Case Last Refreshed: 10 months ago
Francisca Cazares, filed a(n) Personal Injury - Torts case represented by Linder, Mark, against Our Lady Of Lourdes Roman Catholic Church, The City Of New York, represented by Counsel, Corporation, Herzog, Elana, Martin, Steven, Mazzalonga, Stephen, in the jurisdiction of New York County. This case was filed in New York County Superior Courts with Franc Perry presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateNovember 14, 2016 |
CategoryTorts - Other Negligence (Personal Injury) |
Last RefreshedAugust 01, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationNew York County, NY |
Matter TypePersonal Injury |
STIPULATION - ADJOURNMENT OF MOTION -IN SUBMISSIONS PART -RM 130
Date: September 06, 2018AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION Â (Motion #004)
Date: August 18, 2020STIPULATION - SO ORDERED
Date: December 13, 2017STIPULATION - SO ORDERED
Date: July 10, 2018DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION
Date: March 13, 2019STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: November 14, 2016DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION
Date: April 23, 2019DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION
Date: September 24, 2019STIPULATION - SO ORDERED
Date: March 09, 2018STIPULATION - ADJOURNMENT OF MOTION -IN SUBMISSIONS PART -RM 130
Date: September 11, 2018NOTICE OF MOTION
Date: August 20, 2018AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT
Date: June 04, 2020AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION
Date: July 03, 2019ORDER - CASE SCHEDULING
Date: July 10, 2017NOTICE OF MOTION
Date: June 04, 2020ANSWER WITH CROSS-CLAIM(S)
Date: January 13, 2017AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION
Date: December 20, 2018AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION Â (Motion #002)
Date: November 27, 2018AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION Â (Motion #003)
Date: June 10, 2019AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN REPLY
Date: October 15, 2018NOTICE OF MOTION
Date: June 10, 2019NOTICE OF APPEAL Â (Motion #001)
Date: April 15, 2019NOTICE OF MOTION
Date: November 27, 2018AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION
Date: October 04, 2018AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION
Date: August 20, 2018SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: November 14, 2016Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 19, 2020 | Hearing |
ADJOURNED (Motion #004) PAPERLESS PART NO APPEARANCE FOR REV Judge: PERRY, W. FRANC |
|
August 19, 2020 | Hearing |
(Motion #004) IAS MOTION 23 FOR REV Judge: PERRY, W. FRANC |
|
August 18, 2020 |
AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION (Motion #004) Affirmation in Opposition |
||
August 18, 2020 |
EXHIBIT(S) - A (Motion #004) Exhibit A - Response to Letter Un-Redacted per 22 NYCRR Exhibit A - Response to Letter Un-Redacted |
||
June 04, 2020 | Motion |
COMPEL (Motion #004) Before Justice: PERRY, W. FRANC Answer demanded: Yes Judge: PERRY, W. FRANC |
|
June 04, 2020 |
EXHIBIT(S) - D (Motion #004) Good Faith Letter |
||
June 04, 2020 |
EXHIBIT(S) - C (Motion #004) Notice for Discovery and Inspection |
||
June 04, 2020 |
EXHIBIT(S) - B (Motion #004) Answer |
||
June 04, 2020 |
EXHIBIT(S) - A (Motion #004) Summons and Complaint |
||
June 04, 2020 | AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.