Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Bonnie Haydon, Frank Pellegrino Sr., Morano Associates, Inc., The Victor Family Trust, filed a(n) General Commercial - Commercial case represented by Fioccola, David J, against Rao'S Specialty Foods, Inc., Ronald Straci, Sharon Straci, represented by Birnbaum, Sheila L., Elsberg, David L, Fleming, Douglas Eugene, in the jurisdiction of New York County. This case was filed in New York County Superior Courts New York County Supreme Court with Anil Singh presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeAnil Singh Track Judge’s New Cases |
|
Filing DateJuly 15, 2016 |
CategoryCommercial Division |
|
Last RefreshedOctober 10, 2023 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
|
Filing LocationNew York County, NY |
Matter TypeGeneral Commercial |
|
Filing Court HouseNew York County Supreme Court |
Case Outcome TypeDisposed |
Case Cycle Time45 days |
RJI -RE: ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE
Date: July 15, 2016STIPULATION - DISCONTINUANCE (POST RJI)
Date: August 25, 2016ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE
Date: July 18, 2016EXHIBIT(S) Â - L
Date: July 15, 2016EXHIBIT(S) Â - N
Date: July 15, 2016EXHIBIT(S) Â - M
Date: July 15, 2016EXHIBIT(S) Â - K
Date: July 15, 2016EXHIBIT(S) Â - J
Date: July 15, 2016EXHIBIT(S) Â - A
Date: July 15, 2016EXHIBIT(S) Â - D
Date: July 15, 2016EXHIBIT(S) Â - E
Date: July 15, 2016EXHIBIT(S) Â - B
Date: July 15, 2016EXHIBIT(S) Â - O
Date: July 15, 2016EXHIBIT(S) Â - P
Date: July 15, 2016EXHIBIT(S) Â - Q
Date: July 15, 2016NOTICE OF APPEARANCE (POST RJI)
Date: July 19, 2016NOTICE OF APPEARANCE (POST RJI)
Date: July 19, 2016NOTICE OF APPEARANCE (POST RJI)
Date: July 19, 2016EXHIBIT(S) Â - F
Date: July 15, 2016EXHIBIT(S) Â - C
Date: July 15, 2016EXHIBIT(S) Â - I
Date: July 15, 2016EXHIBIT(S) Â - G
Date: July 15, 2016EXHIBIT(S) Â - H
Date: July 15, 2016DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION
Date: August 26, 2016AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF PROPOSED OSC/EXPARTE APP
Date: July 15, 2016MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN SUPPORT
Date: July 15, 2016ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE ( PROPOSED )
Date: July 15, 2016PETITION
Date: July 15, 2016Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 29, 2016 | Hearing |
DISCONTINUED PRE-NOTE STATUS CONFERENCE 45 NYSEF DOC. 27 Judge: SINGH, ANIL C. |
|
August 26, 2016 | Docket Event | DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION | |
August 26, 2016 | Hearing |
MOTION DECIDED-OPEN APPEARANCE (Motion #001) IAS MOTION 45EFM 10AM CONTROL Judge: SINGH, ANIL C. |
|
August 25, 2016 | Docket Event |
STIPULATION - DISCONTINUANCE (POST RJI) Stipulation Discontinuing Action |
|
July 20, 2016 | Hearing |
STATUS CONFERENCE HELD STATUS CONFERENCE 45 4PM PHONE CONF Judge: SINGH, ANIL C. |
|
July 19, 2016 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE (POST RJI) Notice of Appearance - Douglas E. Fleming |
|
July 19, 2016 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE (POST RJI) Notice of Appearance - David L. Elsberg |
|
July 19, 2016 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE (POST RJI) Notice of Appearance - Sheila Birnbaum |
|
July 18, 2016 | Docket Event | ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE | |
July 15, 2016 | Docket Event | RJI -RE: ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.