Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Ardijan Taraku, Gelela Daba, filed a(n) Tort case represented by Decolator, John V, against Leonid Nisenboym, represented by Friedman, Brendan Forrest, Perl, Michael Jay, in the jurisdiction of New York County. This case was filed in New York County Superior Courts New York County Supreme Court with Paul Goetz presiding.
Case Number |
||
Filing DateJune 23, 2014 |
CategoryTort |
|
Last RefreshedJanuary 24, 2021 |
||
Filing LocationNew York County, NY |
||
Filing Court HouseNew York County Supreme Court |
Case Outcome TypeDisposed |
Case Cycle Time1465 days |
STIPULATION - DISCONTINUANCE (POST RJI)
Date: June 27, 2018STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: October 30, 2014ANSWER WITH COUNTER-CLAIM(S)
Date: October 30, 2014NOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #001)
Date: September 15, 2015AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT (Motion #002)
Date: December 19, 2016SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: June 23, 2014DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION (Motion #001)
Date: October 20, 2015RJI -RE: NOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #001)
Date: September 15, 2015NOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #002)
Date: December 19, 2016DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION (Motion #003)
Date: October 19, 2017ORDER - CASE SCHEDULING
Date: October 27, 2015STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: June 27, 2018NOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #003)
Date: April 27, 2017LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE (Motion #002)
Date: January 12, 2017STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING (Motion #002)
Date: December 19, 2016Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 27, 2018 | Docket Event | STIPULATION - DISCONTINUANCE (POST RJI) | |
June 27, 2018 | Docket Event | STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING | |
October 19, 2017 | Docket Event | DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION (Motion #003) | |
September 11, 2017 | Hearing |
OTHER SETTLEMENT (PRE-NOTE) COMPLIANCE CONFERENCE 22 DCM 9:30 MOT. DISM. Judge: GOETZ, PAUL A. (DCM) |
|
June 30, 2017 | Hearing |
FULLY SUBMITTED - NO OPP (Motion #003) E-FILING SUBMISSIONS CALENDAR BY REFEREE 05/24/17 Judge: GOETZ, PAUL A. (DCM) |
|
June 16, 2017 | Hearing |
STATUS CONFERENCE ADJOURNED COMPLIANCE CONFERENCE 22 DCM CON/JT WITH BX. CASE AWAITING TFD. ORDER Judge: GOETZ, PAUL A. (DCM) |
|
May 24, 2017 | Hearing |
ADJOURNED (Motion #003) E-FILING SUBMISSIONS CALENDAR BY REFEREE 05/24/17 Judge: GOETZ, PAUL A. (DCM) |
|
April 27, 2017 | Motion |
DISMISS ACTION (Motion #003) Decided: 10/18/2017MOTION GRANTED Before Justice: GOETZ, PAUL A. (DCM) Answer demanded: Yes Judge: GOETZ, PAUL A. (DCM) |
|
April 27, 2017 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - D (Motion #003) Order |
|
April 27, 2017 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - C (Motion #003) Notice of Non-Compliance |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.