Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Rockwood Owners Corp. And 20 East 68Th Street Condominium, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Valentino, Rosalie C, against Errol Rainess, Jane Doe, John Doe, in the jurisdiction of New York County, NY, . New York County, NY Superior Courts with Shlomo S. Hagler presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeShlomo S. Hagler Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateNovember 16, 2020 |
CategoryOther Matters - Contract - Other |
Last RefreshedOctober 10, 2023 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationNew York County, NY |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE
Date: November 20, 2020TRANSCRIPT OF PROCEEDINGS - CERTIFIED
Date: April 20, 2021DECISION ON MOTION -SUBMIT ORD / JGMT
Date: August 09, 2021NOTICE OF ENTRY
Date: August 09, 2021AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Â (Motion #001)
Date: October 25, 2021NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT W/PROPOSED ORDER/COUNTER ORDER Â (Motion #001)
Date: July 28, 2021ORDER - MOTION - LONG FORM
Date: October 28, 2021NOTICE OF ENTRY
Date: October 25, 2021TRANSCRIPT OF PROCEEDINGS Â (Motion #001)
Date: October 08, 2021AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: August 09, 2021AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Â (Motion #001)
Date: November 30, 2020AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: July 28, 2021RJI -RE: ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE Â (Motion #001)
Date: November 20, 2020MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN SUPPORT Â (Motion #001)
Date: November 20, 2020AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF PROPOSED OSC/EXPARTE APP Â (Motion #001)
Date: November 20, 2020AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF PROPOSED OSC/EXPARTE APP Â (Motion #001)
Date: November 20, 2020AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF PROPOSED OSC/EXPARTE APP Â (Motion #001)
Date: November 20, 2020ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE ( PROPOSED ) Â (Motion #001)
Date: November 20, 2020SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: November 16, 2020Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 28, 2021 | ORDER - MOTION - LONG FORM | ||
October 25, 2021 |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE (Motion #001) Affidavit of Service- Notice of Entry |
||
October 25, 2021 | NOTICE OF ENTRY | ||
October 08, 2021 |
TRANSCRIPT OF PROCEEDINGS (Motion #001) Transcript 7/21/21 |
||
August 09, 2021 | DECISION ON MOTION -SUBMIT ORD / JGMT | ||
August 09, 2021 | NOTICE OF ENTRY | ||
August 09, 2021 | AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE | ||
July 28, 2021 |
NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT W/PROPOSED ORDER/COUNTER ORDER (Motion #001) Notice of Settlement of Order & Proposed Order |
||
July 28, 2021 | AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE | ||
April 20, 2021 |
TRANSCRIPT OF PROCEEDINGS - CERTIFIED Transcript 3/24/2021 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.