Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Noreen D Roth, filed a(n) Malpractice - Torts case represented by Burstein, Judd, Record, John-Christopher, Saburn, Joseph M., Stanton, Michael K., against Asher Rubenstein, Kenneth Rubenstein, Rubinstein & Rubenstein, L.L.P., represented by Hochberg, Shari B., Rubinstein, Kenneth, Salant, Scott M, Venditti, Lorenzo, in the jurisdiction of New York County. This case was filed in New York County Superior Courts New York County Supreme Court with Lynn R Kotler presiding.
Case Number |
Time To Management684 days |
|
Filing DateJune 09, 2016 |
CategoryTorts - Other Professional Malpractice (Legal Malpractice) |
|
Last RefreshedOctober 10, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions1460 days |
Filing LocationNew York County, NY |
Matter TypeMalpractice |
|
Filing Court HouseNew York County Supreme Court |
Case Outcome TypeDisposed |
Case Cycle Time1470 days |
AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF PROPOSED OSC/EXPARTE APP (Motion #002)
Date: February 04, 2019AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION (Motion #003)
Date: February 28, 2020AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION (Motion #003)
Date: February 28, 2020STIPULATION - ADJOURNMENT OF MOTION -IN SUBMISSIONS PART -RM 130
Date: December 30, 2019DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION (Motion #003)
Date: May 21, 2020STIPULATION - ADJOURNMENT OF MOTION -IN SUBMISSIONS PART -RM 130 (Motion #003)
Date: February 13, 2020JUDGMENT -TO COURT (PROPOSED)
Date: June 18, 2020AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN REPLY (Motion #003)
Date: March 20, 2020STIPULATION - OTHER - ( REQUEST TO SO ORDER ) (Motion #003)
Date: February 19, 2020LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE
Date: June 18, 2020MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN REPLY (Motion #003)
Date: March 20, 2020MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN OPPOSITION (Motion #003)
Date: February 28, 2020NOTICE OF APPEAL (Motion #003)
Date: June 15, 2020LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE (Motion #003)
Date: February 19, 2020MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN REPLY (Motion #003)
Date: March 21, 2020ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE (Motion #002)
Date: February 20, 2019DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION (Motion #002)
Date: March 13, 2019ANSWER
Date: November 21, 2016NOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #001)
Date: January 16, 2017STIPULATION - SO ORDERED (Motion #003)
Date: February 21, 2020DEMAND FOR COMPLAINT
Date: October 20, 2016STIPULATION - SO ORDERED
Date: July 01, 2019STIPULATION - SO ORDERED
Date: September 06, 2018MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN SUPPORT (Motion #003)
Date: December 06, 2019AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT (Motion #003)
Date: December 06, 2019AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT (Motion #003)
Date: December 06, 2019NOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #003) *Corrected*
Date: December 06, 2019STIPULATION - OTHER
Date: July 12, 2019STIPULATION - OTHER
Date: June 19, 2019ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE ( PROPOSED ) (Motion #002)
Date: February 04, 2019STIPULATION - CONFIDENTIALITY ( REQUEST TO SO ORDER )
Date: January 08, 2019STIPULATION - DISCOVERY ( REQUEST TO SO ORDER )
Date: August 24, 2018STIPULATION - SO ORDERED
Date: July 23, 2018STIPULATION - CONFIDENTIALITY ( REQUEST TO SO ORDER )
Date: July 17, 2018LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE
Date: January 19, 2018DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION (Motion #001)
Date: January 12, 2018AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN REPLY (Motion #001)
Date: February 08, 2017AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION (Motion #001)
Date: February 01, 2017AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION (Motion #001)
Date: January 16, 2017COMPLAINT
Date: November 08, 2016Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 18, 2020 | Docket Event | JUDGMENT -TO COURT (PROPOSED) | |
June 18, 2020 | Docket Event | LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE | |
June 17, 2020 | Hearing |
DISPOSED/RESULT OF MOTION EARLY SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE-1 Judge: VIGILANTE, MILES J. (AR) |
|
June 15, 2020 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF APPEAL (Motion #003) Notice of Appeal, with supporting documents |
|
June 08, 2020 | Docket Event |
BILL OF COSTS (PROPOSED) verified bill of costs |
|
June 08, 2020 | Docket Event | JUDGMENT -TO COUNTY CLERK (PROPOSED) | |
May 22, 2020 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF ENTRY | |
May 21, 2020 | Docket Event | DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION (Motion #003) | |
March 23, 2020 | Hearing |
FULLY SUBMITTED (Motion #003) PAPERLESS PART NO APPEARANCE PER SOS FILE IN PART Judge: KOTLER, LYNN R. |
|
March 21, 2020 | Docket Event |
MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN REPLY (Motion #003) Fixing Table of Contents and Authorities |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.