Your recipients will receive an email with this envelope shortly and will be able to access it on trellis. You can always see your envelopes by clicking the Inbox on the top right hand corner.
xxxxxx xxxxxxx v. Ottomanelli Bros., Inc. D/B/A Ottomanelli Bros., John Doe 1
A Torts - Other (False Advertising) case was filed by (Subcribe to view) represented by (Subcribe to view) against (Subscribe to view) represented by (Subscribe to view) in the jurisdiction of New York County. Judge Richard G. Latin presiding.
Case Details
Case Number
Filing Date
May 23, 2023
Last Refreshed
January 25, 2024
Filing Location
New York County, NY
Category
Torts - Other (False Advertising)
Practice Area
Torts
Matter Type
General Torts
Overview
This is an action seeking monetary damages, injunctive relief, recovery of attorneys’ fees,
and the imposition of statutory punitive damages against the defendant(s) for their violations
of NYGBL § 349, NYGBL § 350, negligence under Agricultural and Markets Law § 199-a et
seq., and common law fraud, based on their false and misleading labeling and advertising
practices.
Causes of Action
1. Violation of NYGBL § 349
2. Violation of NYGBL § 350
3. Negligence under Agricultural and Markets Law § 199-a et seq.
4. Common Law Fraud
5. Injunctive Relief
6. Recovery of Attorneys’ Fees under NYGBL 349(h
Case Complaint Summary
This is a complaint filed in New York County, New York on August 10, 2023. The plaintiff, xxxxxx xxxxxxx, is suing Ottomanelli Bros., Inc. d/b/a Ottomanelli Bros. and John Doe 1 for violations of NYGBL § 349, NYGBL § 350, negligence under Agricul…...
Parties
Plaintiffs
Attorneys for Plaintiffs
Defendants
Attorneys for Defendants
Case Documents
AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION
Date: Dec 18, 2023MEMORANDUM OF LAW
Date: Dec 18, 2023STIPULATION - ADJOURNMENT OF MOTION -IN SUBMISSIONS PART -RM 130
Date: Nov 30, 2023AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION (Motion 001)
Date: Nov 27, 2023AFFIDAVIT (Motion 001)
Date: Nov 27, 2023MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN OPPOSITION
Date: Nov 27, 2023MEMORANDUM OF LAW
Date: Oct 16, 2023EXHIBIT(S) - C (Motion 001)
Date: Oct 08, 2023EXHIBIT(S) - A (Motion 001)
Date: Oct 08, 2023NOTICE OF MOTION
Date: Oct 08, 2023AFFIRMATION (Motion 001)
Date: Oct 08, 2023AFFIDAVIT (Motion 001)
Date: Oct 08, 2023AFFIDAVIT (Motion 001)
Date: Oct 08, 2023EXHIBIT(S) - D (Motion 001)
Date: Oct 08, 2023RJI -RE: NOTICE OF MOTION
Date: Oct 08, 2023EXHIBIT(S) - B (Motion 001)
Date: Oct 08, 2023CONSENT TO CHANGE ATTORNEY (PRE RJI)
Date: Sep 08, 2023COMPLAINT
Date: Aug 10, 2023AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: Aug 10, 2023NOTICE OF APPEARANCE (PRE RJI)
Date: Jul 11, 2023STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: Jun 27, 2023AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: Jun 27, 2023EXHIBIT(S) - A
Date: May 23, 2023SUMMONS WITH NOTICE
Date: May 23, 2023EXHIBIT(S) - B
Date: May 23, 2023Case Events
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 18, 2023 | AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION | ||
December 18, 2023 | MEMORANDUM OF LAW | ||
November 30, 2023 | STIPULATION - ADJOURNMENT OF MOTION -IN SUBMISSIONS PART -RM 130 | ||
November 27, 2023 |
AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION (Motion #001) Langel Affirmation in Opposition |
||
November 27, 2023 |
AFFIDAVIT (Motion #001) Affidavit of xxxxxx xxxxxxx in Opposition |
||
November 27, 2023 | MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN OPPOSITION | ||
October 26, 2023 |
STIPULATION - ADJOURNMENT OF MOTION -IN SUBMISSIONS PART -RM 130 (Motion #001) Stip to Adjourn MTD returnable October 31, 2023 |
||
October 16, 2023 | MEMORANDUM OF LAW | ||
October 08, 2023 |
EXHIBIT(S) - C (Motion #001) Package Labeling |
||
October 08, 2023 |
EXHIBIT(S) - A (Motion #001) Summons with Notice |
||
October 08, 2023 | NOTICE OF MOTION | ||
October 08, 2023 |
AFFIRMATION (Motion #001) Affirm. of Robert Taylor |
||
October 08, 2023 |
AFFIDAVIT (Motion #001) Affidavit of Nicolo Ottomanelli |
||
October 08, 2023 |
AFFIDAVIT (Motion #001) Aff. of Cosimo Lorino |
||
October 08, 2023 |
EXHIBIT(S) - D (Motion #001) Package Labeling |
||
October 08, 2023 | RJI -RE: NOTICE OF MOTION | ||
October 08, 2023 |
EXHIBIT(S) - B (Motion #001) Complaint |
||
September 08, 2023 | CONSENT TO CHANGE ATTORNEY (PRE RJI) | ||
August 10, 2023 | COMPLAINT | ||
August 10, 2023 | AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE | ||
July 11, 2023 | NOTICE OF APPEARANCE (PRE RJI) | ||
June 27, 2023 | STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING | ||
June 27, 2023 | AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE | ||
May 23, 2023 |
EXHIBIT(S) - A Receipts |
||
May 23, 2023 | SUMMONS WITH NOTICE | ||
May 23, 2023 |
EXHIBIT(S) - B Pictures of Product |