Case Last Refreshed: 11 hours ago
Ines Gonzalez-Crispin, Inez Gonzalez Crispin, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Arcia, Eloy A, Arcia, Eloy Abel, Caputo, Deanne M., against Carl J. Ponticello As The Executor Of The Estate Of Santo C. Ponticello, Deceased, Jel-Wb Food Corp, Jel-Wb Food Corp., Laurino Enterprises, Mcdonald'S Corporation, (total of 8) See All represented by Miller, Rebecca Ann, Moran, Thomas John, Radman, Robert, Stonberg, Michael L, Zachary, Deborah Christina, (total of 5) See All in the jurisdiction of New York County. This case was filed in New York County Superior Courts Supreme with James G. Clynes presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeJames G. Clynes Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateAugust 22, 2019 |
CategoryTorts - Other Negligence (Premises &Amp; Motor Vehicle) |
Last RefreshedApril 29, 2024 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationNew York County, NY |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
Filing Court HouseSupreme |
This is a complaint filed in litigation. The plaintiff (hereafter 'P') is suing the defendant (hereafter 'D') for operating a McDonald's franchise in a negligent manner that caused P's personal injury and property damage. The complaint lists 10 cause...
NOTICE OF CHANGE OF FIRM NAME OR ADDRESS (POST RJI)
Date: January 17, 2024RESPONSE TO DEMAND
Date: February 02, 2024NOTE OF ISSUE:WITH JURY
Date: November 15, 2023STIPULATION - SO ORDERED
Date: October 24, 2023RESPONSE TO DEMAND
Date: October 02, 2023STIPULATION - SO ORDERED
Date: July 19, 2023STIPULATION - SO ORDERED
Date: April 26, 2023STIPULATION - SO ORDERED
Date: December 12, 2022ORDER - STATUS CONFERENCE
Date: August 19, 2022RESPONSE TO DEMAND
Date: May 25, 2022STIPULATION - SO ORDERED
Date: April 18, 2022RESPONSE TO DEMAND
Date: March 18, 2022STIPULATION - SO ORDERED
Date: December 06, 2021NOTICE OF ENTRY
Date: August 11, 2021AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: August 11, 2021STIPULATION - SO ORDERED
Date: August 10, 2021NOTICE TO COUNTY CLERK - AMENDMENT OF CAPTION
Date: August 09, 2021RESPONSE TO DEMAND
Date: July 29, 2021STIPULATION - OTHER - ( REQUEST TO SO ORDER )
Date: August 04, 2021RESPONSE TO DEMAND
Date: July 29, 2021STIPULATION - SO ORDERED
Date: May 18, 2021STIPULATION - OTHER - ( REQUEST TO SO ORDER )
Date: April 27, 2021STIPULATION - AMENDING CAPTION
Date: April 06, 2021LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE
Date: January 04, 2021ORDER - CASE SCHEDULING
Date: December 31, 2020DEMAND FOR:
Date: November 04, 2020RJI -RE: REQUEST FOR PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE
Date: June 24, 2020AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: June 24, 2020EXHIBIT(S) Â - 1
Date: February 25, 2020PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE REQUEST
Date: June 24, 2020CONSENT TO CHANGE ATTORNEY (PRE RJI)
Date: February 28, 2020EXHIBIT(S) Â - 1
Date: February 19, 2020CERTIFICATION OF SIGNATURE ( ATTORNEY OR PARTY )
Date: January 21, 2020AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: January 21, 2020DEMAND FOR:
Date: January 21, 2020DEMAND FOR:
Date: January 21, 2020ANSWER
Date: January 21, 2020AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: October 08, 2019DEMAND FOR:
Date: October 08, 2019ANSWER
Date: October 08, 2019ANSWER
Date: October 08, 2019ANSWER
Date: October 08, 2019AFFIDAVIT
Date: September 24, 2019AFFIDAVIT
Date: September 19, 2019AFFIDAVIT
Date: September 09, 2019AFFIDAVIT
Date: September 16, 2019STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: September 09, 2019STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: September 04, 2019AFFIDAVIT
Date: September 10, 2019AFFIDAVIT
Date: September 04, 2019SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: August 22, 2019Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 02, 2024 |
RESPONSE TO DEMAND Expert Witness Disclosure |
||
January 17, 2024 | NOTICE OF CHANGE OF FIRM NAME OR ADDRESS (POST RJI) | ||
November 15, 2023 | NOTE OF ISSUE:WITH JURY | ||
October 24, 2023 | STIPULATION - SO ORDERED | ||
October 02, 2023 |
RESPONSE TO DEMAND Expert Witness Disclosure |
||
July 19, 2023 | STIPULATION - SO ORDERED | ||
April 26, 2023 | STIPULATION - SO ORDERED | ||
December 12, 2022 | STIPULATION - SO ORDERED | ||
August 19, 2022 | ORDER - STATUS CONFERENCE | ||
May 25, 2022 |
RESPONSE TO DEMAND Rsp to PC Order |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.