Action - Administrative case represented by Bittner, Jillian Nicole, against New York State Division Of Housing And Community Renewal, represented by Joseph, Sandra A., in the jurisdiction of New York County. This case was filed in New York County Superior Courts with Lori S. Sattler presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateNovember 22, 2022 |
CategorySpecial Proceedings - Cplr Article 78 |
Last RefreshedJuly 26, 2023 |
Practice AreaAdministrative |
Filing LocationNew York County, NY |
Matter TypeAgency Action |
EXHIBIT(S) Â - D
Date: November 22, 2022RJI -RE: NOTICE OF PETITION
Date: November 22, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - A
Date: November 22, 2022NOTICE OF PETITION ACCOMPANYING COMMENCEMENT DOC(S) Â (Motion #001)
Date: November 22, 2022PETITION
Date: November 22, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - B
Date: November 22, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - C
Date: November 22, 2022AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Â (Motion #001)
Date: November 28, 2022STIPULATION - ADJOURNMENT OF MOTION -IN SUBMISSIONS PART -RM 130
Date: December 22, 2022AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: December 05, 2022ANSWER IN SPECIAL PROCEEDING Â (Motion #001)
Date: January 18, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - B
Date: January 18, 2023AFFIRMATION
Date: January 18, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - C
Date: January 18, 2023MEMORANDUM
Date: January 18, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - A
Date: January 18, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - D
Date: January 18, 2023AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN REPLY Â (Motion #001)
Date: February 15, 2023Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 15, 2023 |
AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN REPLY (Motion #001) Reply Affirmation |
||
January 18, 2023 |
ANSWER IN SPECIAL PROCEEDING (Motion #001) Verified Answer & Verification |
||
January 18, 2023 |
EXHIBIT(S) - B rent administrator's order |
||
January 18, 2023 |
AFFIRMATION Answering Affirmation |
||
January 18, 2023 |
EXHIBIT(S) - C Owner's Deregulation Petition |
||
January 18, 2023 |
MEMORANDUM MOL |
||
January 18, 2023 |
EXHIBIT(S) - A DHCR ORDER |
||
January 18, 2023 |
EXHIBIT(S) - D Owner's Par |
||
December 22, 2022 |
STIPULATION - ADJOURNMENT OF MOTION -IN SUBMISSIONS PART -RM 130 Stipulation of Adjournment |
||
December 05, 2022 |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Affidavit of Service, NYAG |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.