Case Last Refreshed: 11 months ago
Richard Wellman, filed a(n) Premises Liability - Torts case represented by Markovits, Thomas P, against 1627 Broadway, Llc, 210 West 50Th Street, Llc, Duane Reade, Ikc., The City Of New York, represented by Castleman-Smith, Tiffany Carisse, Colangelo, Erika Lynn, Counsel, Corporation, Gruvman, Paul Stephen, Lynch, Christopher R, (total of 7) See All in the jurisdiction of New York County. This case was filed in New York County Superior Courts New York County Supreme Court with Leslie Stroth presiding.
Case Number |
Time To Management422 days |
|
Filing DateNovember 14, 2016 |
CategoryTorts - Other (Trip And Fall) |
|
Last RefreshedJuly 24, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
|
Filing LocationNew York County, NY |
Matter TypePremises Liability |
|
Filing Court HouseNew York County Supreme Court |
DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION Â (Motion #001)
Date: May 17, 2019ORDER - CASE SCHEDULING
Date: January 29, 2018AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT
Date: May 02, 2019ORDER - CASE SCHEDULING
Date: July 29, 2019NOTICE OF MOTION
Date: May 02, 2019SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: November 14, 2016STIPULATION - SO ORDERED
Date: April 11, 2019STIPULATION - SO ORDERED
Date: May 03, 2018STIPULATION - SO ORDERED
Date: March 09, 2020STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: November 29, 2016EXHIBIT(S) Â - 3-4 Â (Motion #001)
Date: May 02, 2019EXHIBIT(S) Â - C Â (Motion #001)
Date: May 29, 2019RJI -RE: REQUEST FOR PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE
Date: December 08, 2016AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: November 29, 2016EXHIBIT(S) Â - F Â (Motion #001)
Date: May 29, 2019AFFIRMATION Â (Motion #001)
Date: May 29, 2019EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #001)
Date: May 29, 2019EXHIBIT(S) Â - D Â (Motion #001)
Date: May 29, 2019NOTICE TO COUNTY CLERK - AMENDMENT OF CAPTION
Date: May 23, 2019EXHIBIT(S) Â - B Â (Motion #001)
Date: May 29, 2019EXHIBIT(S) Â - G Â (Motion #001)
Date: May 29, 2019EXHIBIT(S) Â - 1-2 Â (Motion #001)
Date: May 02, 2019NOTICE OF ENTRY
Date: June 18, 2019EXHIBIT(S) Â - H Â (Motion #001)
Date: May 29, 2019EXHIBIT(S) Â - E Â (Motion #001)
Date: May 29, 2019NOTICE OF ENTRY
Date: July 10, 2019URGENT - COURT APPEARANCE UPDATE
Date: March 19, 2020AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Â (Motion #001)
Date: May 29, 2019STIPULATION - DISCONTINUANCE (POST RJI)
Date: September 29, 2020PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE REQUEST
Date: December 08, 2016STIPULATION - SO ORDERED
Date: August 30, 2018STIPULATION - SO ORDERED
Date: November 04, 2019Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 29, 2020 |
STIPULATION - DISCONTINUANCE (POST RJI) Fully Executed Stipulation of Discontinuance |
||
May 06, 2020 | Hearing |
COMPLIANCE CONFERENCE 52 DCM 2 PM Judge: FRANK, LYLE E. (DCM) |
|
March 19, 2020 | Docket Event | URGENT - COURT APPEARANCE UPDATE | |
March 09, 2020 | Docket Event | STIPULATION - SO ORDERED | |
March 04, 2020 | Hearing |
STATUS CONFERENCE HELD COMPLIANCE CONFERENCE 52 DCM 2 PM Judge: FRANK, LYLE E. (DCM) |
|
November 04, 2019 | Docket Event | STIPULATION - SO ORDERED | |
October 30, 2019 | Hearing |
STATUS CONFERENCE HELD COMPLIANCE CONFERENCE 52 DCM 2 PM Judge: FRANK, LYLE E. (DCM) |
|
July 29, 2019 | Docket Event | ORDER - CASE SCHEDULING | |
July 10, 2019 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF ENTRY | |
June 26, 2019 | Hearing |
COMPLIANCE CONFERENCE HELD COMPLIANCE CONFERENCE 52 DCM 2PM Judge: FRANK, LYLE E. (DCM) |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.