Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Argento, James M., filed a(n) General Property - Property case represented by Mackenzie, Elizabeth Anne, against Steele, Michael R., represented by Schetter, Carl Frederick, in the jurisdiction of Napa County. This case was filed in Napa County Superior Courts with Fretz, Donald R. presiding.
Case Number |
||
Filing DateDecember 20, 2006 |
CategoryOther Real Property Unlimited (26) |
Time To Trial258 days |
Last RefreshedFebruary 23, 2021 |
Practice AreaProperty |
|
Filing LocationNapa County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Property |
|
Case Cycle Time511 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 14, 2008 | Docket Event |
Notice 212910-Notice Filed/Issued By: 931210 - Attorney for Plaintiff NOTICE [212910] Motion: Additional Description : Filed By ATTORNEY FOR PLAINTIFF [931210] |
|
May 14, 2008 | Docket Event |
Other Hearing 216910-Hearing: Other; Argento, J. vs. Steele, M. ; Judge: J21130 Guadagni Raymond A. Additional Info : confirmation of settlement Judge: Guadagni, Raymond A. |
|
May 13, 2008 | Docket Event |
Dismissal 233910-Dismissal Filed/Issued By: 931210 - Attorney for Plaintiff DISMISSAL [233910] Motion: Additional Description : Filed By ATTORNEY FOR PLAINTIFF [931210] |
|
May 13, 2008 | Docket Event |
Converted Stat Closure Disposition Date: May 13 2008 Type: 243110 - Entry of Request for Dismissal Manner : 241210 - Before Trial: No Sttlmnt Cnf/ADR |
|
April 04, 2008 | Docket Event |
Minute Order 213610-Minute Order Filed/Issued By: MINUTE ORDER [213610] Motion: Additional Description : Filed By |
|
April 04, 2008 | Docket Event |
Other Hearing 216910-Hearing: Other; Argento, J. vs. Steele, M. ; Judge: J21130 Guadagni Raymond A. Additional Info : confirmation of settlement Judge: Guadagni, Raymond A. |
|
March 04, 2008 | Docket Event |
Other Hearing 216910-Hearing: Other; Argento, J. vs. Steele, M. ; Judge: J21198 Boessenecker Mark Additional Info : confirmation of settlement Judge: Boessenecker, Mark |
|
March 04, 2008 | Docket Event |
Minute Order 213610-Minute Order Filed/Issued By: MINUTE ORDER [213610] Motion: Additional Description : Filed By |
|
February 05, 2008 | Docket Event |
Other Hearing 216910-Hearing: Other; Argento, J. vs. Steele, M. ; Judge: J21198 Boessenecker Mark Additional Info : confirmation of settlement Judge: Boessenecker, Mark |
|
February 05, 2008 | Docket Event |
Minute Order 213610-Minute Order Filed/Issued By: MINUTE ORDER [213610] Motion: Additional Description : Filed By |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.