Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Otilia Lara, filed a(n) Premises Liability - Torts case represented by Markovits, Thomas P, against Citibank Na, Seward Park Housing Corp., represented by Mcspedon, Joseph, in the jurisdiction of New York County. This case was filed in New York County Superior Courts New York County Supreme Court with Barbara Jaffe presiding.
Case Number |
Time To Management161 days |
|
Filing DateNovember 15, 2016 |
CategoryTorts - Other (Trip And Fall) |
|
Last RefreshedJanuary 07, 2021 |
Practice AreaTorts |
|
Filing LocationNew York County, NY |
Matter TypePremises Liability |
|
Filing Court HouseNew York County Supreme Court |
Case Outcome TypeDisposed |
Case Cycle Time879 days |
AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION (Motion #001)
Date: September 01, 2017ORDER - TRANSFER (Motion #001)
Date: December 08, 2017STIPULATION - ADJOURNMENT OF MOTION -IN SUBMISSIONS PART -RM 130 (Motion #001)
Date: September 01, 2017SUMMONS + COMPLAINT *Corrected*
Date: November 15, 2016DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION (Motion #003)
Date: December 14, 2018NOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #001)
Date: August 04, 2017ORDER - TRANSFER (Motion #002)
Date: December 08, 2017NOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #002)
Date: September 08, 2017STIPULATION - SO ORDERED (Motion #003)
Date: August 16, 2018DEMAND FOR BILL OF PARTICULARS
Date: September 29, 2017DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION (Motion #002)
Date: February 07, 2018STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: January 27, 2017STIPULATION - DISCONTINUANCE (POST RJI)
Date: April 12, 2019ADJOURNMENT OF MOTION -REQUEST -IN SUBMISSIONS PART -RM 130 (Motion #003)
Date: September 17, 2018STIPULATION - ADJOURNMENT OF MOTION -IN SUBMISSIONS PART -RM 130 (Motion #003)
Date: September 14, 2018STIPULATION - ADJOURNMENT OF MOTION - BEFORE JUDGE (Motion #003)
Date: September 14, 2018STIPULATION - OTHER - ( REQUEST TO SO ORDER ) (Motion #003)
Date: August 16, 2018STIPULATION - ADJOURNMENT OF MOTION -IN SUBMISSIONS PART -RM 130 (Motion #003)
Date: June 04, 2018MEMORANDUM OF LAW (Motion #003)
Date: May 15, 2018AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION (Motion #003)
Date: May 15, 2018NOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #003)
Date: May 15, 2018DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION (Motion #001)
Date: February 07, 2018DEMAND FOR:
Date: September 29, 2017DEMAND FOR BILL OF PARTICULARS
Date: September 29, 2017ANSWER
Date: September 29, 2017AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION (Motion #002)
Date: September 15, 2017AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN REPLY (Motion #001)
Date: September 13, 2017AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION (Motion #002)
Date: September 08, 2017AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION (Motion #001)
Date: August 04, 2017ANSWER
Date: March 22, 2017Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 12, 2019 | Docket Event | STIPULATION - DISCONTINUANCE (POST RJI) | |
December 14, 2018 | Docket Event | DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION (Motion #003) | |
November 16, 2018 | Hearing |
FULLY SUBMITTED - NO OPP (Motion #003) E-FILING SUBMISSIONS CALENDAR SOS Judge: JAFFE, BARBARA |
|
November 14, 2018 | Hearing |
SETTLED BEFORE TRIAL EARLY SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE-1 Judge: VIGILANTE, MILES J. (AR) |
|
September 17, 2018 | Hearing |
ADJOURNED (Motion #003) E-FILING SUBMISSIONS CALENDAR SOS Judge: JAFFE, BARBARA |
|
September 17, 2018 | Docket Event | ADJOURNMENT OF MOTION -REQUEST -IN SUBMISSIONS PART -RM 130 (Motion #003) | |
September 14, 2018 | Docket Event | STIPULATION - ADJOURNMENT OF MOTION -IN SUBMISSIONS PART -RM 130 (Motion #003) | |
September 14, 2018 | Docket Event | STIPULATION - ADJOURNMENT OF MOTION - BEFORE JUDGE (Motion #003) | |
September 07, 2018 | Hearing |
PRETRIAL CONFERENCE HELD EARLY SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE-1 Judge: VIGILANTE, MILES J. (AR) |
|
August 22, 2018 | Hearing |
ADJOURNED (Motion #003) E-FILING SUBMISSIONS CALENDAR STIP Judge: JAFFE, BARBARA |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.