Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Adrienne Scott, filed a(n) Premises Liability - Torts case represented by Seitelman, Mark E, against Otis Elevator Company, in the jurisdiction of New York County. This case was filed in New York County Superior Courts with Robert D Kalish presiding.
Case Number |
Time To Management161 days |
|
Filing DateNovember 14, 2016 |
CategoryTorts - Other Negligence (Premises - Elevator) |
|
Last RefreshedFebruary 24, 2021 |
Practice AreaTorts |
|
Filing LocationNew York County, NY |
Matter TypePremises Liability |
|
Case Cycle Time829 days |
ANSWER
Date: January 04, 2017STIPULATION - SO ORDERED
Date: December 05, 2017SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: November 14, 2016Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 21, 2019 | Hearing |
SETTLED BEFORE TRIAL EARLY SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE-1 Judge: VIGILANTE, MILES J. (AR) |
|
April 23, 2018 | NOTE OF ISSUE:WITH JURY | ||
February 28, 2018 | ORDER - COMPLIANCE CONFERENCE | ||
February 27, 2018 | Hearing |
STATUS CONFERENCE HELD STATUS CONFERENCE 29 9:30 AM NOI TO BE FILED Judge: KALISH, ROBERT DAVID |
|
December 05, 2017 | STIPULATION - SO ORDERED | ||
December 05, 2017 | Hearing |
STATUS CONFERENCE HELD STATUS CONFERENCE 29 9:30 AM Judge: KALISH, ROBERT DAVID |
|
September 19, 2017 | Hearing |
STATUS CONFERENCE HELD STATUS CONFERENCE 29 9:30 AM Judge: KALISH, ROBERT DAVID |
|
September 19, 2017 | ORDER - COMPLIANCE CONFERENCE | ||
July 11, 2017 | Hearing |
COMPLIANCE CONFERENCE HELD COMPLIANCE CONFERENCE 29 9:30 AM Judge: KALISH, ROBERT DAVID |
|
July 11, 2017 | ORDER - COMPLIANCE CONFERENCE |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.