Case Last Refreshed: 11 months ago
Fireman'S Fund Insurance Company A S O 815 Park Avenue Owners Inc., filed a(n) General Torts - Torts case represented by Sheps, Robert C, against Andrew Ross, Nicole Ross, Vir Builders, Inc, Vir Construction Inc., represented by Grae, Mark Harris, Murphy, Patrick M., in the jurisdiction of New York County. This case was filed in New York County Superior Courts New York County Supreme Court with James D'Auguste presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateMay 23, 2017 |
CategoryTorts - Other (Property Damage) |
Last RefreshedJuly 30, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationNew York County, NY |
Matter TypeGeneral Torts |
Filing Court HouseNew York County Supreme Court |
SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: May 23, 2017STIPULATION - TIME TO ANSWER
Date: October 31, 2017STIPULATION - DISCONTINUANCE (PRE RJI)
Date: December 27, 2019ANSWER
Date: November 22, 2017ANSWER
Date: September 22, 2017Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 16, 2020 | Hearing |
ADJOURNED WITHOUT A DATE IAS PRELIMINARYCONFERENCE 55 10AM Judge: D'AUGUSTE, JAMES EDWARD |
|
March 19, 2020 | Docket Event | URGENT - COURT APPEARANCE UPDATE | |
March 18, 2020 | Hearing |
PRELIM CONFERENCE ADJOURNED IAS PRELIMINARYCONFERENCE 55 10AM CONTROL/STIP Judge: D'AUGUSTE, JAMES EDWARD |
|
February 19, 2020 | Hearing |
PRELIM CONFERENCE ADJOURNED IAS PRELIMINARYCONFERENCE 55 10AM CONTROL/STIP Judge: D'AUGUSTE, JAMES EDWARD |
|
December 27, 2019 | Docket Event |
STIPULATION - DISCONTINUANCE (PRE RJI) Stipulation of Discontinuance |
|
October 30, 2019 | Hearing |
PRELIM CONFERENCE ADJOURNED IAS PRELIMINARYCONFERENCE 55 10AM Judge: D'AUGUSTE, JAMES EDWARD |
|
July 17, 2019 | Hearing |
PRELIM CONFERENCE ADJOURNED IAS PRELIMINARYCONFERENCE 55 10AM Judge: D'AUGUSTE, JAMES EDWARD |
|
May 01, 2019 | Hearing |
PRELIM CONFERENCE ADJOURNED IAS PRELIMINARYCONFERENCE 55 10:00AM Judge: D'AUGUSTE, JAMES EDWARD |
|
February 27, 2019 | Docket Event | ADDENDUM - GENERAL (840A) | |
February 27, 2019 | Docket Event | RJI -RE: REQUEST FOR PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.