Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
The Board Of Managers Of The Sunnette Tribeca Condominium, filed a(n) Special Proceedings - Other (Cplr 5206(D) And/Or (E)) case represented by Seeman, Fred L, against Broadway 922 Enterprises, Llc, Internal Revenue Service Of The United States Of America, Michael Castaldi, New York City Department Of Finance, New York State Department Of Taxation And Finance, (total of 7) See All represented by Bernstein, Debra B, Wolf, Robert A., in the jurisdiction of New York County. This case was filed in New York County Superior Courts New York County Supreme Court with Lynn R Kotler presiding.
Case Number |
||
Filing DateJune 03, 2016 |
CategorySpecial Proceedings - Other (Cplr 5206(D) And/Or (E)) |
|
Last RefreshedJanuary 10, 2021 |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions1036 days |
|
Filing LocationNew York County, NY |
||
Filing Court HouseNew York County Supreme Court |
Case Outcome TypeDisposed |
Case Cycle Time1026 days |
PETITION
Date: June 03, 2016DECISION ON MOTION -SETTLE ORD / JGMT (Motion #001)
Date: December 01, 2016NOTICE OF PETITION (Motion #001)
Date: June 03, 2016ORDER - OTHER
Date: February 05, 2019ORDER - (PROPOSED) "SUBMIT ORDER" PER JUDGES DECISION
Date: December 15, 2016ORDER - DISMISSAL
Date: April 05, 2019NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT W/PROPOSED ORDER/COUNTER ORDER
Date: December 15, 2016RJI -RE: NOTICE OF PETITION
Date: June 03, 2016ORDER - MOTION - LONG FORM (Motion #001)
Date: February 15, 2017Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 05, 2019 | Docket Event | ORDER - DISMISSAL | |
March 26, 2019 | Hearing |
OTHER FINAL DISP. (PRE-NOTE) CLERK'S PART A.M. 10 AM ADM. DISMISSAL Judge: KAPLAN, DEBORAH ANN |
|
February 05, 2019 | Docket Event | ORDER - OTHER | |
March 16, 2017 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF APPEARANCE (POST RJI) | |
February 16, 2017 | Docket Event |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Affidavit of Service of Notice of Entry |
|
February 16, 2017 | Docket Event | Notice of Entry w/ Order to Appoint a Temporary Receiver | |
February 15, 2017 | Docket Event | ORDER - MOTION - LONG FORM (Motion #001) | |
December 15, 2016 | Docket Event |
ORDER - (PROPOSED) "SUBMIT ORDER" PER JUDGES DECISION Proposed Order to Appoint a Temporary Receiver |
|
December 15, 2016 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT W/PROPOSED ORDER/COUNTER ORDER Notice of Settlement of Proposed Order |
|
December 15, 2016 | Docket Event |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Affidavit of Service of Notice of Settlement of Proposed Order |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.