Case Last Refreshed: 10 months ago
Charles Perez, filed a(n) General Negligence - Torts case represented by Harnick, Thomas J, Harnick, Thomas Jonathan, against Four And Twenty, Llc D B A Bml Blackbird Theatrical Service, Seventh Regiment Armory Conservancy, Inc, The Breast Cancer Research Foundation, represented by Hahn, William L, Kaufman, Andrew Brian, Miranda, Michael A, Warmbrand, Abraham, in the jurisdiction of New York County. This case was filed in New York County Superior Courts New York County Supreme Court with Sabrina Kraus presiding.
Case Number |
Time To Management174 days |
|
Filing DateSeptember 12, 2018 |
CategoryTorts - Other (Premesis: Negligence) |
|
Last RefreshedJuly 24, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
|
Filing LocationNew York County, NY |
Matter TypeGeneral Negligence |
|
Filing Court HouseNew York County Supreme Court |
DEMAND FOR:
Date: October 24, 2018ANSWER
Date: October 24, 2018SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: September 12, 2018STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: September 27, 2018DEMAND FOR BILL OF PARTICULARS
Date: October 24, 2018ANSWER
Date: August 02, 2019DEMAND FOR:
Date: October 24, 2018THIRD PARTY SUMMONS/COMPLAINT
Date: April 17, 2019AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: May 13, 2019ORDER - PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE
Date: March 15, 2019NOTICE OF DEPOSITION
Date: October 24, 2018AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: May 14, 2019RJI -RE: REQUEST FOR PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE
Date: December 19, 2018URGENT - COURT APPEARANCE UPDATE
Date: March 20, 2020ORDER - STATUS CONFERENCE
Date: February 11, 2020EXHIBIT(S) Â - F Â (Motion #001)
Date: September 17, 2020EXHIBIT(S) Â - O Â (Motion #001)
Date: September 17, 2020EXHIBIT(S) Â - H Â (Motion #001)
Date: September 17, 2020COMPLAINT (AMENDED)
Date: October 29, 2020AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT Â (Motion #001)
Date: September 17, 2020EXHIBIT(S) Â - E Â (Motion #001)
Date: September 17, 2020NOTICE OF MOTION Â (Motion #001)
Date: September 17, 2020EXHIBIT(S) Â - D Â (Motion #001)
Date: September 17, 2020CONSENT TO CHANGE ATTORNEY (POST RJI)
Date: June 11, 2020ANSWER (AMENDED)
Date: November 19, 2020EXHIBIT(S) Â - C Â (Motion #001)
Date: September 17, 2020EXHIBIT(S) Â - G Â (Motion #001)
Date: September 17, 2020EXHIBIT(S) Â - B Â (Motion #002)
Date: December 07, 2020NOTICE OF DEPOSITION
Date: May 21, 2021ORDER - COMPLIANCE CONFERENCE
Date: October 07, 2019EXHIBIT(S) Â - I Â (Motion #001)
Date: September 17, 2020ANSWER WITH CROSS-CLAIM(S)
Date: November 27, 2020EXHIBIT(S) Â - P Â (Motion #001)
Date: September 17, 2020EXHIBIT(S) Â - B Â (Motion #001)
Date: September 17, 2020NOTICE OF ENTRY Â (Motion #001)
Date: October 29, 2020AFFIDAVIT Â (Motion #001)
Date: October 29, 2020EXHIBIT(S) Â - L Â (Motion #001)
Date: September 17, 2020EXHIBIT(S) Â - M Â (Motion #001)
Date: September 17, 2020AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: November 10, 2020NOTICE OF DEPOSITION
Date: November 27, 2020SUMMONS (POST RJI) (AMENDED)
Date: October 29, 2020DEMAND FOR:
Date: May 19, 2021AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT Â (Motion #002)
Date: December 07, 2020EXHIBIT(S) Â - K Â (Motion #001)
Date: September 17, 2020EXHIBIT(S) Â - Q Â (Motion #002) Exhibit Q - sbp.seventh.reg.perez
Date: December 07, 2020NOTICE OF MOTION Â (Motion #002)
Date: December 07, 2020ORDER - OTHER (NON-MOTION)
Date: May 06, 2021COMPLAINT (AMENDED)
Date: April 30, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - J Â (Motion #001)
Date: September 17, 2020EXHIBIT(S) Â - S Â (Motion #002)
Date: December 07, 2020EXHIBIT(S) Â - N Â (Motion #001)
Date: September 17, 2020EXHIBIT(S) Â - Q Â (Motion #001)
Date: September 17, 2020ORDER - OTHER (MOTION RELATED)
Date: October 29, 2020EXHIBIT(S) Â - N Â (Motion #002)
Date: December 07, 2020EXHIBIT(S) Â - L Â (Motion #002)
Date: December 07, 2020EXHIBIT(S) Â - K Â (Motion #002)
Date: December 07, 2020EXHIBIT(S) Â - P Â (Motion #002)
Date: December 07, 2020EXHIBIT(S) Â - I Â (Motion #002)
Date: December 07, 2020EXHIBIT(S) Â - J Â (Motion #002)
Date: December 07, 2020EXHIBIT(S) Â - M Â (Motion #002)
Date: December 07, 2020DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION
Date: October 19, 2020EXHIBIT(S) Â - T Â (Motion #002)
Date: December 07, 2020AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION
Date: February 08, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - U Â (Motion #002)
Date: December 07, 2020EXHIBIT(S) Â - O Â (Motion #002)
Date: December 07, 2020EXHIBIT(S) Â - V Â (Motion #002)
Date: December 07, 2020EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #003)
Date: February 08, 2021AFFIRMATION OF GOOD FAITH
Date: February 08, 2021COMPLAINT (AMENDED)
Date: April 20, 2021AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: September 27, 2018PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE REQUEST
Date: December 19, 2018AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: April 29, 2021CONSENT TO EFILING
Date: September 13, 2018REPLY TO CROSS-CLAIM (S)
Date: May 23, 2021DEMAND FOR:
Date: May 19, 2021AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: April 29, 2021ANSWER TO THIRD PARTY COMPLAINT
Date: May 19, 2021DEMAND FOR:
Date: May 19, 2021DEMAND FOR:
Date: May 21, 2021ORDER ( PROPOSED )
Date: April 30, 2021NOTICE OF DEPOSITION
Date: May 19, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - A
Date: May 21, 2021AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: May 06, 2021DEMAND FOR:
Date: May 21, 2021DEMAND FOR:
Date: May 21, 2021DEMAND FOR:
Date: May 21, 2021DEMAND FOR:
Date: May 21, 2021ANSWER WITH CROSS-CLAIM(S)
Date: June 09, 2021AFFIDAVIT
Date: June 01, 2021NOTIFICATION FROM COURT
Date: May 27, 2021ANSWER
Date: June 28, 2021ANSWER TO THIRD PARTY COMPLAINT
Date: June 14, 2021AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: June 01, 2021REPLY TO COUNTERCLAIM(S)
Date: May 28, 2021ANSWER (AMENDED)
Date: June 28, 2021ANSWER
Date: June 22, 2021REPLY TO CROSS-CLAIM (S)
Date: July 16, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - R Â (Motion #002)
Date: December 07, 2020EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #002) Exhibit A - incident.rpts
Date: December 07, 2020EXHIBIT(S) Â - B Â (Motion #003)
Date: February 08, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - H Â (Motion #002)
Date: December 07, 2020EXHIBIT(S) Â - F Â (Motion #002)
Date: December 07, 2020ANSWER WITH CROSS-CLAIM(S)
Date: May 21, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - D Â (Motion #002)
Date: December 07, 2020DEMAND FOR BILL OF PARTICULARS
Date: May 21, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - C Â (Motion #002)
Date: December 07, 2020EXHIBIT(S) Â - G Â (Motion #002)
Date: December 07, 2020EXHIBIT(S) Â - E Â (Motion #002)
Date: December 07, 2020AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: May 06, 2021SUMMONS (POST RJI) (AMENDED)
Date: April 30, 2021DEMAND FOR:
Date: May 19, 2021DEMAND FOR:
Date: May 19, 2021NOTICE OF ENTRY
Date: May 11, 2021ANSWER TO THIRD PARTY COMPLAINT
Date: May 20, 2021RESPONSE TO DEMAND Response to Plaintiff's Further Discovery & Inspection
Date: October 15, 2021STIPULATION - AMENDING CAPTION
Date: May 07, 2021DEMAND FOR:
Date: May 21, 2021DEMAND FOR:
Date: May 21, 2021DEMAND FOR:
Date: May 21, 2021NOTICE OF CHANGE OF FIRM NAME OR ADDRESS (POST RJI)
Date: February 01, 2022NOTICE OF CHANGE OF FIRM NAME OR ADDRESS (POST RJI)
Date: October 25, 2021STIPULATION - ADJOURNMENT OF MOTION -IN SUBMISSIONS PART -RM 130 Â (Motion #002)
Date: January 11, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - C Â (Motion #003)
Date: February 08, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - E Â (Motion #003)
Date: February 08, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - I Â (Motion #003)
Date: February 08, 2021AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION Â (Motion #002)
Date: January 08, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - F Â (Motion #003)
Date: February 08, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - H Â (Motion #003)
Date: February 08, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - G Â (Motion #003)
Date: February 08, 2021NOTICE OF MOTION
Date: February 08, 2021DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION
Date: April 13, 2021STIPULATION - ADJOURNMENT OF MOTION -IN SUBMISSIONS PART -RM 130 Â (Motion #002)
Date: March 29, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - J Â (Motion #003)
Date: February 08, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - K Â (Motion #003)
Date: February 08, 2021THIRD PARTY SUMMONS/COMPLAINT
Date: April 13, 2021DEMAND FOR BILL OF PARTICULARS
Date: May 19, 2021AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION Â (Motion #002)
Date: March 30, 2021STIPULATION - ADJOURNMENT OF MOTION -IN SUBMISSIONS PART -RM 130 Â (Motion #002)
Date: February 12, 2021NOTICE OF ENTRY
Date: April 13, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - A
Date: May 19, 2021STIPULATION - AMENDING CAPTION
Date: April 30, 2021DEMAND FOR:
Date: May 19, 2021DEMAND FOR:
Date: May 19, 2021DEMAND FOR:
Date: May 19, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 01, 2022 |
NOTICE OF CHANGE OF FIRM NAME OR ADDRESS (POST RJI) Address Change |
||
October 25, 2021 |
NOTICE OF CHANGE OF FIRM NAME OR ADDRESS (POST RJI) Notice change name |
||
October 15, 2021 |
RESPONSE TO DEMAND Response to Plaintiff's Further Discovery & Inspection Response to Plaintiff's Further Discovery & Inspection Possible SSN Administratively Redacted |
||
July 16, 2021 |
REPLY TO CROSS-CLAIM (S) Reply Cross Claims |
||
June 28, 2021 | Answer to Four and Twenty LLC d/b/a Blackbird Theatrical Services' Cross-Claims | ||
June 28, 2021 |
ANSWER (AMENDED) Amended Answer to The Breast Cancer Research Foundation's Cross-Claims |
||
June 22, 2021 | Answer to Cross-Claims of The Breast Cancer Research Foundation | ||
June 14, 2021 |
ANSWER TO THIRD PARTY COMPLAINT Answer to Second TP Complaint |
||
June 09, 2021 |
ANSWER WITH CROSS-CLAIM(S) ANSWER TO AMENDED COMPLAINT WITH CROSS-CLAIMS |
||
June 01, 2021 |
AFFIDAVIT OF MAILING |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.