Case Last Refreshed: 9 months ago
Swift Financial, Llc As Servicing Agent For Webbank, filed a(n) Special Proceedings - Other (Turnover And Related) case represented by Sass, Laurence Jay, against Goldstar Property Services Inc., Landrock Property Group Llc, in the jurisdiction of New York County. This case was filed in New York County Superior Courts with J. Machelle Sweeting presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeJ. Machelle Sweeting Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateAugust 08, 2022 |
CategorySpecial Proceedings - Other (Turnover And Related) |
Last RefreshedJuly 22, 2023 |
|
Filing LocationNew York County, NY |
|
EXHIBIT(S) Â - 1
Date: August 08, 2022PETITION
Date: August 08, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - 10 Landrock Chase Acct #2757 - monthly statements Redacted per 22 NYCRR
Date: August 08, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - 2
Date: August 08, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - 5
Date: August 08, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - 11
Date: August 08, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - 3 Signature card - Landrock Chase bank account Redacted per 22 NYCRR
Date: August 08, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - 4 Certification of Chase Bank records Redacted per 22 NYCRR
Date: August 08, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - 16 Goldstar Chase Acct #7226 - monthly statements Redacted per 22 NYCRR
Date: August 08, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - 12 Signature card - Huffman Chase Acct #6675 Redacted per 22 NYCRR
Date: August 08, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - 14 Huffman credit card accounts Redacted per 22 NYCRR
Date: August 08, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - 13 Signature card - Huffman Chase Acct #3605 Redacted per 22 NYCRR
Date: August 08, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - 15 Landrock Ck #1216 to CarMax Redacted per 22 NYCRR
Date: August 08, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - 6 Signature card - Goldstar Chase Bank account Redacted per 22 NYCRR
Date: August 08, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - 18
Date: August 08, 2022NOTICE OF PETITION ACCOMPANYING COMMENCEMENT DOC(S)
Date: August 08, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - 7
Date: August 08, 2022RJI -RE: NOTICE OF PETITION
Date: August 08, 2022ADDENDUM - GENERAL (840A)
Date: August 08, 2022AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Â (Motion #001)
Date: August 17, 2022AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Â (Motion #001)
Date: August 17, 2022JUDGMENT -TO COUNTY CLERK (PROPOSED)
Date: October 24, 2022DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION
Date: October 21, 2022JUDGMENT -TO COURT (PROPOSED)
Date: November 01, 2022AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Â (Motion #001)
Date: August 17, 2022Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
November 01, 2022 | JUDGMENT -TO COURT (PROPOSED) | ||
October 24, 2022 | JUDGMENT -TO COUNTY CLERK (PROPOSED) | ||
October 21, 2022 | DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION | ||
August 17, 2022 |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE (Motion #001) AOS on respondent Landrock Property Group LLC |
||
August 17, 2022 |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE (Motion #001) AOS on respondent Goldstar Property Services Inc. |
||
August 17, 2022 |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE (Motion #001) AOS on Judgment Debtor 180 Construction Inc. |
||
August 08, 2022 |
EXHIBIT(S) - 8 180 Construction Chase Acct # 1233 - statements and signature card Redacted per 22 NYCRR 180 Construction Chase Acct # 1233 - statements and signature card Redacted |
||
August 08, 2022 |
EXHIBIT(S) - 1 Judgment against Akiva Huffman and 180 Construction |
||
August 08, 2022 |
PETITION Verified Petition |
||
August 08, 2022 |
EXHIBIT(S) - 10 Landrock Chase Acct #2757 - monthly statements Redacted per 22 NYCRR Landrock Chase Acct #2757 - monthly statements Redacted |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.