Case Last Refreshed: 9 months ago
Hannah Kim, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Belofsky, Kara Sue, Lusher, Ladonna, Miller, Kara S, Sakovits, Alanna Rose, against Carol Grajeda In Her Individual Capacity, Rita Masino In Her Individual Capacity, White & Case, Llp, represented by Donehower, Amy Elizabeth, Garr, Laura Jo Ann, West, Colin Thacher, in the jurisdiction of New York County, NY, . New York County, NY Superior Courts with Alexander M. Tisch presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJune 18, 2020 |
CategoryOther Matters - Contract - Other |
Last RefreshedJuly 25, 2023 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationNew York County, NY |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
ORDER - PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE
Date: October 09, 2020AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: October 21, 2020EXHIBIT(S) Â - D Â (Motion #001)
Date: December 08, 2020AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT
Date: November 16, 2020STIPULATION - TIME TO ANSWER
Date: August 21, 2020MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN SUPPORT
Date: August 02, 2021MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN OPPOSITION
Date: August 20, 2021PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE REQUEST
Date: September 21, 2020AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: July 27, 2020SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: June 18, 2020STIPULATION - TIME TO ANSWER
Date: August 17, 2020EXHIBIT(S) Â - 3 Â (Motion #002)
Date: August 20, 2021ANSWER
Date: September 14, 2020AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: July 29, 2020RJI -RE: REQUEST FOR PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE
Date: September 21, 2020MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN SUPPORT
Date: November 16, 2020EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #001)
Date: November 16, 2020AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION Â (Motion #001)
Date: December 08, 2020EXHIBIT(S) Â - F Â (Motion #001)
Date: December 08, 2020EXHIBIT(S) Â - D Â (Motion #001)
Date: November 16, 2020EXHIBIT(S) Â - E Â (Motion #001)
Date: November 16, 2020EXHIBIT(S) Â - B Â (Motion #001)
Date: November 16, 2020EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #001)
Date: December 08, 2020EXHIBIT(S) Â - C Â (Motion #001)
Date: December 08, 2020EXHIBIT(S) Â - C Â (Motion #001)
Date: November 16, 2020EXHIBIT(S) Â - B Â (Motion #001)
Date: December 08, 2020EXHIBIT(S) Â - E Â (Motion #001)
Date: December 08, 2020NOTICE OF MOTION
Date: November 16, 2020MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN OPPOSITION Â (Motion #001)
Date: December 08, 2020STIPULATION - SO ORDERED
Date: February 04, 2021MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN REPLY
Date: December 14, 2020STIPULATION - CONFIDENTIALITY ( REQUEST TO SO ORDER )
Date: December 28, 2020STIPULATION - ADJOURNMENT OF CONFERENCE
Date: December 14, 2020DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION
Date: March 09, 2021STIPULATION - SO ORDERED
Date: February 16, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - H Â (Motion #002)
Date: August 02, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - G Â (Motion #002)
Date: August 02, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - I Â (Motion #002)
Date: August 02, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - C Â (Motion #002)
Date: August 02, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - D Â (Motion #002)
Date: August 02, 2021STIPULATION - SO ORDERED
Date: April 15, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - E Â (Motion #002)
Date: August 02, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - B
Date: August 13, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - F Â (Motion #002)
Date: August 02, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - C
Date: August 13, 2021AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION
Date: August 20, 2021STIPULATION - DISCOVERY ( REQUEST TO SO ORDER )
Date: June 21, 2021LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE
Date: August 13, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - 5 Â (Motion #002)
Date: August 20, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - 6 Â (Motion #002)
Date: August 20, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - 4 Â (Motion #002)
Date: August 20, 2021LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE
Date: August 23, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - 8 Â (Motion #002)
Date: August 20, 2021STIPULATION - DISCOVERY ( REQUEST TO SO ORDER )
Date: September 15, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - 1 Â (Motion #002)
Date: August 20, 2021MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN REPLY
Date: August 26, 2021NOTICE OF APPEARANCE (POST RJI)
Date: September 08, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - 11 Â (Motion #002)
Date: August 20, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - 9 Â (Motion #002)
Date: August 20, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - 5 Â (Motion #003)
Date: September 20, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - 1
Date: August 23, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - 10 Â (Motion #002)
Date: August 20, 2021NOTICE OF MOTION
Date: September 20, 2021STIPULATION - OTHER - ( REQUEST TO SO ORDER )
Date: August 25, 2021NOTICE OF APPEARANCE (POST RJI)
Date: September 08, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - 2 Â (Motion #002)
Date: August 20, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - 4 Â (Motion #003)
Date: September 20, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - 3 Â (Motion #003)
Date: September 20, 2021AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION Â (Motion #003)
Date: September 20, 2021STIPULATION - SO ORDERED
Date: July 08, 2021ORDER - OTHER (NON-MOTION)
Date: July 14, 2021AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: July 09, 2021AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT
Date: August 02, 2021NOTICE OF MOTION
Date: August 02, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #002)
Date: August 02, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - B Â (Motion #002)
Date: August 02, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - 1 Â (Motion #003)
Date: September 20, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - 2 Â (Motion #003)
Date: September 20, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - 2 Â (Motion #002)
Date: August 23, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - 7 Â (Motion #002)
Date: August 20, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - A
Date: August 13, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - 11 Â (Motion #003)
Date: September 20, 2021STIPULATION - SO ORDERED
Date: April 05, 2022PROOF OF SERVICE
Date: April 19, 2022NOTICE OF ENTRY
Date: March 29, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - 3 Â (Motion #005)
Date: April 29, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - 4 Â (Motion #005)
Date: April 29, 2022MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN SUPPORT
Date: September 20, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - 6 Â (Motion #005)
Date: May 17, 2022AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION
Date: September 29, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - 8 Â (Motion #003)
Date: September 20, 2021ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE ( PROPOSED ) Â (Motion #004)
Date: April 05, 2022NOTICE OF ENTRY Â (Motion #002)
Date: March 29, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - 9 Â (Motion #003)
Date: September 20, 2021DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION
Date: December 29, 2021ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE
Date: May 05, 2022ORDER - OTHER (NON-MOTION)
Date: December 21, 2021DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION
Date: March 23, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - 7 Â (Motion #005)
Date: May 17, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - 10 Â (Motion #003)
Date: September 20, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - D Â (Motion #005)
Date: May 11, 2022NOTICE OF APPEAL
Date: June 17, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - 1 Â (Motion #005)
Date: April 29, 2022NOTICE OF MOTION Â (Motion #005)
Date: April 29, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - 1 Â (Motion #004)
Date: May 06, 2022ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE ( PROPOSED )
Date: April 30, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - 2 Â (Motion #005)
Date: April 29, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - 2 Â (Motion #004)
Date: May 06, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - 4 Â (Motion #004)
Date: May 06, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - 3 Â (Motion #004)
Date: May 06, 2022AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT Â (Motion #006) *Corrected*
Date: April 30, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - 6 Â (Motion #004)
Date: May 06, 2022MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN SUPPORT Â (Motion #006)
Date: April 30, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #003)
Date: September 29, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #004)
Date: April 05, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - I Â (Motion #004)
Date: May 13, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - G Â (Motion #005)
Date: May 11, 2022MEMORANDUM IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION AND IN SUPPORT OF CROSS-MOTION
Date: May 11, 2022DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION
Date: May 20, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - F Â (Motion #005)
Date: May 11, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - G Â (Motion #004)
Date: May 13, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - 8 Â (Motion #005)
Date: May 17, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - 2 Â (Motion #003)
Date: October 05, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - H Â (Motion #004)
Date: May 13, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - J Â (Motion #007)
Date: August 04, 2022ORDER ( PROPOSED )
Date: June 17, 2022MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN OPPOSITION
Date: September 29, 2021AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN REPLY
Date: May 13, 2022AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Â (Motion #004)
Date: May 09, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - 10 Â (Motion #004)
Date: May 06, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - B Â (Motion #005)
Date: May 11, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #005)
Date: May 11, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - C Â (Motion #005)
Date: May 11, 2022STIPULATION - SO ORDERED
Date: September 29, 2021NOTICE OF CROSS-MOTION
Date: May 11, 2022AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Â (Motion #006)
Date: May 09, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - 11 Â (Motion #004)
Date: May 06, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - 12 Â (Motion #004)
Date: May 06, 2022MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN SUPPORT Â (Motion #004)
Date: April 05, 2022MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN REPLY Â (Motion #003)
Date: October 05, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - E Â (Motion #004)
Date: April 05, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - 6 Â (Motion #003)
Date: September 20, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - 7 Â (Motion #003)
Date: September 20, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - 16 Â (Motion #007)
Date: August 22, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - 7 Â (Motion #004)
Date: May 06, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - B Â (Motion #003)
Date: September 29, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - B Â (Motion #004)
Date: April 05, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - 5 Â (Motion #004)
Date: May 06, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - 18 Â (Motion #007)
Date: August 22, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - C Â (Motion #003)
Date: September 29, 2021STIPULATION - SO ORDERED
Date: October 28, 2022ORDER - CASE SCHEDULING
Date: September 23, 2022STIPULATION - SO ORDERED
Date: August 25, 2022MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN REPLY
Date: August 27, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - E Â (Motion #005)
Date: May 11, 2022ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE
Date: April 08, 2022AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT Â (Motion #003)
Date: October 05, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - F Â (Motion #004)
Date: May 13, 2022NOTICE OF ENTRY Â (Motion #006)
Date: May 20, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - H Â (Motion #007)
Date: August 04, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - G Â (Motion #007)
Date: August 04, 2022STIPULATION - SO ORDERED
Date: June 21, 2022STIPULATION - AS DIRECTED BY COURT
Date: July 28, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - I Â (Motion #007)
Date: August 04, 2022NOTICE OF ENTRY Â (Motion #005)
Date: May 20, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - M Â (Motion #007)
Date: August 04, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - B Â (Motion #007)
Date: August 04, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - P Â (Motion #007)
Date: August 04, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - 5 Â (Motion #007)
Date: August 22, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - L Â (Motion #007)
Date: August 04, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - C Â (Motion #007)
Date: August 04, 2022ORDER - CASE SCHEDULING
Date: August 03, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - D Â (Motion #007)
Date: August 04, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - O Â (Motion #007)
Date: August 04, 2022MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN SUPPORT
Date: August 04, 2022NOTICE OF APPEARANCE (POST RJI)
Date: October 21, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - K Â (Motion #007)
Date: August 04, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - 1 Â (Motion #007)
Date: August 22, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - 7 Â (Motion #007)
Date: August 22, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - 11 Â (Motion #007)
Date: August 22, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - 6 Â (Motion #007)
Date: August 22, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #007)
Date: August 04, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - 10 Â (Motion #007)
Date: August 22, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - 9 Â (Motion #007)
Date: August 22, 2022ORDER - SEALING
Date: October 21, 2021AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION
Date: August 04, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - 8 Â (Motion #007)
Date: August 22, 2022STIPULATION - CONFIDENTIALITY ( REQUEST TO SO ORDER )
Date: October 28, 2021REQUEST FOR RESTRICTED STATUS
Date: October 21, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - 8 Â (Motion #004)
Date: May 06, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - C Â (Motion #004)
Date: April 05, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - 9 Â (Motion #004)
Date: May 06, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - D Â (Motion #003)
Date: September 29, 2021MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN REPLY
Date: May 13, 2022NOTICE OF ENTRY Â (Motion #004)
Date: May 20, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - D Â (Motion #004)
Date: April 05, 2022NOTICE OF APPEAL
Date: June 17, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - 3 Â (Motion #003)
Date: October 05, 2021AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Â (Motion #004)
Date: May 17, 2022REQUEST FOR RESTRICTED STATUS
Date: October 20, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - E Â (Motion #007)
Date: August 04, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - N Â (Motion #007)
Date: August 04, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - 3 Â (Motion #007)
Date: August 22, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - 4 Â (Motion #007)
Date: August 22, 2022NOTICE OF MOTION
Date: August 04, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - 14 Â (Motion #007)
Date: August 22, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - 2 Â (Motion #007)
Date: August 22, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - 12 Â (Motion #007)
Date: August 22, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - 13 Â (Motion #007)
Date: August 22, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - F Â (Motion #007)
Date: August 04, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - 15 Â (Motion #007)
Date: August 22, 2022NOTIFICATION FOR SEALING
Date: November 09, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - A
Date: November 09, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - 1 Â (Motion #003)
Date: October 28, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - 5 Â (Motion #005)
Date: April 29, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - 17 Â (Motion #007)
Date: August 22, 2022STIPULATION - SO ORDERED
Date: December 08, 2022OFFER UNDER CPLR 3221
Date: December 12, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - A
Date: December 12, 2022JUDGMENT -TO COUNTY CLERK (PROPOSED)
Date: December 12, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - B
Date: December 12, 2022AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT Â (Motion #008)
Date: December 15, 2022AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT Â (Motion #008)
Date: December 15, 2022ORDER ( PROPOSED ) Â (Motion #008)
Date: December 15, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #008)
Date: December 15, 2022NOTICE OF MOTION Â (Motion #008)
Date: December 15, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - D Â (Motion #009)
Date: December 22, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - B Â (Motion #009)
Date: December 22, 2022NOTICE OF MOTION
Date: December 22, 2022AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION
Date: December 22, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #009)
Date: December 22, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - C Â (Motion #009)
Date: December 22, 2022STIPULATION - ADJOURNMENT OF MOTION -IN SUBMISSIONS PART -RM 130 Â (Motion #009)
Date: January 04, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 2 Â (Motion #009)
Date: January 19, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 1 Â (Motion #009)
Date: January 19, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 3 Â (Motion #009)
Date: January 19, 2023AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN REPLY
Date: January 23, 2023DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION
Date: March 06, 2023Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 06, 2023 | DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION | ||
January 23, 2023 | AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN REPLY | ||
January 19, 2023 |
MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN OPPOSITION (Motion #009) Defendant White & Case's Memorandum of Law in Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion for an Order Granting Defendant White & Case's Memorandum of Law in Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion for an Order Granting ... show more |
||
January 19, 2023 |
AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION (Motion #009) Affidavit in Support of Defendant White & Case's Opposition to Plaintiffs Motion to Award Attorneys Affidavit in Support of Defendant White & Case's Opposition to Plaintiffs Motion to Award Attorneys ... show more |
||
January 19, 2023 |
EXHIBIT(S) - 2 (Motion #009) Exhibit 2 - White & Case R. 3221 Offer |
||
January 19, 2023 |
EXHIBIT(S) - 1 (Motion #009) Exhibit 1 - 3.25.21 DWG Ltr. to K. Miller |
||
January 19, 2023 |
EXHIBIT(S) - 3 (Motion #009) Exhibit 3 - Defendant's Proposed Apportionment of V&A's Fees |
||
January 04, 2023 |
STIPULATION - ADJOURNMENT OF MOTION -IN SUBMISSIONS PART -RM 130 (Motion #009) Stipulation of Adjournment |
||
December 22, 2022 |
EXHIBIT(S) - D (Motion #009) March 25, 2021 correspondence |
||
December 22, 2022 |
EXHIBIT(S) - B (Motion #009) Complaint |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.