Case Last Refreshed: 18 hours ago
Xbase Digital Incorporated, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Taub, Malcolm Stephen, against Britebanc Holdings Ltd., Eppers Consulting, Kenneth Eppers, Paul Nash, in the jurisdiction of New York County. This case was filed in New York County Superior Courts Supreme with Mary V. Rosado presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateSeptember 21, 2022 |
CategoryTorts - Other Negligence (Breach Of Contract) |
Last RefreshedMay 04, 2024 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationNew York County, NY |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
Filing Court HouseSupreme |
This is a complaint filed in Supreme Court of the State of New York, County of New York, Index Number 158082/2022.
xBase Digital Inc. (plaintiff) is suing Paul Nash, Britebanc Holdings Ltd., Kenneth Eppers, and Eppers Consulting (defendants) for bre...
NOTICE OF CHANGE OF FIRM NAME OR ADDRESS (POST RJI)
Date: April 01, 2024NOTICE OF ENTRY Â (Motion #003)
Date: April 08, 2024DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION Â (Motion #003)
Date: April 08, 2024NOTE OF ISSUE:WITHOUT JURY
Date: July 27, 2023NOTICE OF ENTRY
Date: July 27, 2023AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Â (Motion #003)
Date: July 26, 2023AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Â (Motion #003)
Date: July 26, 2023AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Â (Motion #003)
Date: July 26, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - D Â (Motion #003)
Date: July 26, 2023AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Â (Motion #003)
Date: July 26, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - C Â (Motion #003)
Date: July 26, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #003)
Date: July 26, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - B Â (Motion #003)
Date: July 26, 2023NOTICE OF MOTION Â (Motion #003)
Date: July 26, 2023AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT Â (Motion #003)
Date: July 26, 2023DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION Â (Motion #002)
Date: July 11, 2023AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Â (Motion #002)
Date: February 27, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - H Â (Motion #002)
Date: February 27, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - G Â (Motion #002)
Date: February 27, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - F Â (Motion #002)
Date: February 27, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - E Â (Motion #002)
Date: February 27, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - D Â (Motion #002)
Date: February 27, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - C Â (Motion #002)
Date: February 27, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - B Â (Motion #002)
Date: February 27, 2023NOTICE OF MOTION Â (Motion #002)
Date: February 27, 2023AFFIDAVIT Â (Motion #001) *Corrected* Affirmation Of Merit
Date: February 02, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #002)
Date: February 27, 2023CERTIFICATE OF MERIT Â (Motion #002)
Date: February 27, 2023ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE - DECLINED/WITHDRAWN Â (Motion #001)
Date: February 27, 2023AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT Â (Motion #002)
Date: February 27, 2023AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT Â (Motion #001)
Date: February 03, 2023RJI -RE: ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE Â (Motion #001)
Date: February 02, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - H Â (Motion #001)
Date: February 02, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - G Â (Motion #001)
Date: February 02, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - F Â (Motion #001)
Date: February 02, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - E Â (Motion #001)
Date: February 02, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - D Â (Motion #001)
Date: February 02, 2023COMPLAINT
Date: November 09, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - C Â (Motion #001)
Date: February 02, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - B Â (Motion #001)
Date: February 02, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #001)
Date: February 02, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 1 Â (Motion #001)
Date: February 02, 2023NOTICE OF APPEARANCE (PRE RJI)
Date: October 24, 2022AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT Â (Motion #001)
Date: February 02, 2023ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE ( PROPOSED ) Â (Motion #001) *Corrected*
Date: February 02, 2023STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: September 21, 2022SUMMONS WITH NOTICE
Date: September 21, 2022Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 08, 2024 |
NOTICE OF ENTRY (Motion #003) Notice of Entry of Decision and Order on Mot. Seq. 003 |
||
April 08, 2024 | DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION (Motion #003) | ||
April 01, 2024 |
NOTICE OF CHANGE OF FIRM NAME OR ADDRESS (POST RJI) Notice of Change of Firm Name |
||
July 27, 2023 |
NOTE OF ISSUE:WITHOUT JURY Note Of Issue |
||
July 27, 2023 | Notice Of Entry | ||
July 26, 2023 |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE (Motion #003) Kenneth D Eppers Affidavit of Service |
||
July 26, 2023 |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE (Motion #003) Eppers Consulting Affidavit of Service |
||
July 26, 2023 |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE (Motion #003) Paul Nash Affidavit of Service |
||
July 26, 2023 |
EXHIBIT(S) - D (Motion #003) Complaint 11/9/22 |
||
July 26, 2023 |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE (Motion #003) Britebanc Affidavit of Service |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.