Case Last Refreshed: 9 months ago
Alejandro Castro, Blanca Ramirez De Castro, filed a(n) General Torts - Torts case represented by Gorayeb, Christopher J., Moran, Jonathan David, against Component Assembly Systems, Inc., Mckissack & Mckissack, Inc., Turner Construction Company, Turner Mckissack A Joint Venture, represented by Del Vecchio, Adam Christian, Nuru, Jah-Asia, Pojero, Daniel D., Sparling, John E, in the jurisdiction of New York County. This case was filed in New York County Superior Courts with Mary V. Rosado presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateSeptember 27, 2021 |
CategoryTorts - Other (Labor Law) |
Last RefreshedJuly 23, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationNew York County, NY |
Matter TypeGeneral Torts |
SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: September 27, 2021STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: September 27, 2021ORDER - PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE
Date: August 25, 2022STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: October 15, 2021PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE REQUEST
Date: March 22, 2022RJI -RE: REQUEST FOR PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE
Date: March 22, 2022STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: October 08, 2021PROOF OF SERVICE
Date: March 22, 2022AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: October 15, 2021AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: October 19, 2021ANSWER
Date: December 23, 2021NOTICE OF CHANGE OF FIRM NAME OR ADDRESS (POST RJI)
Date: October 19, 2022AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: October 08, 2021ORDER - COMPLIANCE CONFERENCE
Date: December 09, 2022STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: March 13, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 2 Â (Motion #001)
Date: March 13, 2023NOTICE OF MOTION
Date: March 13, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 1 Â (Motion #001)
Date: March 13, 2023AFFIRMATION
Date: March 13, 2023ORDER - STATUS CONFERENCE
Date: March 22, 2023STIPULATION - SO ORDERED
Date: May 31, 2023Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 31, 2023 | STIPULATION - SO ORDERED | ||
March 22, 2023 | ORDER - STATUS CONFERENCE | ||
March 13, 2023 | STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING | ||
March 13, 2023 |
EXHIBIT(S) - 2 (Motion #001) Pleadings |
||
March 13, 2023 | NOTICE OF MOTION | ||
March 13, 2023 |
EXHIBIT(S) - 1 (Motion #001) Pleadings |
||
March 13, 2023 | AFFIRMATION | ||
December 09, 2022 | ORDER - COMPLIANCE CONFERENCE | ||
October 19, 2022 |
NOTICE OF CHANGE OF FIRM NAME OR ADDRESS (POST RJI) Notice of Change of Address |
||
August 25, 2022 | ORDER - PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.