Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Christina Thompson An Infant By Her Mother And Natural Guardian, Monique Palmer, filed a(n) General Torts - Torts case represented by Frankel, Reuven Shmuel, against Countrywide Gp, Inc., Countrywide Home Loans, Inc., Countrywide Home Loans Servicing Lp, Morgan Stanley Abs Capital I, Inc., Wmc Mortgage Corp., (total of 5) See All represented by Epstein, Eric B, Fischweicher, Jessica Holly, Kaiser, Scott H, Scheffel, David Anthony, Weiss, Michael Alan, (total of 5) See All in the jurisdiction of New York County. This case was filed in New York County Superior Courts New York County Supreme Court with Debra A James presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeDebra A James Track Judge’s New Cases |
|
Filing DateDecember 28, 2012 |
CategoryTort |
|
Last RefreshedOctober 10, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
|
Filing LocationNew York County, NY |
Matter TypeGeneral Torts |
|
Filing Court HouseNew York County Supreme Court |
Case Outcome TypeDisposed |
Case Cycle Time802 days |
AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION (Motion #004)
Date: January 08, 2015DEMAND FOR:
Date: December 23, 2014ORDER - TRANSFER (Motion #001)
Date: October 24, 2013AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF PROPOSED OSC/EXPARTE APP (Motion #002)
Date: March 01, 2013STIPULATION - SO ORDERED (Motion #001)
Date: April 16, 2013AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION (Motion #003)
Date: May 21, 2013NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF MOTION / ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE (Motion #002)
Date: March 04, 2013ORDER - TRANSFER (Motion #003)
Date: October 24, 2013AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF PROPOSED OSC/EXPARTE APP (Motion #002)
Date: March 01, 2013DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION (Motion #003)
Date: October 27, 2014AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF PROPOSED OSC/EXPARTE APP
Date: March 01, 2013AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION (Motion #004)
Date: January 08, 2015DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION (Motion #004)
Date: March 10, 2015DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION (Motion #001)
Date: October 27, 2014AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT (Motion #003)
Date: April 04, 2013AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION (Motion #003)
Date: June 03, 2013MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN SUPPORT (Motion #003)
Date: April 04, 2013MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN OPPOSITION (Motion #003)
Date: May 21, 2013NOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #003)
Date: April 04, 2013AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF PROPOSED OSC/EXPARTE APP
Date: March 01, 2013ADJOURNMENT OF MOTION -REQUEST (Motion #003)
Date: July 03, 2013RJI -RE: NOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #001)
Date: February 28, 2013MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN REPLY (Motion #003)
Date: June 03, 2013ANSWER
Date: November 20, 2014DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION (Motion #002)
Date: March 11, 2013NOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #004)
Date: January 08, 2015STIPULATION - OTHER
Date: November 05, 2014ADJOURNMENT OF MOTION -REQUEST (Motion #001)
Date: April 15, 2013STIPULATION - OTHER (Motion #003)
Date: April 11, 2013AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN REPLY (Motion #001)
Date: March 15, 2013STIPULATION - OTHER
Date: March 04, 2013ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE ( PROPOSED ) (Motion #002)
Date: March 01, 2013ANSWER
Date: March 01, 2013AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION (Motion #001)
Date: February 28, 2013NOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #001)
Date: February 28, 2013STIPULATION - OTHER
Date: February 04, 2013STIPULATION - OTHER
Date: February 01, 2013Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 16, 2015 | Hearing |
DISPOSED/RESULT OF MOTION COMPLIANCE CONFERENCE 59 9:30 AM Judge: JAMES, DEBRA A. |
|
March 10, 2015 | Docket Event |
DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION (Motion #004) re: motion no. 004, DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION entered in the office of the County Clerk on March 10 |
|
January 29, 2015 | Hearing |
FULLY SUBMITTED - NO OPP (Motion #004) E-FILING SUBMISSIONS CALENDAR Judge: JAMES, DEBRA A. |
|
January 28, 2015 | Docket Event |
ORDER - PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE Re: Appearance #001, PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE ORDER entered in the office of the County Clerk on Janua |
|
January 08, 2015 | Docket Event |
AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION (Motion #004) Affirmation of David A. Scheffel in Support of Motion for Summary Judgment |
|
January 08, 2015 | Docket Event |
AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION (Motion #004) Affidavit of Diane Taylor in Support of Motion for Summary judgment |
|
January 08, 2015 | Motion |
SUMMARY JUDGMENT (Motion #004) Decided: 03/09/2015CASE DISPOSED Before Justice: JAMES, DEBRA A. Answer demanded: No Judge: JAMES, DEBRA A. |
|
January 08, 2015 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - D (Motion #004) Decision |
|
January 08, 2015 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - C (Motion #004) Pool and Servicing Agreement |
|
January 08, 2015 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - B (Motion #004) Answer |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.