Case Last Refreshed: 10 months ago
Kenneth Murphy, Laura Murphy, filed a(n) General Torts - Torts case represented by Landa, Yolanda R, against Ery Retail Podium, Llc, Hudson Yards Construction, Llc, Tutor Pernii Building Corp., represented by Erenburg, Aram Lee, in the jurisdiction of New York County. This case was filed in New York County Superior Courts New York County Supreme Court with Robert D Kalish presiding.
Case Number |
||
Filing DateNovember 14, 2016 |
CategoryTorts - Other (Labor Law) |
|
Last RefreshedJuly 31, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
|
Filing LocationNew York County, NY |
Matter TypeGeneral Torts |
|
Filing Court HouseNew York County Supreme Court |
Case Outcome TypeDisposed |
Case Cycle Time1156 days |
ANSWER TO THIRD PARTY COMPLAINT
Date: June 20, 2017DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION (Motion #001)
Date: June 04, 2018STIPULATION - SO ORDERED
Date: June 06, 2019STIPULATION - SO ORDERED
Date: September 06, 2018STIPULATION - SO ORDERED
Date: June 06, 2019STIPULATION - SO ORDERED
Date: December 04, 2018STIPULATION - SO ORDERED
Date: October 02, 2019STIPULATION - SO ORDERED
Date: December 17, 2019STIPULATION - SO ORDERED
Date: May 24, 2018STIPULATION - DISCONTINUANCE (POST RJI)
Date: January 14, 2020ANSWER
Date: August 08, 2018ADJOURNMENT OF MOTION -REQUEST -IN SUBMISSIONS PART -RM 130 (Motion #001)
Date: May 15, 2018NOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #001)
Date: April 23, 2018ANSWER
Date: January 26, 2017COMPLAINT
Date: November 14, 2016Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 14, 2020 | Docket Event |
STIPULATION - DISCONTINUANCE (POST RJI) Stipulation of Discontinuance |
|
December 17, 2019 | Docket Event | STIPULATION - SO ORDERED | |
October 02, 2019 | Docket Event | STIPULATION - SO ORDERED | |
July 18, 2019 | Docket Event |
COURT NOTICE Filing on Behalf of - HON. ROBERT D. KALISH |
|
June 06, 2019 | Docket Event |
STIPULATION - SO ORDERED consolidation of cases and amendment of caption |
|
June 06, 2019 | Docket Event | STIPULATION - SO ORDERED | |
March 12, 2019 | Docket Event | ORDER - STATUS CONFERENCE | |
December 04, 2018 | Docket Event | STIPULATION - SO ORDERED | |
September 06, 2018 | Docket Event | STIPULATION - SO ORDERED | |
August 08, 2018 | Docket Event | Answer to the 2nd Third Party S&C |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.