Case Last Refreshed: 10 months ago
Karen Lieberman, filed a(n) General Criminal - Criminal case represented by Gordon, David Edward, against Abigail Malone And Matthew Malone As Co-Executors Of The Estate Of Warren J. Malone, Jacques Jiha, Rosario Mcclain, Velocity Commercial Capital, Llc, Wjm 2014 Llc, (total of 5) See All represented by Ellman, Stephen Frederick, Katz, Yisroel A., Kook, Mark R, Vasilatos, Theodora Dora, in the jurisdiction of New York County. This case was filed in New York County Superior Courts New York County Supreme Court with Barbara Jaffe presiding.
Case Number |
Time To Management212 days |
|
Filing DateNovember 14, 2016 |
CategoryTorts - Other (Forgery Of Deed) |
|
Last RefreshedJuly 31, 2023 |
Practice AreaCriminal |
|
Filing LocationNew York County, NY |
Matter TypeGeneral Criminal |
|
Filing Court HouseNew York County Supreme Court |
Case Outcome TypeDisposed |
Case Cycle Time1120 days |
NOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #002)
Date: December 05, 2017ANSWER
Date: March 07, 2017AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION (Motion #003)
Date: May 16, 2018NOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #003)
Date: May 16, 2018ORDER - OTHER
Date: January 04, 2019LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE
Date: December 20, 2018ANSWER
Date: January 03, 2019STIPULATION - OTHER - ( REQUEST TO SO ORDER )
Date: March 16, 2020COMPLAINT
Date: November 14, 2016AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF PROPOSED OSC/EXPARTE APP (Motion #001)
Date: March 03, 2017RJI -RE: ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE (Motion #001)
Date: March 03, 2017ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE ( PROPOSED ) (Motion #001)
Date: March 03, 2017AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION (Motion #002)
Date: December 05, 2017COMPLAINT (AMENDED)
Date: November 08, 2018ORDER - OTHER
Date: June 11, 2020STIPULATION - SO ORDERED
Date: January 10, 2020DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION (Motion #002)
Date: May 03, 2018DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION (Motion #001)
Date: April 11, 2017STIPULATION - WITHDRAWING MOTION/ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE (Motion #001)
Date: March 30, 2017ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE (Motion #001)
Date: March 06, 2017STIPULATION - TIME TO ANSWER
Date: May 15, 2017STIPULATION - SO ORDERED
Date: June 28, 2019STIPULATION - SO ORDERED
Date: January 07, 2019STIPULATION - SO ORDERED
Date: September 17, 2019DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION (Motion #003)
Date: October 18, 2018STIPULATION - SO ORDERED
Date: December 12, 2017Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 11, 2020 | Docket Event | ORDER - OTHER | |
March 17, 2020 | Docket Event | COURT NOTICE | |
March 16, 2020 | Docket Event |
STIPULATION - OTHER - ( REQUEST TO SO ORDER ) stipulation to vacate deed |
|
March 09, 2020 | Docket Event |
STIPULATION - ADJOURNMENT OF CONFERENCE Adjournment of Status Conference and Note of Issue Dates |
|
January 28, 2020 | Docket Event |
STIPULATION - ADJOURNMENT OF CONFERENCE Stipulation to reschedule compliance conf |
|
January 10, 2020 | Docket Event | STIPULATION - SO ORDERED | |
January 07, 2020 | Docket Event | STIPULATION - ADJOURNMENT OF CONFERENCE | |
December 09, 2019 | Hearing |
OTHER FINAL DISP. (PRE-NOTE) MEDIATION-NON-JURY SETTLED Judge: KERN-RAPPY, MICHELE |
|
September 17, 2019 | Docket Event | STIPULATION - SO ORDERED | |
September 11, 2019 | Hearing |
ADJOURNED COMPLIANCE CONFERENCE 12 2:15PM N/I 9/18/19 Judge: JAFFE, BARBARA |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.