Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
Adam Leo Stone, Christin Kohls, Daniel Collin, Greg Merchant, Jacqueline Rosanna Stone, (total of 8) See All filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Fritz, Kevin A, against 415 Pr Llc, Park Right Corporation, represented by Blaine, Alison I, Bonfield, Howard S, Burkett, Perry C., Hearle, Matthew E, Kelton, Justin Tyler, (total of 5) See All in the jurisdiction of New York County, NY, . New York County, NY Superior Courts New York County Supreme Court with Shlomo Hagler presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeShlomo Hagler Track Judge’s New Cases |
|
Filing DateAugust 06, 2015 |
CategoryContract (Non-Commercial) |
|
Last RefreshedAugust 01, 2023 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions484 days |
Filing LocationNew York County, NY |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
|
Filing Court HouseNew York County Supreme Court |
Case Outcome TypeDisposed |
Case Cycle Time487 days |
AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION (Motion #002)
Date: November 24, 2015NOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #002)
Date: November 24, 2015NOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #001)
Date: October 26, 2015ANSWER
Date: September 11, 2015MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN SUPPORT (Motion #002)
Date: November 24, 2015ANSWER
Date: August 31, 2015NOTICE OF DISCOVERY AND INSPECTION
Date: September 11, 2015AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION (Motion #001)
Date: October 26, 2015STIPULATION - ADJOURNMENT OF MOTION -IN SUBMISSIONS PART -RM 130 (Motion #002)
Date: December 09, 2015RESPONSE TO DEMAND
Date: September 30, 2015MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN OPPOSITION (Motion #002)
Date: December 22, 2015AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION (Motion #001)
Date: November 03, 2015AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION (Motion #002)
Date: December 22, 2015AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN REPLY (Motion #002)
Date: January 12, 2016NOTICE OF APPEAL (Motion #002)
Date: January 03, 2017MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN OPPOSITION (Motion #002)
Date: December 22, 2015PRE-ARGUMENT STATEMENT (Motion #002)
Date: January 03, 2017AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION (Motion #002)
Date: December 22, 2015AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION (Motion #002)
Date: December 22, 2015JUDGMENT
Date: December 05, 2016SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: August 06, 2015MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN REPLY (Motion #002)
Date: January 12, 2016AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT (Motion #002)
Date: November 24, 2015Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 19, 2018 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF ENTRY | |
March 29, 2018 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF ENTRY | |
January 03, 2017 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF APPEAL (Motion #002) Notice of Appeal |
|
January 03, 2017 | Docket Event |
PRE-ARGUMENT STATEMENT (Motion #002) Pre-Argument Statement |
|
January 03, 2017 | Docket Event |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE (Motion #002) Affirmation of Service |
|
January 03, 2017 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - A (Motion #002) Exhibit A - Order and Judgment |
|
December 05, 2016 | Docket Event | JUDGMENT | |
December 05, 2016 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF ENTRY | |
December 02, 2016 | Docket Event | JUDGMENT - SIGNED BY COURT TO COUNTY CLERK (Motion #002) | |
December 02, 2016 | Docket Event | JUDGMENT - SIGNED BY COURT TO COUNTY CLERK (Motion #001) |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.