Case Last Refreshed: 9 months ago
Juliet Chin, filed a(n) Premises Liability - Torts case represented by Goodstein, Matthew Demars, against City Of New York, Long Island Railroad, Metropolitan Transportation Authority, Mta New York City Transit, New York City Transit Authority, (total of 5) See All represented by Berkowitz, David Evan, Bila, Anthony, Counsel, Corporation, in the jurisdiction of New York County. This case was filed in New York County Superior Courts with Denise Dominguez presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeDenise Dominguez Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateMay 21, 2021 |
CategoryTorts - Other Negligence (Premises Liability) |
Last RefreshedJuly 23, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationNew York County, NY |
Matter TypePremises Liability |
SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: May 21, 2021RJI -RE: REQUEST FOR PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE
Date: July 22, 2021NOTICE OF DISCOVERY AND INSPECTION
Date: January 17, 2022AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: May 27, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - H Â (Motion #001) Acevedo Order and Decision
Date: March 24, 2022LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE
Date: February 16, 2022ANSWER WITH CROSS-CLAIM(S)
Date: July 06, 2021AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: June 03, 2021ANSWER
Date: July 20, 2021AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: June 02, 2021ORDER - TRANSFER CASE - REASSIGNMENT
Date: February 17, 2022NOTICE OF MOTION Â (Motion #001)
Date: March 24, 2022ORDER - PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE
Date: August 08, 2022BILL OF PARTICULARS
Date: January 17, 2022NO FEE AUTHORIZATION (LETTER/ORDER/AFFIRMATION) Â (Motion #001)
Date: March 24, 2022AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: June 03, 2021AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: June 03, 2021PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE REQUEST
Date: July 22, 2021ACKNOWLEDGEMENT OF SERVICE
Date: June 07, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - D Â (Motion #001)
Date: March 24, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - B Â (Motion #001)
Date: March 24, 2022AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION Â (Motion #001)
Date: March 24, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - E Â (Motion #001)
Date: March 24, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - C Â (Motion #001)
Date: March 24, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #001) Notice of Claim Redacted per 22 NYCRR
Date: March 24, 2022NOTICE TO COUNTY CLERK CPLR 8019(C)
Date: February 17, 2022AFFIRMATION Â (Motion #001)
Date: March 24, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - F Â (Motion #001)
Date: March 24, 2022STATEMENT OF MATERIAL FACTS Â (Motion #001)
Date: March 24, 2022STIPULATION OF DISCONTINUANCE - SO ORDERED
Date: July 29, 2022LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE
Date: March 31, 2022DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION
Date: August 02, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - G Â (Motion #001)
Date: March 24, 2022STIPULATION - DISCONTINUANCE (POST RJI)
Date: July 29, 2022NOTICE OF DISCOVERY AND INSPECTION
Date: January 20, 2023ORDER - COMPLIANCE CONFERENCE
Date: February 08, 2023Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 08, 2023 | ORDER - COMPLIANCE CONFERENCE | ||
January 20, 2023 |
NOTICE OF DISCOVERY AND INSPECTION POST-EBT DEMANDS |
||
August 08, 2022 | ORDER - PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE | ||
August 02, 2022 | DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION | ||
July 29, 2022 | STIPULATION OF DISCONTINUANCE - SO ORDERED | ||
July 29, 2022 | STIPULATION - DISCONTINUANCE (POST RJI) | ||
March 31, 2022 |
LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE Letter regarding PC |
||
March 24, 2022 |
EXHIBIT(S) - H (Motion #001) Acevedo Order and Decision Acevedo Order and Decision Possible SSN Administratively Redacted |
||
March 24, 2022 |
NOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #001) Notice of Motion |
||
March 24, 2022 |
NO FEE AUTHORIZATION (LETTER/ORDER/AFFIRMATION) (Motion #001) no fee letter |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.