Case Last Refreshed: 10 months ago
American Express National Bank, filed a(n) Consumer Debt - Creditor case represented by Migliaccio, Anthony J, against Nina Fiddian Green A K A Nina M Fiddian-Green, in the jurisdiction of New York County. This case was filed in New York County Superior Courts New York County Supreme Court.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateSeptember 12, 2018 |
CategoryOther Matters - Consumer Credit (Card) Original Creditor Plaintiff |
Last RefreshedJuly 28, 2023 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationNew York County, NY |
Matter TypeConsumer Debt |
Filing Court HouseNew York County Supreme Court |
Case Cycle Time139 days |
STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: September 12, 2018STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: July 01, 2020202.27-B PROOF OF MAILING
Date: October 09, 2018AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: October 04, 2018NOTICE OF DISCONTINUANCE (PRE RJI)
Date: July 01, 2020STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: January 29, 2019STIPULATION - SETTLEMENT (PRE RJI) Redacted per 22 NYCRR
Date: January 29, 2019SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: September 12, 2018Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 01, 2020 | STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING | ||
July 01, 2020 | NOTICE OF DISCONTINUANCE (PRE RJI) | ||
January 29, 2019 | Docket Event | STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING | |
January 29, 2019 | Docket Event |
STIPULATION - SETTLEMENT (PRE RJI) Redacted per 22 NYCRR Redacted per 22 NYCRR §202.5(e) |
|
October 09, 2018 | Docket Event | 202.27-B PROOF OF MAILING | |
October 04, 2018 | Docket Event |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Affidavit of Service - Nina Fiddian Green AKA Nina M Fiddian-Green |
|
September 12, 2018 | Docket Event |
STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING Authorization Form |
|
September 12, 2018 | Docket Event | Summons + Complaint, Nina Fiddian Green aka |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.