Case Last Refreshed: 3 months ago
Spring Scaffolding Llc, filed a(n) General Commercial - Commercial case represented by Bochner, Andrew David, Krimnus, Serge, Rossler, John Andrew, against Benjamin Krall, Urban Umbrella Enterprises Llc, represented by Kennell, Patrick M, in the jurisdiction of New York County. This case was filed in New York County Superior Courts with Louis L. Nock presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeLouis L. Nock Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateOctober 04, 2023 |
CategoryCommercial - Business Entity |
Last RefreshedJanuary 29, 2024 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationNew York County, NY |
Matter TypeGeneral Commercial |
This complaint is filed by Spring Scaffolding LLC against Benjamin Krall and Urban Umbrella Enterprises LLC. Spring Scaffolding is in the business of designing, manufacturing, selling, renting out, and installing sidewalk sheds and scaffolding. The c...
AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION Â (Motion #001)
Date: January 05, 2024STIPULATION - ADJOURNMENT OF MOTION -IN SUBMISSIONS PART -RM 130
Date: January 19, 2024MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN SUPPORT Â (Motion #001)
Date: January 05, 2024EXHIBIT(S) Â - F Â (Motion #001)
Date: January 05, 2024EXHIBIT(S) Â - G Â (Motion #001)
Date: January 05, 2024EXHIBIT(S) Â - E Â (Motion #001)
Date: January 05, 2024EXHIBIT(S) Â - D Â (Motion #001)
Date: January 05, 2024EXHIBIT(S) Â - C Â (Motion #001)
Date: January 05, 2024EXHIBIT(S) Â - B Â (Motion #001)
Date: January 05, 2024EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #001)
Date: January 05, 2024STIPULATION - TIME TO ANSWER
Date: December 20, 2023ADDENDUM - COMMERCIAL DIVISION (840C)
Date: December 08, 2023STIPULATION - TIME TO ANSWER
Date: November 22, 2023NOTICE OF MOTION Â (Motion #001)
Date: January 05, 2024RJI -RE: NOTICE OF MOTION
Date: December 08, 2023AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: October 31, 2023COMPLAINT
Date: October 04, 2023AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: October 31, 2023SUMMONS
Date: October 04, 2023Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 19, 2024 | STIPULATION - ADJOURNMENT OF MOTION -IN SUBMISSIONS PART -RM 130 | ||
January 05, 2024 |
AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION (Motion #001) Affirmation of Patrick M. Kennell in Support of Defendants' Motion to Dismiss or Stay |
||
January 05, 2024 |
MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN SUPPORT (Motion #001) Defendants' Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion to Dismiss or Stay |
||
January 05, 2024 |
EXHIBIT(S) - F (Motion #001) Spring's EDNY Third-Party Complaint |
||
January 05, 2024 |
EXHIBIT(S) - G (Motion #001) Spring's EDNY |
||
January 05, 2024 |
EXHIBIT(S) - E (Motion #001) Spring's EDNY Answer and Counterclaims |
||
January 05, 2024 |
EXHIBIT(S) - D (Motion #001) Urban Intelligence EDNY Second Amended Complaint |
||
January 05, 2024 |
EXHIBIT(S) - C (Motion #001) Urban Intelligence EDNY Amended Complaint |
||
January 05, 2024 |
EXHIBIT(S) - B (Motion #001) Urban Intelligence EDNY Complaint |
||
January 05, 2024 |
EXHIBIT(S) - A (Motion #001) EDNY Docket |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.