Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Deborah A Goldberg, filed a(n) Tort case represented by Harris, Steven R, Harris, Steven Robert, against 55 Wall Associates, Llc., Cipriani 55 Wall, Llc.,, Cipriani Club 55, Llc., Cipriani Restaurant 55, Llc., Gc 55 Ballroom, Llc., (total of 6) See All represented by Apostol, Barbara J, Murphy, Austin P, in the jurisdiction of New York County, NY, . New York County, NY Superior Courts New York County Supreme Court with Joan Kenney presiding.
Case Number |
||
Filing DateJuly 23, 2012 |
CategoryTort |
|
Last RefreshedFebruary 22, 2021 |
||
Filing LocationNew York County, NY |
||
Filing Court HouseNew York County Supreme Court |
Case Outcome TypeDisposed |
Case Cycle Time624 days |
DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION (Motion #002)
Date: December 04, 2013NOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #002)
Date: November 01, 2013STIPULATION - DISCONTINUANCE (POST RJI)
Date: April 03, 2014AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION AND IN SUPPORT OF CROSS-MOTION (Motion #002)
Date: November 01, 2013ANSWER TO THIRD PARTY COMPLAINT
Date: July 16, 2013AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN REPLY (Motion #002)
Date: November 11, 2013DEMAND FOR:
Date: May 02, 2013DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION (Motion #003)
Date: April 08, 2014AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION (Motion #003)
Date: January 10, 2014AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION (Motion #002)
Date: November 01, 2013STIPULATION - ADJOURNMENT OF MOTION -IN SUBMISSIONS PART -RM 130 (Motion #003)
Date: January 31, 2014RJI -RE: NOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #001)
Date: November 30, 2012DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION (Motion #001)
Date: February 14, 2013COMPLAINT (AMENDED)
Date: October 03, 2012NOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #001)
Date: November 30, 2012STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: September 20, 2013SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: July 23, 2012STIPULATION - ADJOURNMENT OF MOTION -IN SUBMISSIONS PART -RM 130 (Motion #003)
Date: March 04, 2014NOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #003)
Date: January 10, 2014STIPULATION - OTHER
Date: April 10, 2013AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION (Motion #001)
Date: November 30, 2012NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF MOTION / ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE (Motion #003)
Date: April 03, 2014STIPULATION - PARTIAL DISCONTINUANCE (POST RJI)
Date: September 20, 2013STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: July 23, 2012Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 08, 2014 | Docket Event |
DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION (Motion #003) re: motion no. 003, DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION entered in the office of the County Clerk on April 08 |
|
April 03, 2014 | Docket Event |
STIPULATION - DISCONTINUANCE (POST RJI) Stipulation of Discontinuance |
|
April 03, 2014 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF MOTION / ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE (Motion #003) Letter to Clerk withdrawing Motion for Summary Judgment |
|
March 04, 2014 | Docket Event |
STIPULATION - ADJOURNMENT OF MOTION -IN SUBMISSIONS PART -RM 130 (Motion #003) Stipulation to Adjourn Motion for Summary Judgment |
|
January 31, 2014 | Docket Event |
STIPULATION - ADJOURNMENT OF MOTION -IN SUBMISSIONS PART -RM 130 (Motion #003) Stipulation Adjourning Motion to March 5, 2014 |
|
January 10, 2014 | Docket Event |
AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION (Motion #003) Affirmation in Support |
|
January 10, 2014 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #003) Notice of Motion |
|
January 10, 2014 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - E (Motion #003) Exhibit E |
|
January 10, 2014 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - D (Motion #003) Exhibit D |
|
January 10, 2014 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - C (Motion #003) Exhibit C |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.