Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Beth Ann Cassidy-Roberts, Ian Macdonald, James Roberts, filed a(n) General Torts - Torts case represented by Levine, Jared T, Morgan, Duane Richard, Morgan Levine Dolan, P.C., Zhu, Michael H., against The New York And Presbyterian Hospital A.K.A. The Society Of The New York Hospital, Turner Construction Company, represented by Harris, Althea Waveney, Sparling, John E, Kallfa, Evis, Mevorach, Daniel P, in the jurisdiction of New York County. This case was filed in New York County Superior Courts New York County Supreme Court with Lyle E. Frank presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeLyle E. Frank Track Judge’s New Cases |
Time To Management207 days |
Filing DateJune 30, 2017 |
CategoryTorts - Other (Labor Law) |
|
Last RefreshedOctober 10, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
|
Filing LocationNew York County, NY |
Matter TypeGeneral Torts |
|
Filing Court HouseNew York County Supreme Court |
SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: June 30, 2017NOTICE OF DISCOVERY AND INSPECTION
Date: January 05, 2018AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION Â (Motion #001)
Date: May 18, 2020NOTICE OF MOTION Â (Motion #001) *Corrected*
Date: May 18, 2020LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE
Date: December 17, 2019NOTICE OF DISCOVERY AND INSPECTION
Date: September 24, 2019SUBPOENA ( REQUEST TO SO ORDER )
Date: January 27, 2020ANSWER
Date: October 04, 2017ANSWER TO THIRD PARTY COMPLAINT
Date: August 12, 2019SUBPOENA ( REQUEST TO SO ORDER )
Date: February 12, 2020ANSWER TO THIRD PARTY COMPLAINT
Date: May 09, 2019EXHIBIT(S) Â - D
Date: June 25, 2019NOTICE OF APPEARANCE (POST RJI)
Date: August 12, 2019BILL OF PARTICULARS
Date: January 05, 2018THIRD PARTY SUMMONS/COMPLAINT
Date: April 17, 2019ORDER - STATUS CONFERENCE
Date: February 07, 2019AFFIDAVIT
Date: October 04, 2017AFFIDAVIT
Date: April 29, 2019EXHIBIT(S) Â - C
Date: June 25, 2019PRE-TRIAL DOCUMENT(S)
Date: November 05, 2019THIRD PARTY SUMMONS/COMPLAINT
Date: June 25, 2019ORDER - STATUS CONFERENCE
Date: September 27, 2019EXHIBIT(S) Â - B Â (Motion #001)
Date: May 18, 2020EXHIBIT(S) Â - A
Date: June 25, 2019ORDER - STATUS CONFERENCE
Date: January 22, 2020NOTICE
Date: June 22, 2020EXHIBIT(S) Â - E Â (Motion #001)
Date: May 18, 2020EXHIBIT(S) Â - G Â (Motion #001)
Date: May 18, 2020EXHIBIT(S) Â - H Â (Motion #001)
Date: May 18, 2020RJI -RE: REQUEST FOR PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE
Date: October 25, 2017PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE REQUEST
Date: October 25, 2017AFFIDAVIT
Date: July 25, 2017NOTICE
Date: December 27, 2017ORDER - PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE
Date: January 25, 2018EXHIBIT(S) Â - D Â (Motion #001)
Date: May 18, 2020URGENT - COURT APPEARANCE UPDATE
Date: March 19, 2020NOTICE TO ADMIT
Date: June 26, 2020EXHIBIT(S) Â - J Â (Motion #001)
Date: May 18, 2020NOTICE OF APPEARANCE (POST RJI)
Date: June 03, 2020AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Â (Motion #001)
Date: May 18, 2020STIPULATION - ADJOURNMENT OF CONFERENCE
Date: September 10, 2018STIPULATION - OTHER - ( REQUEST TO SO ORDER ) Â (Motion #001)
Date: July 14, 2020EXHIBIT(S) Â - B
Date: June 25, 2019EXHIBIT(S) Â - C Â (Motion #002)
Date: September 25, 2020EXHIBIT(S) Â - E Â (Motion #002)
Date: September 25, 2020EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #002)
Date: September 25, 2020EXHIBIT(S) Â - I Â (Motion #001)
Date: May 18, 2020EXHIBIT(S) Â - I Â (Motion #002)
Date: September 25, 2020AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION
Date: July 16, 2020NOTICE OF MOTION Â (Motion #002)
Date: September 25, 2020BILL OF PARTICULARS
Date: September 24, 2019AFFIDAVIT
Date: April 29, 2019ORDER - COMPLIANCE CONFERENCE
Date: October 10, 2018EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #001)
Date: May 18, 2020EXHIBIT(S) Â - C Â (Motion #001)
Date: May 18, 2020EXHIBIT(S) Â - B Â (Motion #002)
Date: September 25, 2020EXHIBIT(S) Â - D Â (Motion #002)
Date: September 25, 2020EXHIBIT(S) Â - H Â (Motion #002)
Date: September 25, 2020EXHIBIT(S) Â - F Â (Motion #002)
Date: September 25, 2020EXHIBIT(S) Â - O Â (Motion #002)
Date: September 25, 2020EXHIBIT(S) Â - G Â (Motion #002)
Date: September 25, 2020EXHIBIT(S) Â - N Â (Motion #002)
Date: September 25, 2020EXHIBIT(S) Â - J Â (Motion #002)
Date: September 25, 2020EXHIBIT(S) Â - E Â (Motion #002)
Date: October 26, 2020AFFIDAVIT Â (Motion #002)
Date: September 25, 2020EXHIBIT(S) Â - C Â (Motion #002)
Date: October 26, 2020EXHIBIT(S) Â - B Â (Motion #002)
Date: October 26, 2020MEMORANDUM OF LAW Â (Motion #002)
Date: September 25, 2020AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT Â (Motion #002)
Date: September 25, 2020AFFIDAVIT Â (Motion #002)
Date: September 25, 2020EXHIBIT(S) Â - K Â (Motion #002)
Date: September 25, 2020EXHIBIT(S) Â - M Â (Motion #002)
Date: September 25, 2020NOTICE OF CROSS-MOTION Â (Motion #002)
Date: October 26, 2020AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT Â (Motion #002)
Date: October 26, 2020EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #002)
Date: October 26, 2020EXHIBIT(S) Â - L Â (Motion #002)
Date: September 25, 2020EXHIBIT(S) Â - F Â (Motion #002)
Date: October 26, 2020EXHIBIT(S) Â - J Â (Motion #002)
Date: October 26, 2020EXHIBIT(S) Â - H Â (Motion #002)
Date: October 26, 2020STIPULATION - ADJOURNMENT OF MOTION -IN SUBMISSIONS PART -RM 130
Date: October 16, 2020EXHIBIT(S) Â - G Â (Motion #002)
Date: October 26, 2020EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #002)
Date: November 23, 2020EXHIBIT(S) Â - L Â (Motion #002) Exhibit L Incident Reports
Date: October 26, 2020ACKNOWLEDGEMENT OF SERVICE Â (Motion #002)
Date: November 23, 2020AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN REPLY Â (Motion #002)
Date: November 23, 2020EXHIBIT(S) Â - I Â (Motion #002)
Date: October 26, 2020EXHIBIT(S) Â - B Â (Motion #002)
Date: November 23, 2020AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION Â (Motion #002)
Date: November 03, 2020STIPULATION - DISCONTINUANCE (POST RJI)
Date: January 12, 2021AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN REPLY Â (Motion #002)
Date: November 20, 2020NOTICE OF CROSS-MOTION Â (Motion #002)
Date: November 04, 2020AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Â (Motion #002)
Date: November 04, 2020EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #002)
Date: November 04, 2020AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN REPLY Â (Motion #002)
Date: November 23, 2020EXHIBIT(S) Â - K Â (Motion #002)
Date: October 26, 2020EXHIBIT(S) Â - F Â (Motion #001)
Date: May 18, 2020BILL OF PARTICULARS
Date: June 12, 2019MEMORANDUM OF LAW
Date: November 04, 2020DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION
Date: October 13, 2021AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN REPLY Â (Motion #001)
Date: August 03, 2020EXHIBIT(S) Â - D Â (Motion #002)
Date: October 26, 2020EXHIBIT(S) Â - E Â (Motion #003)
Date: June 15, 2022AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION Â (Motion #003)
Date: June 15, 2022NOTE OF ISSUE:WITH JURY
Date: December 09, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - E Â (Motion #004)
Date: August 25, 2022NOTICE OF APPEAL *Corrected*
Date: August 25, 2022AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT Â (Motion #004)
Date: August 25, 2022AFFIRMATION
Date: September 26, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #004)
Date: August 25, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - A
Date: September 26, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #003)
Date: July 11, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - A
Date: July 26, 2022NOTICE OF MOTION Â (Motion #003)
Date: June 15, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - C Â (Motion #003)
Date: June 15, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - D Â (Motion #003)
Date: June 15, 2022NOTICE OF ENTRY Â (Motion #002)
Date: October 11, 2021AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION Â (Motion #003)
Date: July 11, 2022STIPULATION - ADJOURNMENT OF MOTION -IN SUBMISSIONS PART -RM 130
Date: June 27, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - F Â (Motion #003)
Date: June 15, 2022NOTICE OF ENTRY
Date: October 11, 2021AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION
Date: September 08, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - B Â (Motion #003)
Date: June 15, 2022NOTICE OF ENTRY Â (Motion #003)
Date: August 05, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - B Â (Motion #004)
Date: August 25, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - C Â (Motion #004)
Date: August 25, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - B Â (Motion #003)
Date: July 11, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - A
Date: September 26, 2022NOTICE OF CHANGE OF FIRM NAME OR ADDRESS (POST RJI)
Date: October 21, 2022STIPULATION - OTHER
Date: November 15, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - A
Date: September 26, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #003)
Date: June 15, 2022NOTICE OF CHANGE OF FIRM NAME OR ADDRESS (POST RJI)
Date: December 08, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - C Â (Motion #003)
Date: July 11, 2022DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION
Date: July 26, 2022AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: July 11, 2022NOTICE OF MOTION Â (Motion #004)
Date: August 25, 2022AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: September 09, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - A
Date: September 26, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - A
Date: September 26, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #004)
Date: September 08, 2022STIPULATION - OTHER Â (Motion #004)
Date: January 13, 2023STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: July 25, 2017Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 13, 2023 |
STIPULATION - OTHER (Motion #004) Stipulation Adjourning Motion |
||
November 15, 2022 |
STIPULATION - OTHER STIPULATION ADJOURNING MOTION |
||
October 21, 2022 |
NOTICE OF CHANGE OF FIRM NAME OR ADDRESS (POST RJI) Change of Address |
||
September 26, 2022 | AFFIRMATION IN FURTHER SUPPORT OF THIRD-PARTY PLAINTIFFS' MOTION TO REARGUE | ||
September 26, 2022 |
EXHIBIT(S) - A EXHIBIT A-Redacted-Part 1 |
||
September 26, 2022 |
EXHIBIT(S) - A EXHIBIT A-Redacted-Part 5 |
||
September 26, 2022 |
EXHIBIT(S) - A EXHIBIT A-Redacted-Part 3 |
||
September 26, 2022 |
EXHIBIT(S) - A EXHIBIT A- Redacted-Part 2 |
||
September 26, 2022 |
EXHIBIT(S) - A EXHIBIT A-Redacted-Part 4 |
||
September 09, 2022 | AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.