Case Last Refreshed: 3 months ago
125 Broad Chp, Llc, filed a(n) Liens - Creditor case represented by Kalina, Jeremy R, against 125 Acquisition, Llc, Fine Craftsman Group, Llc, Harco National Insurance Company, Sullivan & Cromwell, Llp, The 125 Broad Condominium, (total of 7) See All represented by Dineen, Joseph Patrick, in the jurisdiction of New York County. This case was filed in New York County Superior Courts with Arlene P. Bluth presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJuly 25, 2023 |
CategorySpecial Proceedings - Mechanic'S Lien |
Last RefreshedFebruary 02, 2024 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationNew York County, NY |
Matter TypeLiens |
DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION
Date: October 03, 2023NOTICE OF ENTRY Â (Motion #001)
Date: January 02, 2024JUDGMENT
Date: December 29, 2023RJI -RE: NOTICE OF PETITION
Date: July 25, 2023NOTICE OF PETITION Â (Motion #001)
Date: July 25, 2023ACKNOWLEDGEMENT OF SERVICE Â (Motion #001)
Date: July 28, 2023ADDENDUM - GENERAL (840A)
Date: July 25, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 9
Date: July 25, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 8
Date: July 25, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 7
Date: July 25, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 2
Date: July 25, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 4
Date: July 25, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 5
Date: July 25, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 3
Date: July 25, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 1
Date: July 25, 2023PETITION
Date: July 25, 2023Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 02, 2024 |
NOTICE OF ENTRY (Motion #001) Notice of Entry of Judgment |
||
December 29, 2023 | JUDGMENT | ||
October 11, 2023 |
JUDGMENT -TO COURT (PROPOSED) (Motion #001) Proposed Judgment per this Court's Decision & Order dated September 29, 2023 and entered October 3, Proposed Judgment per this Court's Decision & Order dated September 29, 2023 and entered October 3, ... show more |
||
October 04, 2023 |
NOTICE OF ENTRY (Motion #001) Notice of Entry of Decision & Order on Motion dated 9/29/23 & filed/entered with NY County Clerk 10/ Notice of Entry of Decision & Order on Motion dated 9/29/23 & filed/entered with NY County Clerk 10/ ... show more |
||
October 03, 2023 | DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION | ||
August 09, 2023 |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE (Motion #001) Affidavit of Service of Notice of Petition, Verified Petition and Notice of Electronic Filing on Res Affidavit of Service of Notice of Petition, Verified Petition and Notice of Electronic Filing on Res ... show more |
||
August 09, 2023 |
ACKNOWLEDGEMENT OF SERVICE (Motion #001) Stipulation of Acknowledgment of Service of Notice of Petition, Verified Petition and Notice of Elec Stipulation of Acknowledgment of Service of Notice of Petition, Verified Petition and Notice of Elec ... show more |
||
August 02, 2023 |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE (Motion #001) Affidavit of Service of Notice of Petition, Verified Petition and Notice of Electronic Filing on Res Affidavit of Service of Notice of Petition, Verified Petition and Notice of Electronic Filing on Res ... show more |
||
July 28, 2023 |
ACKNOWLEDGEMENT OF SERVICE (Motion #001) Acknowledgment of Service of Petition by Respondent Fine Craftsman Group, LLC, by stipulation |
||
July 25, 2023 | RJI -RE: NOTICE OF PETITION |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.